Empire Group, LLC v. Fortegra Specialty Insurance Company
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jay C Zainey |
Referred: | Karen Wells Roby |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-01193 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 29, 2022 |
Terminated: | Dec 20, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 26, 2022 4:02 AM CDT |
Defendant
Fortegra Specialty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Empire Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, December 20, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
Tue 12/20 3:05 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Dismiss Case with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 12/20/2022. (mmm) |
|
Monday, December 19, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss Case
Mon 12/19 4:57 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Case with Prejudice by Empire Group, LLC.(Middleton, Troy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 27, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
27
pgs
order
Order
Thu 10/27 1:56 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 with exhibits. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/22.(lag) |
|
Thursday, September 15, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Thu 09/15 10:29 AM
ORDER Permitting Parties to Opt-In to the Streamlined Settlement Program. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 9/14/2022.(ajn) |
|
Wednesday, September 14, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
4
pgs
order
Order
Wed 09/14 4:47 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 09/14/22.(my) |
|
Tuesday, September 13, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 09/13 2:38 PM
NOTICE by Fortegra Specialty Insurance Company re11 Order Consent to Opt In to Streamlines Settlement Program for Hurricane Ida Cases . (Bohren, Tucker) |
|
Thursday, September 01, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 09/01 11:55 AM
NOTICE of Opportunity to Opt In to the In Re Hurricane Ida Streamlined Settlement Program. (lag) |
|
10 | 10
21
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Thu 09/01 11:55 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 08/26/22.(lag) |
|
Wednesday, August 24, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order Set Hearings
Wed 08/24 12:25 PM
NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2022 09:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (blg) |
|
Tuesday, July 12, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Statement of Corporate Disclosure
Tue 07/12 3:26 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Fortegra Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Tiptree Inc. for Fortegra Specialty Insurance Company (Bohren, Tucker) |
|
Wednesday, June 22, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 06/22 11:03 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Fortegra Specialty Insurance Company.(Bohren, Tucker) |
|
Thursday, June 02, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 06/02 4:23 PM
ORDER Granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, as to Fortegra Specialty Insurance Company, answer due 6/22/2022. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 6/2/2022. (ajn) |
|
Wednesday, June 01, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 06/01 12:24 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, by Fortegra Specialty Insurance Company.Attorney Tucker Tyler Bohren added to party Fortegra Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Bohren, Tucker) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 17, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/17 5:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Fortegra Specialty Insurance Company served on 5/11/2022, answer due 6/1/2022. (Middleton, Troy) |
|
Monday, May 02, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 05/02 11:42 AM
Summons Issued as to Fortegra Specialty Insurance Company. (cwa) |
|
Friday, April 29, 2022 | ||
2 | 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess) | |
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/29 4:15 PM
COMPLAINT against Fortegra Specialty Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9338715) filed by Empire Group, LLC.Attorney Troy Houston Middleton, IV added to party Empire Group, LLC(pty:pla).(Middleton, Troy) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 04/29 4:33 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess) |