Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Robert J Colville
Case #: 2:22-cv-00613
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2022
Terminated:Nov 03, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Oct 22, 2022 5:29 AM EDT
Defendant
MAINSTAY LIFE SERVICES
Represented By
Morgan M. J. Randle
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Marla N. Presley
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Emily E. Town
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Mediator
KENNETH J. BENSON
Justus ADR Services PO Box 101824
Pittsburgh, PA 15237
Represented By
Kenneth J. Benson
Justus Adr Services
contact info
Plaintiff
DEBRA MCCLUNG
Represented By
Joshua P. Ward
J.P. Ward & Associates, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 41 minutes ago
Thursday, January 26, 2023
23 23 1 pgs order Order Thu 01/26 8:32 AM
ORDER granting Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice22 . Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 1/26/23. (tk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
22 22 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty) Wed 01/25 4:26 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by DEBRA MCCLUNG. (Ward, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
21 21 2 pgs order Order for Administrative Case Closing Thu 11/03 9:39 AM
ORDER FOR ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING: The Court having been advised by counsel for the parties that the above captioned case has been resolved and that the only matters remaining to be completed are the payment of the settlement proceeds, if any, and the submission of a stipulation for dismissal under Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a). No further action is required by the Court at this time. The Clerk shall mark the above-captioned case closed. Nothing contained in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this action, and, that should further proceedings therein become necessary or desirable, either party may initiate them in the same manner as if this Order had not been entered. The Court expressly retains jurisdiction in this matter to consider any issue arising during the period when settlement is being finalized, including, butnot limited to, enforcing settlement. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 11/3/22. (cjo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
20 20 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 11/02 9:52 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by DEBRA MCCLUNG (Ward, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
19 19 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Mon 09/12 12:26 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Hon. Kenneth J. Benson is appointed as mediator. The ADR conference(s) shall be concluded before November 3, 2022 unless extended by order of the Court. Details more fully stated in the order. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 9/12/22. (cjo)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
18 18 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Fri 09/09 5:08 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by MAINSTAY LIFE SERVICES. (Presley, Marla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
17 17 order Case Management Order Tue 08/30 1:24 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings and Joinder of the Parties due by 9/27/2022; Discovery shall complete by 1/27/2023; Joint Pre Conference Statement due by 2/1/2022; Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 2/6/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert J. Colville. Dial In Information will be emailed to the parties in advance of the hearing. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 8/30/22. (cjo)
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs order Order Implementing Fed Rule of Evidence 502(d) Tue 08/30 1:19 PM
ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) Pursuant to LCvR 16.1.D. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 8/30/22. (cjo)
Related: [-]
15 15 minutes Initial Case Management Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 08/30 1:18 PM
Minute Entry: Proceedings held before Judge Robert J. Colville: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/30/2022. Parties shall file an Amended ADR Stipulation on or before September 9, 2022. (cjo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
14 14 misc Status Report Thu 08/25 9:47 PM
STATUS REPORT of the Parties by MAINSTAY LIFE SERVICES. (Town, Emily)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
13 13 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Tue 08/16 4:59 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by MAINSTAY LIFE SERVICES. (Presley, Marla)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 08/16 4:59 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Presley, Marla)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
11 11 notice Notice of Subst of Atty (Use to subst attys w/in the same firm) Fri 08/12 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney Appearance by Emily E. Town on behalf of MAINSTAY LIFE SERVICES. Attorney Morgan M. J. Randle terminated. (Town, Emily)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
10 10 order Initial Local Rule 16.1 Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 07/01 12:54 PM
INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER:, Telephonic Initial Case Management set for 8/30/2022 at 11:30 AM before Judge Robert J. Colville. Joint Pre Conference Statement due by 8/25/2022. ADR Stipulations and Rule 26f Report due by 8/16/2022. Details more fully stated in the order. Dial in information will be circulated to the parties in advance of the hearing. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 7/1/22. (cjo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1: Stipulation Selecting ADR,
Att: 2 2: Rule 26(f) form
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/01 12:25 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint and Defenses by MAINSTAY LIFE SERVICES. (Presley, Marla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) Wed 06/08 3:10 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MAINSTAY LIFE SERVICES. (Randle, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/02 2:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan M. J. Randle on behalf of MAINSTAY LIFE SERVICES. (Randle, Morgan)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/02 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marla N. Presley on behalf of MAINSTAY LIFE SERVICES. (Presley, Marla)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement Thu 06/02 3:42 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re6 Notice of Appearance,7 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 6/9/2022. (jv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 05/11 11:53 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DEBRA MCCLUNG. MAINSTAY LIFE SERVICES waiver sent on 5/6/2022, answer due 7/5/2022. (Ward, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
4 4 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/26 9:20 AM
ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order) Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 4/26/22. (cjo)
Related: [-]
3 3 adr Notice of ADR Designation Tue 04/26 9:18 AM
NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 04/25 4:31 PM
Summons Issued as to MAINSTAY LIFE SERVICES (jv)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Mon 04/25 4:29 PM
COMPLAINT against MAINSTAY LIFE SERVICES (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7069088), filed by DEBRA MCCLUNG. (jv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet