New Jersey District Court
Judge:Susan D Wigenton
Referred: Jose R Almonte
Case #: 2:22-cv-02590
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 02, 2022
Terminated:Jan 20, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Oct 29, 2022 5:22 AM EDT
Defendant
ALI AZIZ
Represented By
GREG K. VITALI
Lindabury, Mccormick & Estabook, PC
contact info
Defendant
JALIS DHUKA
Represented By
GREG K. VITALI
Lindabury, Mccormick & Estabook, PC
contact info
Defendant
LAILA DHUKA
Represented By
GREG K. VITALI
Lindabury, Mccormick & Estabook, PC
contact info
Defendant
MOEZ DHUKA
Represented By
GREG K. VITALI
Lindabury, Mccormick & Estabook, PC
contact info
Defendant
ELAN ENERGY PARTNERS LLC
Represented By
GREG K. VITALI
Lindabury, Mccormick & Estabook, PC
contact info
Defendant
MOLA PROPERTIES, INC.
Represented By
GREG K. VITALI
Lindabury, Mccormick & Estabook, PC
contact info
Defendant
ADAM TREVILLIAN
Represented By
GREG K. VITALI
Lindabury, Mccormick & Estabook, PC
contact info
Defendant
VALERIE TREVILLIAN
Represented By
GREG K. VITALI
Lindabury, Mccormick & Estabook, PC
contact info
Defendant
MICHELLE ZARBINSKI
Defendant
SEAN ZARBINSKI
Plaintiff
SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By
ADAM RAFE SCHWARTZ
Mcelroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP
contact info
MICHAEL CHRISTIAN DELANEY
Mcelroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 68 minutes ago
Thursday, May 18, 2023
55 55 order Stipulation and Order Thu 05/18 12:59 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendants Elan Energy Partners LLC d/b/a Elan Renewables, Mola Properties, Inc., Adam Trevillian, Valerie Trevillian, Ali Aziz, Jalis Dhuka, Moez Dhuka and Laila Dhuka. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 5/18/2023. (mxw)
Related: [-]
54 54 order Stipulation and Order Thu 05/18 12:58 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendants Sean and Michelle Zarbinski. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 5/18/2023. (mxw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
53 53 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Wed 05/17 5:09 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Zarbinski Defendants by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (DELANEY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
52 52 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Wed 05/17 5:08 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Texas Defendants by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (DELANEY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]