Gibson et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-01303 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Massachusetts, 1:22-cv-10503 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 19, 2022 4:51 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
W L Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Ten Cate Protective Mills Inc.
|
|
Defendant
StedFast USA, Inc.
800 Mountain View Dr.
Piney Flats, TN 37686 |
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Northeast Rescue Systems, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Gibson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Gibson
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
Terminated: 06/28/2022
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 22, 2025 | ||
47 | 47
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Noel Couch on behalf of Northeast Rescue Systems, Inc. (Couch, Noel) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
46 | 46
![]() STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
45 | 45
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
44 | 44
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
43 | 43
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 05/03 1:15 PM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case No. 2:22-cv-01303-RMG granting 4945 (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (41) in case 2:22-cv-01303-RMG) Motion to Withdraw David Harding as Attorney for Fire-Dex LLC. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 5/3/2024.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01303-RMG(sshe, ) |
|
42 | 42
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 05/03 1:11 PM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case No. 2:22-cv-01303-RMG granting 4944 (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (40) in case 2:22-cv-01303-RMG) MOTION to Withdraw David Harding as Attorney for Northeast Rescue Systems, Inc. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 5/3/2024.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01303-RMG(sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
![]() MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Fire-Dex LLC. Response to Motion due by 5/16/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01303-RMG(Harding, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
40 | 40
![]() MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Northeast Rescue Systems, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 5/16/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01303-RMG(Harding, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Global Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 01/16 2:42 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 4321 (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (33) in case 2:22-cv-01303-RMG) Motion to Withdraw Michael Pierre Giunta as Attorney for Northeast Rescue Systems, Inc. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/16/2024.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01303-RMG(sshe, ) |
|
Monday, January 15, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B Weinberg on behalf of Northeast Rescue Systems, Inc.(Weinberg, Michael) Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01303-RMG QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE Counsel: Please note correct filing procedures for future filings . Refiled correctly, as of original filing date, in management case and spread to applicable member case ( clerk corrected member case number, per incorrectly listed again ) as listed on document, per Judge's filing instructions/preferences per CMO No. 1; clerk created attorney/party association per not completed at time of original incorrect filing.(sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
![]() MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Northeast Rescue Systems, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 1/24/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Harding, David) Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01303-RMG QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE Counsel: Please note correct filing procedures for future filings . Refiled correctly, as of original filing date, in management case and spread to applicable member case(s) as listed on document, per Judge's filing instructions/preferences per CMO No. 1. (sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Harding on behalf of Northeast Rescue Systems, Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01303-RMG(Harding, David) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Fri 10/13 6:34 PM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case Nos. et al. (as listed in the motion). The motion to substitute counsel of record (Dkt. No. 3719 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.) is denied without prejudice. Counsel therein is not in fact attempting to "substitute" existing counsel in any given action for new counsel. Rather it appears counsel is attempting to make an appearance in various actions currently consolidated for pretrial proceedings before this Court. Counsel is directed to CMO 1 (Dkt. No. 3 at 3) (noting that counsel who appeared in the transferor district court prior to transfer need not enter a separate appearance or apply to proceed pro hac vice). To the extent counsel desires to file a notice of appearance related to the matters for which it seeks "substitution," it may do so. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/13/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
![]() MOTION to Substitute Attorney by PBI Performance Products Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/6/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Van Zandt, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, August 02, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Harding on behalf of Fire-Dex LLC(Harding, David) Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00710-RMG, 2:22-cv-01303-RMG QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE Refiled correctly, as of original filing date, in management case AND SPREAD to applicable member case(s), to which the document relates as listed on document, per Judge's filing instructions/preferences per CMO No. 1, and created the attorney/party association in the member cases.(sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, July 07, 2022 | ||
28 | 28
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Ferguson on behalf of Fire-Dex LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00710-RMG, 2:22-cv-01303-RMG, 2:22-cv-01589-RMG(Ferguson, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, July 06, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 07/06 9:46 AM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Cases: the Motion 2442 (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (20) in case 2:22-cv-00710-RMG; (25) in case 2:22-cv-01303-RMG; (22) in case 2:22-cv-01589-RMG) of William Gildea to Withdraw as Attorney by Fire Dex, LLC is GRANTED. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 7/6/22. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00710-RMG, 2:22-cv-01303-RMG, 2:22-cv-01589-RMG(sshe, ) |
||
Tuesday, July 05, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
![]() MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Fire Dex, LLC. Response to Motion due by 7/19/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00710-RMG, 2:22-cv-01303-RMG, 2:22-cv-01589-RMG(Gildea, William) |
|
Tuesday, June 28, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Amanda Gibson, Kenneth Gibson against Fire Service Plus, Inc. Only Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01303-RMG(Bliss, Paula) |
|
Wednesday, June 22, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
![]() STATUS REPORT General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Northeast Rescue Systems, Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01303-RMG(Giunta, Michael) Refiled in management case, and spread to correct applicable member case as corrected/listed on document .(sshe, ) |
|
21 | 21
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Pierre Giunta on behalf of Northeast Rescue Systems, Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01303-RMG(Giunta, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, May 24, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by George H Buermann on behalf of Fire Service Plus Inc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00710-RMG, 2:22-cv-00711-RMG, 2:22-cv-01303-RMG(Buermann, George) |
|
18 | 18
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Rosemarie Carmella Hebner on behalf of Fire Service Plus Inc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00710-RMG, 2:22-cv-00711-RMG, 2:22-cv-01303-RMG(Hebner, Rosemarie) |
|
Thursday, May 19, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
![]() STATUS REPORT General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Fire Dex, LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00710-RMG, 2:22-cv-01303-RMG, 2:22-cv-01589-RMG(Gildea, William) |
|
Wednesday, May 18, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by William Gildea on behalf of Fire-Dex LLC (Gildea, William) Refiled correctly in management case, and spread to applicable member cases as listed on document, per Judge's filing instructions per CMO No 1 . Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00710-RMG, 2:22-cv-01303-RMG(sshe, ) |
|
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Kenneally on behalf of Fire-Dex LLC (Kenneally, Kevin) Refiled correctly in management case, and spread to applicable member cases as listed on document, per Judge's filing instructions per CMO No 1 . Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00710-RMG, 2:22-cv-01303-RMG(sshe, ) |
|
Monday, April 25, 2022 | ||
14 | 14 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Massachusetts (associated as of 4/22/2022), 1:22-cv-10503, Gibson et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-1303-RMG (sshe, ) | |
12 | 12
![]() Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:22-cv-10503. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, April 21, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() |
|
10 | 10
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |
|
Monday, April 18, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Friday, April 15, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Monday, April 11, 2022 | ||
6 | 6 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint. ALLOWED, answer due 28 days following the JPML Decision. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 4/25/2022.] | |
Friday, April 08, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Wednesday, April 06, 2022 | ||
4 | 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Warnock, Douglas) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 4/25/2022.] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 4/25/2022.] | |
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |