California Central District Court
Judge:Fred W Slaughter
Case #: 8:22-cv-00890
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BAP)
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2022
Terminated:Jan 12, 2023
Case in other court:9th CCA, 23-55099 USBC - Santa Ana Division, 8:10-bk-16593-MW

Debtor
James A. and Elizabeth C. Zachman

,
Last checked: Friday Dec 27, 2024 11:35 AM PST
Appellant
Elizabeth C. Zachman
49737 Anacapa Circle
La Quinta, CA 92253
Appellant
James A. Zachman
49737 Anacapa Circle
La Qinta, CA 92253
Appellee
Morris James LLP
Represented By
Megan M. Adeyemo
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Candice S. Nam
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Jeffrey D Cawdrey
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Appellee
Real Time Data Services LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey D Cawdrey
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Appellee
State of Delaware
Represented By
Krikor John Meshefejian
Levene Neale Bender Yoo And Golubchik LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, January 17, 2025
27 27 1 pgs appeal USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order Fri 01/17 2:15 PM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals23 filed by Elizabeth C. Zachman, James A. Zachman. CCA # 23-55099 Appellants' motion requesting publication of the memorandum disposition in this case is DENIED. (mat)
Related: [-]
26 26 1 pgs appeal USCA Mandate Fri 01/17 1:58 PM
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals23 , CCA # 23-55099 The judgment of this Court, entered December 26, 2024, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Memorandum25 AFFIRMED.](mat)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
25 25 7 pgs appeal USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order Fri 12/27 10:38 AM
MEMORANDUM from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals23 filed by Elizabeth C. Zachman, James A. Zachman. CCA # 23-55099 We affirm the district court's order. AFFIRMED. See document for more details.](mat)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
appeal Appeal Fees Paid Mon 02/13 12:17 PM
APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals23 as to In re Debtor James A. and Elizabeth C. Zachman; Receipt Number: SA018302 in the amount of $505. (dta)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
24 24 3 pgs appeal USCA Notification of Case Number Wed 02/01 3:47 PM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 23-55099 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals23 as to Appellants Elizabeth C. Zachman, James A. Zachman. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
23 23 14 pgs appeal Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Tue 01/24 1:43 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Appellants Elizabeth C. Zachman, James A. Zachman. Appeal of Bankruptcy Appeal Case Decision,, Terminated Case,22 Filed On: 1/12/23; Entered On: 1/13/23; Filing fee $ 505. Billed. (mat)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2023
22 22 8 pgs order Bankruptcy Appeal Case Decision ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 01/13 4:02 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Affirming Judgment of the Bankruptcy Court11 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The court AFFIRMS the bankruptcy court's order ' "enying Debtors Motion to Withdraw and Defective Pleading for Violation of the Automatic Stay and Discharge Injunction." (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) See document for further information. (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 09/27 10:35 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Before the Court is Appellant's Bankruptcy Appeal. The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for September 29, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED and the Court takes the matter UNDER SUBMISSION. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
20 20 1 pgs order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/09 11:10 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING HEARING ON BANKRUPTCY APPEAL by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Briefing in this appeal has concluded18 . Accordingly, the court sets a hearing on the parties' submissions on 9/29/2022, at 10:00 AM. The hearing shall proceed on Zoom. (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
19 19 attorney Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06) Tue 08/02 12:06 PM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Krikor John Meshefejian counsel for Appellee State of Delaware. Changing address and firm name to Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Golubchik L.L.P., 2818 La Cienega Avenue, Los Angeles, California 90034. Changing kjm@lnbyg.com to kjm@lnbyg.com. Filed by Appellee State of Delaware. (Meshefejian, Krikor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
18 18 8 pgs bankruptcy Appellants Reply Brief Fri 07/22 2:20 PM
APPELLANTS REPLY BRIEF filed by Appellants Elizabeth C. Zachman, James A. Zachman. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
17 17 17 pgs misc Response Mon 07/11 2:12 PM
RESPONSE filed by Appellee Morris James LLPto Appellants Opening Brief11 (Adeyemo, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Friday, July 08, 2022
16 16 4 pgs misc Appendix Fri 07/08 4:07 PM
APPENDIX filed by Appellee State of Delaware. Re: Appellees Reply Brief15 / Appellee State of Delaware's Appendix (Supplemental Excerpts of Record)(Meshefejian, Krikor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 18 pgs Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 3 pgs Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 15 pgs Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 131 pgs Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 10 pgs Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 3 pgs Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 7 pgs Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 27 pgs Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 8 pgs Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 12 pgs Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 2 pgs Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 3 pgs Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Proof of Service
15 15 26 pgs bankruptcy Appellees Reply Brief Fri 07/08 4:01 PM
APPELLEES REPLY BRIEF filed by Appellee State of Delaware. (Meshefejian, Krikor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
13 13 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 06/15 2:27 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Appellee Morris James LLP, re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Megan M. Adeyemo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Appellee Morris James LLP (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 6/14/2022, Receipt No. 33457634)12 served on June 15, 2022. (Nam, Candice)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 06/15 1:30 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Megan M. Adeyemo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Appellee Morris James LLP (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 6/14/2022, Receipt No. 33457634) filed by Appellee Morris James LLP. (Attorney Candice S Nam added to party Morris James LLP(pty:e)) (Nam, Candice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 06/15 2:50 PM
Text Only ORDER GRANTING Application of Non-Resident Attorney Megan M. Adeyemo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Appellee Morris James LLP9 12 pursuant to the Courts directive. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
10 10 notice Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form Tue 06/14 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Megan M. Adeyemo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Appellee Morris James LLP (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33457634)9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lt)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Mon 06/13 11:04 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Megan M. Adeyemo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Appellee Morris James LLP (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33457634) filed by Appellee Morris James LLP. (Cawdrey, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2022
11 11 233 pgs bankruptcy Appellants Opening Brief Wed 06/15 1:07 PM
APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF filed by Appellant James A. Zachman. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
8 8 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 05/16 3:10 PM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Appelle Morris James LLP, (Cawdrey, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
7 7 3 pgs notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 05/16 8:18 AM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Appellee State of Delaware, (Meshefejian, Krikor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
6 6 1 pgs bankruptcy Notice Re: Bankruptcy Record Complete (CV-8) - optional html form Wed 05/11 5:03 PM
NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 6/10/2022. (jp)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs appeal Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability Wed 05/11 5:02 PM
Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re Certificate of Readiness and Completion of Record on Appeal1 . (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2022
4 4 2 pgs adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 04/29 4:59 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs bankruptcy Notice Regarding Appeal from Bankruptcy Court (CV-26) - optional html form Fri 04/29 4:58 PM
NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Fred W. Slaughter. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (lh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 28, 2022
2 2 1 pgs bankruptcy Notice of Referral of Appeal (Adversary) - Bankruptcy Fri 04/29 4:55 PM
NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF APPEAL to District Court, prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 4/28/2022. (lh)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment Fri 04/29 4:54 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL and STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: Order Denying Debtors Motion to Withdraw and Defective Pleading for Violation of the Automatic Stay and Discharge Injunction entered on 3/23/2022 by Bankruptcy Judge Theodor C. Albert, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 3/30/2022. Bankruptcy Court case number: 8:10-bk-16593-MW, Adversary number: None, BAP case number: CC 22-1064 , filed by Appellants Elizabeth C. Zachman, James A. Zachman. (lh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs BAP Docket,
Att: 2 9 pgs USBC Docket