California Central District Court
Judge:James V Selna
Referred: Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 8:22-cv-00868
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2022
Terminated:Oct 02, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Oct 22, 2022 1:37 AM PDT
Counter Claimant
Lindsey C Hill
Represented By
Eileen Spadoni
Cohn And Swartzon PC
contact info
Christopher P Wesierski
Wesierski And Zurek LLP
contact info
Jesse A Kaplan
Freedman And Taitelman LLP
contact info
Brett Andrew Smith
Wesierski And Zurek LLP
contact info
Michelle R Prescott
Wesierski And Zurek LLP
contact info
Bryan J Freedman
Freedman And Taitelman LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Trevor Bauer
Represented By
Jon R. Fetterolf
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
contact info
Blair G. Brown
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
contact info
Shawn Holley
Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump Holley LLP
contact info
Nell Z. Peyser
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
contact info
Kate Emily Mangels
Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump And Aldisert LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lindsey C Hill
Represented By
Eileen Spadoni
Cohn And Swartzon PC
contact info
Christopher P Wesierski
Wesierski And Zurek LLP
contact info
Jesse A Kaplan
Freedman And Taitelman LLP
contact info
Brett Andrew Smith
Wesierski And Zurek LLP
contact info
Michelle R Prescott
Wesierski And Zurek LLP
contact info
Bryan J Freedman
Freedman And Taitelman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Niranjan Fred Thiagarajah
Represented By
Kenneth Charles Feldman
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard And Smith LLP
contact info
David D Samani
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard And Smith LLP
contact info
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Bruce Altschuler
Represented By
Bruce J Altshuler
Altshuler And Spiro
contact info
Plaintiff
Trevor Bauer
Represented By
Jon R. Fetterolf
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
contact info
Blair G. Brown
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
contact info
Shawn Holley
Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump Holley LLP
contact info
Suann C MacIsaac
Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump Holley LLP
contact info
Nell Z. Peyser
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
contact info
Kate Emily Mangels
Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump And Aldisert LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, January 12, 2024
208 208 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 01/12 11:28 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kelsey J. Simmerson counsel for Plaintiff Trevor Bauer. Kelsey J. Simmerson is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Trevor Bauer. (Simmerson, Kelsey)
Related: [-]