Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-05551
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2022
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:22-cv-00885
Last checked: Saturday Oct 22, 2022 4:40 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
SHANTELL FRAZIER
Represented By
GENEVIEVE MARY ZIMMERMAN
Meshbesher & Spence - Minneapolis Mn
contact info


Docket last updated: 53 minutes ago
Monday, May 16, 2022
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 05/16 9:41 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by SHANTELL FRAZIER. (ZIMMERMAN, GENEVIEVE)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
8 8 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/25 2:39 PM
ORDER - Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district,assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaint due by 5/16/2022 .) (djb)
Related: [-]
7 7 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Mon 04/25 1:38 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:22-cv-00885. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2022
6 6 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-152) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers.(kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/25/2022.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2022
5 5 Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL #2885 re:1 Notice of Removal. (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/25/2022.]
Related: [-]
4 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 22-cv-885 (JRT/TNL). (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/25/2022.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re1 Notice of Removal,2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/25/2022.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/25/2022.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9438523) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/25/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet