Wyoming District Court
Judge:Scott W Skavdahl
Referred: Kelly H Rankin
Case #: 2:20-cv-00215
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Nov 25, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday May 03, 2022 9:07 PM MDT
Defendant
Trinity Teen Solutions Inc
Represented By
Lillian Alves
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Thomas B Quinn
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Defendant
Angela C Woodward
Represented By
Lillian Alves
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Thomas B Quinn
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jerry D Woodward
Represented By
Lillian Alves
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Thomas B Quinn
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kara Woodward
Represented By
Lillian Alves
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Thomas B Quinn
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Defendant
Dally-Up LLC
Represented By
Lillian Alves
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Thomas B Quinn
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kyle Woodward
Represented By
Lillian Alves
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Thomas B Quinn
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Interested Party
United States Attorney
Represented By
Kristina Wolfe
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Jasmine M Peters
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
Carlie Sherman
Represented By
Craig A Edgington
Donati Law
contact info
Michael B Rosenthal
Hathaway & Kunz
contact info
Bryce Ashby
Donati Law, PLLC
contact info
William Edward Routt, III
Watson Burns PLLC
contact info
Nathan A Nicholas
Hathaway & Kunz LLP
contact info
Frank L Watson, III
Watsonburns LLC
contact info
Brice Moffatt Timmons
Donati Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Amanda Nash
Represented By
Craig A Edgington
Donati Law
contact info
Michael B Rosenthal
Hathaway & Kunz
contact info
Bryce Ashby
Donati Law, PLLC
contact info
William Edward Routt, III
Watson Burns PLLC
contact info
Nathan A Nicholas
Hathaway & Kunz LLP
contact info
Frank L Watson, III
Watsonburns LLC
contact info
Brice Moffatt Timmons
Donati Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Anna Gozun
Represented By
Craig A Edgington
Donati Law
contact info
Michael B Rosenthal
Hathaway & Kunz
contact info
Bryce Ashby
Donati Law, PLLC
contact info
William Edward Routt, III
Watson Burns PLLC
contact info
Nathan A Nicholas
Hathaway & Kunz LLP
contact info
Frank L Watson, III
Watsonburns LLC
contact info
Brice Moffatt Timmons
Donati Law, PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
New Mount Carmel Foundation Inc
Terminated: 11/30/2021
Represented By
Patricia K Buchanan
Patterson Buchanan Fobes & Leitch
contact info
Rick L Koehmstedt
Schwartz Bon Walker & Studer
contact info
Defendant
Triangle Cross Ranch LLC
Terminated: 01/12/2022
Represented By
John Matthews
White & Steele PC
contact info
Monty L Barnett
White & Steele P.C.
contact info
Keith R Olivera
White & Steele PC
contact info
Rachel E Ryckman
White & Steele
contact info
Defendant
Society of Our Lady of the Most Holy Trinity
Terminated: 01/12/2022
Represented By
Jane Marie France
Sundahl Powers Kapp & Martin
contact info
Alexis S Mullaney
Sodoro Mooney Lenaghan
contact info
MaKenna Stoakes
Sodoro Law Group
contact info
Patrick Sodoro
Sodoro, Mooney, Lenaghan
contact info
Defendant
Michaeleen P Schneider
Terminated: 01/12/2022
Represented By
John Matthews
White & Steele PC
contact info
Monty L Barnett
White & Steele P.C.
contact info
Keith R Olivera
White & Steele PC
contact info
Rachel E Ryckman
White & Steele
contact info
Defendant
Mathew Schneider
Terminated: 01/12/2022
Represented By
John Matthews
White & Steele PC
contact info
Monty L Barnett
White & Steele P.C.
contact info
Keith R Olivera
White & Steele PC
contact info
Rachel E Ryckman
White & Steele
contact info
Defendant
Mark Schneider
Terminated: 01/12/2022
Represented By
John Matthews
White & Steele PC
contact info
Monty L Barnett
White & Steele P.C.
contact info
Keith R Olivera
White & Steele PC
contact info
Rachel E Ryckman
White & Steele
contact info
Defendant
Gerald E Schneider
Terminated: 01/12/2022
Represented By
John Matthews
White & Steele PC
contact info
Monty L Barnett
White & Steele P.C.
contact info
Keith R Olivera
White & Steele PC
contact info
Rachel E Ryckman
White & Steele
contact info
Defendant
Daniel Schneider
Terminated: 11/30/2021
Represented By
Traci L Lacock
Hirst Applegate LLP
contact info
Brian C Fries
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Mara H. Cohara
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Defendant
Rock Creek Ranch Inc
Terminated: 11/30/2021
Represented By
Timothy Michael Stubson
Crowley Fleck Pllp
contact info
Zenith S Ward
Buchhammer & Ward
contact info
Defendant
Monks of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary of Mount Carmel
Terminated: 11/30/2021
Represented By
Traci L Lacock
Hirst Applegate LLP
contact info
Brian C Fries
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Mara H. Cohara
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Defendant
Judith D Jefferis
Terminated: 11/30/2021
Represented By
Timothy Michael Stubson
Crowley Fleck Pllp
contact info
Zenith S Ward
Buchhammer & Ward
contact info
Defendant
Thomas George
Terminated: 01/12/2022
Represented By
John Matthews
White & Steele PC
contact info
Monty L Barnett
White & Steele P.C.
contact info
Keith R Olivera
White & Steele PC
contact info
Rachel E Ryckman
White & Steele
contact info
Defendant
Diocese of Cheyenne
Terminated: 11/30/2021
Represented By
Loyd E Smith
Hickey & Evans LLP
contact info
Paul J Hickey
Hickey & Evans LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrew Scavuzzo
Terminated: 01/12/2022
Represented By
Craig A Edgington
Donati Law
contact info
Michael B Rosenthal
Hathaway & Kunz
contact info
Bryce Ashby
Donati Law, PLLC
contact info
Nathan A Nicholas
Hathaway & Kunz LLP
contact info
Frank L Watson, III
Watsonburns LLC
contact info
Brice Moffatt Timmons
Donati Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ehan Jelinek
Terminated: 01/12/2022
Represented By
Craig A Edgington
Donati Law
contact info
Michael B Rosenthal
Hathaway & Kunz
contact info
Bryce Ashby
Donati Law, PLLC
contact info
Nathan A Nicholas
Hathaway & Kunz LLP
contact info
Frank L Watson, III
Watsonburns LLC
contact info
Brice Moffatt Timmons
Donati Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
340 340 order Status Report Order Fri 05/16 4:19 PM
(TEXT-ONLY) STATUS REPORT ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs updated Status Report339 and finds the requested extension of time is supported by good cause. Therefore, if Plaintiffs have not filed a Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval on or before 5/30/2025, Plaintiffs Counsel shall file an updated status report, with leave to file as a non-public document, to apprise the Court of the current status of this matter. Status Report due by 5/30/2025. (Court Staff, swe)
Related: [-]
339 339 misc Status Report Fri 05/16 1:52 PM
NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access - Third STATUS REPORT by Carlie Sherman. (Edgington, Craig)
Related: [-]