California Southern District Court
Judge:Larry Alan Burns
Referred: Daniel E Butcher
Case #: 3:22-cv-00618
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332fr Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:May 02, 2022
Terminated:Nov 16, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Oct 29, 2022 3:14 AM PDT
Defendant
Age Crypto LLC
Defendant
bZeroX LLC
Represented By
Michael Gregory Freedman
The Freedman Firm
contact info
Daniel C. Isaacs
Morrison Cohen, LLP
contact info
Michael J. Gleason
Hahn Loeser & Parks LLP
contact info
Jason Philip Gottlieb
Morrison Cohen LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tom Bean
Represented By
Daniel C. Isaacs
Morrison Cohen, LLP
contact info
Michael J. Gleason
Hahn Loeser & Parks LLP
contact info
Jason Philip Gottlieb
Morrison Cohen LLP
contact info
Defendant
bZx DAO
Represented By
Michael Gregory Freedman
The Freedman Firm
contact info
Defendant
Hashed International LLC
Represented By
Brandon S. Reif
Reif Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Kyle Kistner
Represented By
Daniel C. Isaacs
Morrison Cohen, LLP
contact info
Michael J. Gleason
Hahn Loeser & Parks LLP
contact info
Jason Philip Gottlieb
Morrison Cohen LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ooki DAO
Defendant
Leveragebox LLC
Represented By
Daniel C. Isaacs
Morrison Cohen, LLP
contact info
Michael J. Gleason
Hahn Loeser & Parks LLP
contact info
Jason Philip Gottlieb
Morrison Cohen LLP
contact info
Defendant
AGE Crypto GP LLC
Represented By
Brandon S. Reif
Reif Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Hctor Albert Gonzlez Terrn
Represented By
Jason Seth Harrow
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jonas Wernecke
Represented By
Jason Seth Harrow
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Clement Ometek
Represented By
Jason Seth Harrow
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Pilici Rustam
Represented By
Jason Seth Harrow
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Marc-Julien Lie
Represented By
Jason Seth Harrow
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Shuai Lu
Represented By
Jason Seth Harrow
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sooraj Narayanan
Represented By
Jason Seth Harrow
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Simon Schmid
Represented By
Jason Seth Harrow
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mannu Singh
Represented By
Jason Seth Harrow
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Skliar Viktor
Represented By
Jason Seth Harrow
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Marc Simon
Represented By
Jason Seth Harrow
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Christian Sarcuni
Represented By
Jason Seth Harrow
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniele Penna
Represented By
Jason Seth Harrow
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Lu
Represented By
Jason Seth Harrow
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alexander Lloyd
Represented By
Jason Seth Harrow
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Paolo Leite
Represented By
Jason Seth Harrow
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Miras Issakhov
Represented By
Jason Seth Harrow
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Edison Ho
Represented By
Jason Seth Harrow
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Pedro Cunha
Represented By
Jason Seth Harrow
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kiro Aleksandrov
Represented By
Jason Seth Harrow
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 27 2023
ORDER Denying in Part and Granting in Part 27 Motion to Dismiss; Denying 27 Motion to Strike; and Denying 31 Motion to Dismiss. To the extent Plaintiffs wish to amend their claims, they may do so by filing a Second Amended Complaint by 4/10/2023, in accordance with the Southern District's Civil Local Rules and this Court's Civil Standing Order. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/27/2023. (rmc)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, November 16, 2023
79 79 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 11/16 11:50 AM
ORDER77 of Dismissal. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this action, including all claims and counterclaims, is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/16/2023. (rmc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
78 78 order Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings Mon 11/13 11:00 AM
ORDER Vacating Settlement Disposition Conference ("SDC"). In light of the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal77 , the Court VACATES the SDC on 11/17/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 11/13/2023.(no document attached) (smd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
77 77 motion Dismiss Thu 11/09 9:02 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Kiro Aleksandrov, Pedro Cunha, Hctor Albert Gonzlez Terrn, Edison Ho, Miras Issakhov, Paolo Leite, Marc-Julien Lie, Alexander Lloyd, Daniel Lu, Shuai Lu, Sooraj Narayanan, Clement Ometek, Daniele Penna, Pilici Rustam, Christian Sarcuni, Simon Schmid, Marc Simon, Mannu Singh, Skliar Viktor, Jonas Wernecke (Harrow, Jason) QC mail sent re motion filed as notice - Civ LR 7.2 (rmc)
Related: [-]