Colorado District Court
Judge:Nina Y Wang
Referred: Kristen L Mix
Case #: 1:22-cv-01058
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:May 02, 2022
Terminated:Oct 04, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Oct 29, 2022 3:44 AM MDT
Defendant
Drives at Mile High, Ltd
Plaintiff
Jackie Shumaker
Represented By
Sergio Calderon Baron
Image Theft Law Firm, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Tue 10/04 7:22 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Jackie Shumaker (Calderon Baron, Sergio)
Related: [-]
order Minute Order Tue 10/04 9:18 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. The Notice is self-effectuating pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The Clerk of Court is therefore DIRECTED to terminate this action. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/04/2022. Text Only Entry (nywlc4,)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC Wed 10/05 9:35 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice13 and Minute Order 14 filed in this case on 10/4/2022. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2022
12 12 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Mon 08/08 8:23 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackie Shumaker. Drives at Mile High, Ltd served on 7/15/2022, answer due 8/5/2022. (Calderon Baron, Sergio)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Unexecuted - Complaint Mon 08/08 8:16 AM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jackie Shumaker as to Drives at Mile High, Ltd. (Calderon Baron, Sergio)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 08/03 8:12 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for non-dispositive matters . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/3/2022. Text Only Entry (nywlc3, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
misc Reassigning Judge Thu 07/28 4:35 PM
Due to the recent appointment of Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang as a United States District Judge, this action will now be updated to reflect her new designation as District Judge Nina Y. Wang. District Judge Wang shall retain assignment to this action as presiding judge. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-1058-NYW. (Text only entry) (sapod, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
8 8 minutes Status Conference Wed 07/20 12:44 PM
COURTROOM MINUTES for Status Conference held on 7/20/2022 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. FTR: NYW-FTR. (cpomm, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
order Minute Order Fri 07/08 10:43 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for 7/20/2022 at 10:00 AM is hereby CONVERTED to a Telephonic Status Conference. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976#. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/8/2022. Text Only Entry (nywlc3, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 06, 2022
6 6 2 pgs order Order Fri 05/06 4:10 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 05/06/2022. Consent Form due by 6/29/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/13/2022. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 7/20/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (alave, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2022
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/02 12:29 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Jackie Shumaker (Calderon Baron, Sergio)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Summons Issued Mon 05/02 10:52 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (jcharl, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
Related: [-]
2 2 Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Patent, Trademark, or Copyright Action case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party commencing the action to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 3.1. Please file a properly completed Report form, which can be found on the courts website.(jcharl, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/02 8:51 AM
COMPLAINT against Drives At Mile High Ltd (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8435337)Attorney Sergio Calderon Baron added to party Jackie Shumaker(pty:pla), filed by Jackie Shumaker.(Calderon Baron, Sergio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover,
Att: 2 Summons Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Registration,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Infringement,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Notifications
misc Administrative Notice Mon 05/02 10:46 AM
Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Patent, Trademark, or Copyright Action case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party commencing the action to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 3.1. Please file a properly completed Report form, which can be found on the courts website.(jcharl, )
Related: [-]
misc Case Assigned to Judge Mon 05/02 10:48 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
Related: [-]