Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-05704
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Oct 29, 2022 5:49 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Plaintiff
ROBERT BOYD
Represented By
JONATHAN ERIC SCHULMAN
Slater Slater Schulman - Melville Ny
contact info


Docket last updated: 23 minutes ago
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
2 2 16 pgs order Order Fri 01/20 11:00 AM
ORDER. For any plaintiff failing to submit a census form by February 8, 2023, his/her case will be dismissed with prejudice, in light of repeated failures to comply. (Pretrial Order No. 18 / Pretrial Order No. 81 and this Order). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/18/2023. (erl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 28, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/28 10:20 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6967546.), filed by ROBERT BOYD. (SCHULMAN, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet