New York Southern District Court
Judge:Denise L Cote
Case #: 1:22-cv-03537
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:12112 Americans with Disabilities Act - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:May 02, 2022
Terminated:Oct 18, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Oct 29, 2022 5:46 AM EDT
Defendant
Sandra Finkelstein
Represented By
Ashley Jean Hale
Morgan Lewis & Bockius, Llp (ny)
contact info
Elisa Egonu
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius
contact info
Richard G. Rosenblatt
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius Llp(nj)
contact info
Defendant
Amazon.com Services, LLC
Represented By
Ashley Jean Hale
Morgan Lewis & Bockius, Llp (ny)
contact info
Elisa Egonu
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius
contact info
Richard G. Rosenblatt
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius Llp(nj)
contact info
Plaintiff
Brittany Hope
Represented By
Alexandra Tracey Berke
Berke-Weiss Law PLLC
contact info
Laurie Berke-Weiss
Berke-Weiss Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
25 25 1 pgs order Order of Discontinuance ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 10/18 10:36 AM
ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE... It is hereby ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's calendar if the application to restore the action is made by November 14, 2022. If no such application is made by that date, today's dismissal of the action is with prejudice. See Muze, Inc. v. Digital On Demand, Inc., 356 F.3d 492, 494 n.l (2d Cir. 2004)., ( Motions due by 11/14/2022.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/17/22) (yv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Wed 08/24 3:08 PM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 9/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Mediator's Office.(mnp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Thu 07/28 8:36 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 8/29/2022.(rpr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
23 23 1 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 07/12 1:19 PM
ORDER: An Order of May 3, 2022 scheduled an initial pretrial conference for July 15, 2022. It is hereby ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference is adjourned until Friday, October 21, 2022, at 3:00 p.m. Initial Conference set for 10/21/2022 at 3:00 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/12/2022) (vfr)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/12 12:44 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laurie Berke-Weiss on behalf of Brittany Hope..(Berke-Weiss, Laurie)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
21 21 6 pgs order Order of Automatic Referral to Mediation Tue 07/12 9:33 AM
ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 7/21/2022. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (jpt)
Related: [-]
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/11 7:15 PM
ANSWER to4 Complaint. Document filed by Sandra Finkelstein..(Hale, Ashley)
Related: [-]
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/11 7:12 PM
ANSWER to4 Complaint. Document filed by Amazon.com Services, LLC..(Hale, Ashley)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 07/11 7:10 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com, Inc. for Amazon.com Services, LLC. Document filed by Amazon.com Services, LLC..(Hale, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 07/07 9:32 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Richard G. Rosenblatt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (jwh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Wed 07/06 10:30 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 16 MOTION for Richard G. Rosenblatt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26369612. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/05 4:29 PM
MOTION for Richard G. Rosenblatt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26369612. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Amazon.com Services, LLC, Sandra Finkelstein..(Rosenblatt, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 06/29 3:43 PM
ORDER granting14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/29/2022) (vfr)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 06/29 2:47 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Ashley J. Hale dated June 29, 2022. Document filed by Amazon.com Services, LLC..(Hale, Ashley)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 06/29 3:44 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Amazon.com Services, LLC answer due 7/11/2022. (vfr)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/13 2:25 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elisa Egonu on behalf of Amazon.com Services, LLC, Sandra Finkelstein..(Egonu, Elisa)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/13 2:22 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ashley Jean Hale on behalf of Amazon.com Services, LLC, Sandra Finkelstein..(Hale, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
11 11 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 05/11 3:17 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference by telephone set for 7/15/2022 at 2:00 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote. The parties shall use the following dial-in credentials for the conference. Dial-in: 888-363-4749 Access code: 4324948. The parties shall use a landline if one is available. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/11/2022) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/10 4:24 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Sandra Finkelstein waiver sent on 5/10/2022, answer due 7/11/2022. Document filed by Brittany Hope..(Berke, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 05, 2022
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 05/05 9:11 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Amazon.com Services, LLC waiver sent on 5/4/2022, answer due 7/5/2022. Document filed by Brittany Hope..(Berke, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Thu 05/05 5:36 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
8 8 service Summons Issued Tue 05/03 3:25 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amazon.com Services, LLC..(gp)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 05/03 3:25 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sandra Finkelstein..(gp)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 05/03 1:57 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sandra Finkelstein, re:4 Complaint. Document filed by Brittany Hope..(Berke, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 05/03 1:56 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amazon.Com Services LLC, re:4 Complaint. Document filed by Brittany Hope..(Berke, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Complaint Tue 05/03 1:29 PM
COMPLAINT against Amazon.com Services, LLC, Sandra Finkelstein. Document filed by Brittany Hope..(Berke, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EEOC Right to Sue Notice
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Tue 05/03 12:34 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Alexandra Tracey Berke. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Tue 05/03 12:36 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Alexandra Tracey Berke. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 442 (Civil Rights: Jobs); County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 445 (Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment); the County code has been modified to Kings. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Tue 05/03 12:37 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Alexandra Tracey Berke to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 05/03 12:39 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 05/03 12:40 PM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 05/03 12:40 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 05/03 12:43 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Alexandra Tracey Berke to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct. Docket Entry Error. Enter the the party name as to whom the summons is issued for when prompted in ECF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Tue 05/03 5:13 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2022
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 05/02 4:02 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amazon.Com Services LLC and Sandra Finkelstein, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Brittany Hope..(Berke, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 05/02 3:57 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Berke, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
1 1 25 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 05/02 3:55 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26088367)Document filed by Brittany Hope..(Berke, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EEOC Right to Sue Notice