Case Filed:Apr 25, 2022
Terminated:Apr 26, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 27, 2022 3:22 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Christopher S. Hess
U.S. Attorney'S Office--Wdnc
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Christopher Chappell (1)
Terminated: 04/26/2022
Represented By
W. Kelly Johnson
Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/27/2022 3:49 AM EDT
Friday, April 22, 2022
Arrest (Rule 5) of Christopher Chappell (mga)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Christopher Chappell: Initial Appearance - Rule 5 set for 4/26/2022 10:20 AM in Courtroom #1A, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Magistrate Judge David Keesler. (mga)
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED WDTX INDICTMENT (Sealed - Attorney) : (available to: USA)(mga)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Warrant