Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-10942

Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mike K Nakagawa
Case #: 2:22-ap-01066
Nature of Suit1 null
2 Bankruptcy - Other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2022
Terminated:Sep 16, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
MATTHEW BEASLEY, AN INDIVIDUAL
5475 RUFFIAN ROAD
LAS VEGAS, NV 89149
Represented By
GARRETT T OGATA
Law Offices Of Garrett Ogata
contact info
Defendant
BEASLEY LAW GROUP PC, A NEVADA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
5475 Ruffian Road
LAS VEGAS, NV 89149
Represented By
BEASLEY LAW GROUP PC, A NEVADA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
contact info
Defendant
JEFFREY J. JUDD, AN INDIVIDUAL
9 SKY ARC COURT
HENDERSON, NV 89012
Represented By
Kevin N Anderson
Fabian Vancott
contact info
Trevor R. Waite
Fabian Vancott
contact info
Defendant
J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION
2700 EAST SUNSET ROAD SUITE 9
LAS VEGAS, NV 89008
Represented By
WILLIAM M. NOALL
Garman Turner Gordon
contact info
GREGORY E GARMAN
Garman Turner Gordon
contact info
Defendant
J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
7901 4TH STREET NORTH SUITE 300
ST. PETERSBURG, FL 33702
Represented By
WILLIAM M. NOALL
Garman Turner Gordon
contact info
GREGORY E GARMAN
Garman Turner Gordon
contact info
Defendant
JASON JONGEWARD, AN INDIVIDUAL
3084 Regal Court
Washington, UT 84780
Represented By
JASON JONGEWARD, AN INDIVIDUAL
contact info
Defendant
SHANE M. JAGER, AN INDIVIDAUL
16 PARADISE VALLEY COURT
HENDERSON, NV 89052
Represented By
T LOUIS PALAZZO
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark A. Murphy
Post Office Box 90250
Henderson, NV 89009
Represented By
MARC P COOK
Bailus Cook & Kelesis, Ltd
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark A Murphy, LTD
2700 East Sunset Road Suite, 9
Las Vegas, NV 89120
Represented By
MARC P COOK
Bailus Cook & Kelesis, Ltd
contact info
Plaintiff
DANIEL A AYALA
Fox Rothschild LLP c/o Brett Axelrod 1980 Festival Plaza Drive Suite 700
Las Vegas, NV 98135
Represented By
BRETT A. AXELROD
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, September 16, 2022
38 38 court BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Fri 09/16 9:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/16/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34 Withdrawal of the Reference Documents Forwarded to BNC for Noticing
37 37 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 09/16 9:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/16/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 33 Withdrawal of the Reference Transmittal Form
36 36 court Close Adversary Case Fri 09/16 12:34 PM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case 22-1066 (dcl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
34 34 court Withdrawal of the Reference Documents Forwarded to BNC for Noticing (E-mail)(BNC) Wed 09/14 9:39 AM
Clerk Forwarded Withdrawal of the Reference Documents to BNC for Noticing Related [+] (dcl)
Related: [-] 30 Order,33 Withdrawal of the Reference Transmittal Form.
33 33 court Withdrawal of the Reference Transmittal Form (BNC) (E-mail) (Adv) Wed 09/14 9:35 AM
Withdrawal of the Reference Transmittal Form. Related [+] (dcl)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, Defendant PAULA BEASLEY, Defendant ECO BATTERY, LLC A UTAH LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, Defendant BJ HOLDINGS, LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.
Monday, September 12, 2022
32 32 adv_misc Document (Adv) Mon 09/12 4:22 PM
(Copy) Document 8/5/22 USDC Order (22-cv-00612) on Receiver's Report and Recommendation Regarding Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Error: party not know Related [+] (dcl)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, Defendant PAULA BEASLEY, Defendant ECO BATTERY, LLC A UTAH LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, Defendant BJ HOLDINGS, LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,30 Order.
Thursday, September 01, 2022
31 31 court Minute Entry - Hearing Vacated Per Court Instructions (ADV) Thu 09/01 1:49 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 9/8/2022 10:00 AM. Vacated Per Court Instructions Related [+] (sm)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal filed by DANIEL A AYALA, MARK A. MURPHY, AN INDIVIDUAL, MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, PAULA BEASLEY, ECO BATTERY, LLC A UTAH LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, BJ HOLDINGS, LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
30 30 3 pgs orderad Order (generic) (Adv) Wed 08/31 12:37 PM
(COPY) 8/23/22 USDC ORDER GRANTING RECEIVER'S EX PARTE MOTION...WITHDRAWING REFERENCE TO BANKRUPTCY COURT.. Related [+]......ORDERED...the reference to the Bankruptcy Court of the adversary proceeding.. 22-01066 is withdrawn...CDS EOD 8/23/22 (dcl)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, Defendant PAULA BEASLEY, Defendant ECO BATTERY, LLC A UTAH LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, Defendant BJ HOLDINGS, LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
29 29 court Minute Entry Hearing Off Calendar Wed 07/27 4:11 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 7/27/2022 9:30 AM. Hearing Off Calendar Related [+] (cas)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Dismiss filed by JEFFREY J. JUDD
28 28 court Minute Entry Hearing Off Calendar Wed 07/27 4:10 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 7/27/2022 9:30 AM. Hearing Off Calendar Related [+] (cas)
Related: [-] 20 Motion for Remand filed by MARK A. MURPHY, AN INDIVIDUAL, MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
27 27 court Minute Entry Continued (ADV) Tue 07/12 1:40 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 7/12/2022 1:30 PM. Continued. Related [+] Appearance: BRETT A. AXELROD (Hearing scheduled 07/27/2022 at 09:30 AM at MKN Teleconference Line. (cas)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Dismiss filed by JEFFREY J. JUDD
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
26 26 court Minute Entry - Hearing Vacated Per Court Instructions (ADV) Tue 07/05 8:49 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 7/27/2022 9:30 AM. Vacated Per Court Instructions Related [+] (sm)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Remand filed by MARK A. MURPHY, AN INDIVIDUAL, MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
Monday, June 06, 2022
25 25 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv) Mon 06/06 10:21 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 7/12/2022 at 01:30 PM at Remote. Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant JEFFREY J. JUDD.
Friday, June 03, 2022
24 24 notice Hearing (Adv) Fri 06/03 4:52 PM
Notice of Hearing on Jeffrey Judd's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint [ECF No. 3] Hearing Date: 07/12/2022 Hearing Time: 1:30 pm with Certificate of Service Filed by KEVIN N. ANDERSON on behalf of JEFFREY J. JUDD Related [+](ANDERSON, KEVIN)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant JEFFREY J. JUDD.
23 23 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv) Fri 06/03 9:02 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 7/27/2022 at 09:30 AM at Remote. Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 20 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.
Thursday, June 02, 2022
22 22 adv_misc Certificate of Service (ADV) Thu 06/02 12:19 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by MARC P COOK on behalf of MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, MARK A. MURPHY Related [+] (COOK, MARC)
Related: [-] 20 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,21 Notice of Hearing filed by Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.
21 21 notice Hearing (Adv) Thu 06/02 11:15 AM
Notice of Hearing on Third Amended Motion for Remand Hearing Date: 07/27/2022 Hearing Time: 9:30 a.m. Filed by MARC P COOK on behalf of MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, MARK A. MURPHY Related [+](COOK, MARC)
Related: [-] 20 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.
20 20 motion Remand (Adv) Thu 06/02 11:06 AM
Amended Third Motion for Remand Filed by MARC P COOK on behalf of MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, MARK A. MURPHY Related [+] (COOK, MARC)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,12 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,15 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
19 19 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Wed 06/01 2:55 PM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.
18 18 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv) Wed 06/01 12:00 PM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 7/27/2022 at 09:30 AM at Remote. Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
17 17 adv_misc Certificate of Service (ADV) Tue 05/31 3:19 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by MARC P COOK on behalf of MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, MARK A. MURPHY Related [+] (COOK, MARC)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,16 Notice of Hearing filed by Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.
16 16 notice Hearing (Adv) Tue 05/31 11:32 AM
Notice of Hearing on Second Amended Motion for Remand Hearing Date: 07/27/2022 Hearing Time: 9:30 a.m. Filed by MARC P COOK on behalf of MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, MARK A. MURPHY Related [+](COOK, MARC)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.
15 15 motion Remand (Adv) Tue 05/31 10:56 AM
Amended Second Motion for Remand Filed by MARC P COOK on behalf of MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, MARK A. MURPHY Related [+] (COOK, MARC)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,12 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.
Friday, May 27, 2022
14 14 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Fri 05/27 12:55 PM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 12 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.
Thursday, May 26, 2022
13 13 adv_misc Certificate of Service (ADV) Thu 05/26 5:09 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by MARC P COOK on behalf of MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, MARK A. MURPHY Related [+] (COOK, MARC)
Related: [-] 12 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.
12 12 motion Remand (Adv) Thu 05/26 4:55 PM
Amended Motion for Remand Filed by MARC P COOK on behalf of MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, MARK A. MURPHY Related [+] (COOK, MARC)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.
11 11 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Thu 05/26 11:30 AM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (cly)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
10 10 adv_misc Certificate of Service (ADV) Wed 05/25 4:54 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by MARC P COOK on behalf of MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, MARK A. MURPHY Related [+] (COOK, MARC)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.
9 9 motion Remand (Adv) Wed 05/25 4:18 PM
Motion for Remand Filed by MARC P COOK on behalf of MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, MARK A. MURPHY (COOK, MARC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
8 8 adv_misc Certificate of Service (ADV) Tue 05/24 5:11 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by MARC P COOK on behalf of MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, MARK A. MURPHY Related [+] (COOK, MARC)
Related: [-] 7 Opposition filed by Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.
7 7 108 pgs answer Opposition Tue 05/24 4:52 PM
Opposition to Jeffrey Judd's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Countermotion to Strike Filed by MARC P COOK on behalf of MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, MARK A. MURPHY Related [+] (COOK, MARC)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant JEFFREY J. JUDD.
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
6 6 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Tue 05/10 9:07 AM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (cly)
Related: [-] 5 Document filed by Defendant J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION.
Monday, May 09, 2022
5 5 adv_misc Document (Adv) Mon 05/09 8:29 PM
Document Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9027(e)(3) Filed by GREGORY E GARMAN on behalf of J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION (GARMAN, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
4 4 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Tue 05/03 10:58 AM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (cly)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant JEFFREY J. JUDD.
Monday, May 02, 2022
3 3 29 pgs motion Dismiss (All Other) Mon 05/02 4:41 PM
Motion to Dismiss AMENDED COMPLAINT with Certificate of Service Filed by KEVIN N. ANDERSON on behalf of JEFFREY J. JUDD (ANDERSON, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
2 2 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference) Wed 04/27 11:45 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 9/8/2022 at 10:00 AM at Remote. Related [+] (cly)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, Plaintiff MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, Defendant PAULA BEASLEY, Defendant ECO BATTERY, LLC A UTAH LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, Defendant BJ HOLDINGS, LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.
Monday, April 25, 2022
1 1 20 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Mon 04/25 4:56 PM
Adversary case 22-01066 Notice of Removal of Mark A. Murphy, Mark A Murphy, LTD, DANIEL A AYALA against MATTHEW BEASLEY, AN INDIVIDUAL, BEASLEY LAW GROUP PC, A NEVADA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION, JEFFREY J. JUDD, AN INDIVIDUAL, J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION, J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, JASON JONGEWARD, AN INDIVIDUAL, SHANE M. JAGER, AN INDIVIDAUL. Fee Amount $350. (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))(91 (Declaratory judgment)(ANDERSON, KEVIN)
Related: [-]