New Hampshire District Court
Judge:Landya B Mccafferty
Referred: Andrea K Johnstone
Case #: 1:22-cv-00143
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2022
Terminated:Aug 04, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Oct 22, 2022 4:47 AM EDT
Defendant
Exeter, NH, Town of
Defendant
Michael Ingenito
Defendant
Nicole Mazur
Defendant
Michael Munk
Defendant
Stephan Poulin
Defendant
Justin Ranauro
Defendant
Joseph M. Saluto
Defendant
Peter Sankowich
Defendant
William Shupe
Defendant
Bailey Teixeira
Plaintiff
Scott Normand McCarthy
44 Hampton Rd
Exeter, NH 03833

GPO Jun 07 2022
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint, 3 Amended Complaint recommending for the foregoing reasons, the district court should dismiss the plaintiff's complaint (Doc. no. 1) and amended complaint (Doc. no. 3) for failure to state a cognizable cause of action and close the case. Any objections to this Report and Recommendation must be filed within fourteen days of receipt of this notice. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 6/21/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(de)
GPO Aug 04 2022
/// ORDER dismissing 3 Motion to Amend/amended complaint; approving 4 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, August 04, 2022
7 7 order Judgment Thu 08/04 4:02 PM
JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with 6 Order on Motion, Order on Report and Recommendation. Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. (Case Closed). (de)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend Order on Report and Recommendation Thu 08/04 9:04 AM
/// ORDER dismissing 3 Motion to Amend/amended complaint; approving 4 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
5 5 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendation Mon 08/01 12:36 PM
OBJECTION to4 Report and Recommendation filed by Scott Normand McCarthy.(de)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: part 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1: part 2
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
4 4 motion Report and Recommendation Tue 06/07 4:39 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint, 3 Amended Complaint recommending for the foregoing reasons, the district court should dismiss the plaintiff's complaint (Doc. no. 1) and amended complaint (Doc. no. 3) for failure to state a cognizable cause of action and close the case. Any objections to this Report and Recommendation must be filed within fourteen days of receipt of this notice. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 6/21/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(de)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
3 3 motion Amend Thu 05/12 12:51 PM
MOTION to Amend Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Scott Normand McCarthy.Follow up on Objection on 5/18/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(de)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
notice Notice - ECF Wed 04/27 2:57 PM
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] . (mc)
Related: [-]
order Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs Thu 04/28 9:42 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Text of Order: Plaintiff's request to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs is hereby granted, but only for the purpose of waiving the filing fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch.(mc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
2 2 motion Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs Wed 04/27 9:00 AM
MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs filed by Scott Normand McCarthy.(mc)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/27 8:50 AM
COMPLAINT against Exeter, NH, Town of, Michael Ingenito, Nicole Mazur, Michael Munk, Stephan Poulin, Justin Ranauro, Joseph M. Saluto, Peter Sankowich, William Shupe, Bailey Teixeira with Jury Demand filed by Scott Normand McCarthy.(mc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summonses
utility Case Assigned Wed 04/27 2:56 PM
Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-143-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
Related: [-]