Original Case: 1:15-cv-00321

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-15638
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2022
Terminated:Jul 03, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 05, 2023 1:27 AM PDT
Defendant
RPM WOOD FINISHES GROUP, INC.
Defendant - Appellant
GUARDIAN PROTECTION PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By
Margaret Drugan
Gordon & Rees, LLP
contact info
Calvin E. Davis
Gordon & Rees, LLP
contact info
Aaron P. Rudin
Gordon & Rees, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
G.P.P., INC., DBA Guardian Innovative Solutions
Represented By
Colleen Bal
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC
contact info
John Paul Flynn
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC
contact info
Dylan James Liddiard
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
contact info
Steffen Nathanael Johnson
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/05/2023 1:25 AM PDT
Thursday, April 28, 2022
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Appellant Guardian Protection Products, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/05/2022. First cross appeal brief due 07/25/2022 for G.P.P., Inc.. Second brief on cross appeal due 08/25/2022 for Guardian Protection Products, Inc.. Third brief on cross appeal due 09/26/2022 for G.P.P., Inc. Optional cross appeal Reply brief for Guardian Protection Products, Inc. is due within 21 days of service of Third brief on cross appeal. [12434035] 22-15638 22-15569 (RT) [Entered: 04/28/2022 04:10 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 2 pgs Cross Appeal Chart
Att: 4 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 5 2 pgs Mediation Questionnaire
Att: 6 22 pgs Case Opening Packet