Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-05631
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2022
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:22-cv-00922
Last checked: Saturday Oct 29, 2022 6:06 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
LEROY M. BROWN
Represented By
William R Sieben
Schwebel Goetz & Sieben, P.A.
contact info
SAMUEL M WENDT
Wendt Law Firm Pc - Kansas City Mo
contact info


Docket last updated: 77 minutes ago
Friday, May 13, 2022
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 05/13 3:12 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by LEROY M. BROWN. (WENDT, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
12 12 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/27 9:42 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaint due by 5/17/2022 .) (djb)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 04/27 9:38 AM
NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION #1 Notice Regarding Electronic Filing Requirement as to William R. Sieben. (djb)
Related: [-]
10 10 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Wed 04/27 8:56 AM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:22-cv-00922. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
9 9 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-153) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers.(kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/27/2022.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
8 8 NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL re1 1 Notice of Removal filed by defendants. (Hulse, Benjamin) Modified text on 4/14/2022 (MMP). [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/27/2022.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
7 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement,1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/27/2022.]
Related: [-]
6 6 Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL #2885 re:1 Notice of Removal,. (ACH) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/27/2022.]
Related: [-]
5 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Samuel M. Wendt as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (ACH) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/27/2022.]
Related: [-]
4 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (MDL Direct Assign) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 22-cv-922 JRT/TNL. (ACH) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/27/2022.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement,1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/27/2022.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/27/2022.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9444009) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) Modified text on 4/13/2022 (MMP). [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/27/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint, ATTACHMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet