Florida Northern District Court
Judge:Lacey A Collier
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:22-cv-05524
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2022
Terminated:Jul 21, 2022
Defendant
ESCAMBIA COUNTY JAIL
Plaintiff
JUJUAN GEORGE

GPO Jun 15 2022
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is respectfully RECOMMENDED: That this case be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with Court orders. That the clerk be directed to close the file. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 06/15/22. R&R flag set (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 7/13/2022.) (jfj)
GPO Jul 21 2022
ORDER. The magistrate judge's Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 5) is adopted and incorporated by reference in this order. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with Court orders. The clerk of court is directed to close this case. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 07/21/22. (jfj)

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, July 21, 2022
8 8 order Judgment (Signed by Clerk: Not an Opinion) Thu 07/21 1:41 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re 7 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation. Pursuant to and at the direction of the Court, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with Court orders. (jfj)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendation Thu 07/21 11:14 AM
ORDER. The magistrate judge's Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 5 ) is adopted and incorporated by reference in this order. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with Court orders. The clerk of court is directed to close this case. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 07/21/22. (jfj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 07/20 8:10 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed Re:5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Objections to R&R due 07/13/2022. (Objections not filed.) (jfj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
6 6 misc Mail Returned Thu 06/30 9:17 AM
Mail addressed to Plaintiff at Escambia County Jail containing5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION returned as Undeliverable. Envelope labeled "Return to Sender, Attempted - Not Known, Unable to Forward" and stamped "Return to Sender". Per the Escambia County Inmate Jail View website, the Plaintiff was released on 06/14/22. Address Given is 730 Berkley Drive, Pensacola, FL 32503. Clerk will resend document5 to this address. (jfj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
5 5 motion Report and Recommendation Wed 06/15 3:47 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is respectfully RECOMMENDED: That this case be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with Court orders. That the clerk be directed to close the file. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 06/15/22. R&R flag set (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 7/13/2022 .) (jfj)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 06/13 12:48 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re:4 Order to Show Cause. (Amended Complaint not received. IFP Motion/Filing Fee not received.) (jfj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
4 4 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 05/24 8:37 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to show cause why this case should not be dismissed due to his failure to comply with a Court order. The Court will discharge this Order to Show Cause if Plaintiff complies with the April 26 Order within fourteen (14) days. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 05/24/22. (Show Cause Response due by 6/7/2022 .) (jfj)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 22, 2022
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Sun 05/22 7:46 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re:3 Order. (Amended Complaint and IFP Motion/Filing Fee not received.) (jfj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
3 3 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/26 10:02 AM
ORDER. The clerk shall send Plaintiff a civil rights complaint form for use by prisoners in actions under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 and a complete set of forms needed to file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis (for prisoners). This case number should be written on the forms and "Amended Complaint" shall be written on the complaint form. Within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file (1) an amended complaint and (2) a complete motion to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the $402.00 filing fee. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 04/26/22. (Amended Complaint due by 5/17/2022 . IFP Motion or Filing Fee due by 5/17/2022 .) (Forms mailed as directed.) (jfj)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 04/25 2:19 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re:1 Complaint. (jfj)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Pro Se Mon 04/25 2:28 PM
Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (jfj)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/25 2:17 PM
COMPLAINT against ESCAMBIA COUNTY JAIL, filed by JUJUAN GEORGE. (No service copies, IFP motion, or fee received.) (jfj)
Related: [-]