California Central District Court
Judge:R Gary Klausner
Referred: Michael R Wilner
Case #: 5:22-cv-00735
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2022
Terminated:Aug 05, 2022
Case in other court:Texas Western, 3:22-cv-00146

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, August 05, 2022
14 14 order Certificate of Appealability - Order of USDC Tue 08/09 3:03 PM
ORDER DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY by Judge R. Gary Klausner re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241)1 . (see document for details) (hr)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Dismissing Case Tue 08/09 2:54 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The petition must be denied and the action dismissed with prejudice. (see document for further details) Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (hr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
12 12 misc Reply Thu 07/14 7:55 AM
REPLY to Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Petitioner Pedro Marquez.10 (vm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2022
11 11 1 pgs order Order Thu 06/23 9:03 AM
ORDER RE: PETITIONERS OPTIONAL REPLY TO ATTORNEY GENERALS ANSWER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Petitioner may file an optional reply to the answer by or before Friday, July 22, 2022. (See Minute Order for further details) re Response in Opposition to Motion10 (vm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
10 10 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 06/22 10:15 AM
OPPOSITION filed by Respondent UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Mirell, Hava)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Angela Kelly,
Att: 2 Exhibits A-L,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Thursday, May 19, 2022
misc Financial Entry Thu 05/19 7:37 AM
FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $5.00 from Pedro Marquez. Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241)1 . Receipt number LA238799. (jo)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
8 8 order Continue Mon 05/16 8:55 AM
ORDER GRANTING RESPONDENTS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TIME FOR RESPONSE TO PETITIONER PEDRO MARQUEZS PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 2241 by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Respondents response to petitioner Pedro Marquezs Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241 shall be due on June 22, 2022. Petitioners optional reply shall be due July 22, 2022. granting7 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue (vm)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2022
7 7 motion Continue Fri 05/13 8:59 AM
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Respondent's Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus from June 1, 2022 to June 22, 2022 filed by Respondent UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Mirell, Hava)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, May 05, 2022
6 6 attorney Attorney Appearance or Reassignment for the USA Thu 05/05 2:28 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Assistant United States Attorney Hava Mirell on behalf of Respondent UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Assistant United States Attorney Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV terminated. (Attorney Hava Arin Levenson Mirell added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:res))(Mirell, Hava)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2022
5 5 3 pgs order Order Requiring Return/Answer to Petition Mon 05/02 9:27 AM
ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Respondent UNITED STATES OF AMERICA to file Motion to Dismiss/Answer to the Petition no later than June 1, 2022. Reply due by July 1, 2022. (See Minute Order for further details) Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (vm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Petition,
Att: 2 Transfer Order,
Att: 3 Docket Sheet
Friday, April 29, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas) - optional html form Fri 04/29 12:35 PM
NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (car) (car).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-111 Letter Re Habeas Corpus Petition,
Att: 2 CV-38 Letter RE Habeas Corpus Transfer-In
Att: 3 (4/29/2022) IFP Form
3 3 transfer Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer) Fri 04/29 12:28 PM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Texas Western
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 28, 2022
2 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA, EASTERN DIVISION.. Signed by Judge David Briones. (lc3) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2022.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
1 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (No filing fee and no motion for IFP filed), filed by Pedro Marquez.(lc3) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2022.]
Related: [-]
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge BERTON (lc3) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2022.]
Related: [-]