Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:Kristi H Johnson
Referred: Michael T Parker
Case #: 3:22-cv-00220
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2022
Terminated:Dec 05, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Oct 22, 2022 4:32 AM CDT
Defendant
Tina Highfill
Represented By
Wilson D. Minor-State Gov
Mississippi Attorney General'S Office - Jackson
contact info
Defendant
Phyllis Johnson
Represented By
Wilson D. Minor-State Gov
Mississippi Attorney General'S Office - Jackson
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas A. Sharon
Represented By
Joel W. Howell, III
Joel W. Howell, Iii, Attorney At Law
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Mississippi Board of Nursing
Terminated: 09/14/2022
Represented By
Wilson D. Minor-State Gov
Mississippi Attorney General'S Office - Jackson
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, December 05, 2022
23 23 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 12/05 1:46 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED that this case is dismissed with prejudice as to all parties. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 12/5/2022 (LAT)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 02, 2022
order Order Fri 12/02 3:41 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER: The parties having announced a settlement, the settlement conference set for 12/7/22 is hereby cancelled. The parties are directed to submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice or a stipulation of dismissal with prejudice to the District Judge on or before 1/6/23. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on December 2, 2022 (KPM)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 12/02 3:42 PM
***Hearings terminated (12/7/22 settlement conference) (KPM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
22 22 3 pgs order Order Thu 12/01 9:58 AM
ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on December 1, 2022 (KPM)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 11, 2022
21 21 discov Notice of Service of Disclosure Fri 11/11 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Tina Highfill, Phyllis Johnson (Minor-State Gov, Wilson)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
20 20 notice Certificate of Counsel Tue 11/08 12:21 PM
Notice of Service of Pre-discovery Disclosure by Joel W. Howell, III on behalf of Thomas A. Sharon (Howell, Joel) Modified on 11/8/2022 (ND).
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Tue 11/08 1:39 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #20 . Incorrect event used to file this document. This document should have been docketed as a Notice of Service of Disclosure. Court staff has revised docket entry to reflect correct event. (ND)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 28, 2022
19 19 order Case Management Order Fri 10/28 11:50 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: The parties do not consent; Disclosures due by 11/11/2022; Bench Trial set for a two week term beginning 8/7/2023 before District Judge Kristi H. Johnson; ETT: 2-3 days; Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2023 before District Judge Kristi H. Johnson; Discovery due by 2/21/2023; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 11/28/2022; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 11/28/2022; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 12/15/2022; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 1/16/2023; Motions due by 3/7/2023; Settlement Conference set for 12/7/2022 before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker; ADR Report due by 6/29/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on October 28, 2022 (KPM)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephonic Case Management Conference Fri 10/28 10:18 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 10/28/2022/ A case management order will be entered. PARTICIPANTS: Joel Howell for plaintiff; Wilson Minor for defendants. (KPM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
18 18 3 pgs notice Rule 16(a) Initial Order Tue 09/27 4:32 PM
Rule 16(a) Initial Order: The stay previously entered is lifted and a Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 10/28/2022 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 10/21/22. (KPM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
17 17 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Wed 09/14 1:55 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 9/14/2022 (LAT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
16 16 8 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 06/28 10:46 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re14 Response to Motion,, filed by Mississippi Board of Nursing (Minor-State Gov, Wilson)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
misc Docket Annotation Wed 06/22 1:01 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to14 : L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (CO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
15 15 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 06/21 2:02 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION ON ELEVENTH AMENDMENT IMMUNITY GROUNDS filed by Thomas A. Sharon (Howell, Joel)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Response to Motion Tue 06/21 2:01 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION ON ELEVENTH AMENDMENT IMMUNITY GROUNDS filed by Thomas A. Sharon(Howell, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Thomas Sharon,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12,
Att: 14 Exhibit 13,
Att: 15 Affidavit Sandy Friday
Friday, June 10, 2022
13 13 2 pgs order Order Fri 06/10 2:31 PM
ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on June 10, 2022. (AS)
Related: [-]
order Order Fri 06/10 3:04 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER: In light of the entry of Order13 , the case management conference set for 6/15/22 is hereby cancelled and will be rescheduled once the jurisdictional motion has been addressed. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on June 10, 2022 (KPM)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 06/10 3:24 PM
***Hearings terminated (6/15/22 TCMC) (KPM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
12 12 14 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 06/08 5:38 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION ON ELEVENTH AMENDMENT IMMUNITY GROUNDS filed by Mississippi Board of Nursing (Minor-State Gov, Wilson)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs motion Judgment on the Pleadings Wed 06/08 5:37 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION ON ELEVENTH AMENDMENT IMMUNITY GROUNDS by Mississippi Board of Nursing(Minor-State Gov, Wilson)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit A - Mississippi House Bill 1587 (Regular Session 2022),
Att: 2 Exhibit B - March 16, 2020 Mississippi Board of Nursing Proclamation,
Att: 3 1 pgs Exhibit C - APRN Disaster/Emergency Waiver Application,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - February 9, 2022 Cease and Desist Order to Thomas Sharon
Monday, May 16, 2022
10 10 notice Rule 16(a) Initial Order Mon 05/16 11:52 AM
Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2022 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 6/9/22. (KPM)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2022
9 9 6 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/13 5:12 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Tina Highfill, Phyllis Johnson, Mississippi Board of Nursing.(Minor-State Gov, Wilson)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 06, 2022
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/06 11:24 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas A. Sharon. Tina Highfill served on 4/26/2022, answer due 5/17/2022. (Howell, Joel)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/06 11:23 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas A. Sharon. Phyllis Johnson served on 4/26/2022, answer due 5/17/2022. (Howell, Joel)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/06 11:21 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas A. Sharon. Mississippi Board of Nursing served on 4/26/2022, answer due 5/17/2022. (Howell, Joel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 05, 2022
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Thu 05/05 1:12 PM
***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY. AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Tina Highfill on 4/25/22, filed by Thomas A. Sharon. (Howell, Joel) Modified on 5/5/2022 (cwl)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Thu 05/05 1:11 PM
***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY. AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Phyllis Johnson on 4/25/22, filed by Thomas A. Sharon. (Howell, Joel) Modified on 5/5/2022 (cwl)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Thu 05/05 1:09 PM
***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY. AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Board of Nursing on 4/25/2022, filed by Thomas A. Sharon. (Howell, Joel) Modified on 5/5/2022 (cwl)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Thu 05/05 3:15 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3 ,4 ,5 : Incorrect event chosen. Attorney is directed to refile using the correct summons returned executed which will set the answer deadline. (cwl)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
2 2 3 pgs service Summons Issued Mon 04/25 11:05 AM
Summons Issued as to Tina Highfill, Phyllis Johnson, Mississippi Board of Nursing. (LAT)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/25 11:03 AM
COMPLAINT against Tina Highfill, Phyllis Johnson, Mississippi Board of Nursing ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 226), filed by Thomas A. Sharon.(LAT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet