Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:22-bk-80649

Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Clifton R Jessup Jr
Case #: 8:22-ap-80194
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 03, 2022
Terminated:Oct 28, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
The Bank of Missouri
916 North Kings Highway
Perryville, MO 63775
Represented By
The Bank of Missouri
contact info
Defendant
Fair Square Financial, LLC d/b/a Ollo Card Services
1000 North West Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Fair Square Financial, LLC d/b/a Ollo Card Services
contact info
Plaintiff
Devonna Talley
1715 S. Scott St.
Scottsboro, AL 35768
Represented By
John C. Larsen
Larsen Law, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM CDT
Friday, October 28, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Fri 10/28 10:42 AM
Adversary Case 8:22-ap-80194 Closed (dwh)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 25, 2022
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 09/25 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 09/25/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order on Application for Compensation
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 09/25 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 09/25/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement
Friday, September 23, 2022
23 23 order Compensation Fri 09/23 11:54 AM
Order Approving Application For Compensation Related [+] for John C. Larsen, Debtor's Attorney, Period: to , Fees awarded: $9000.00, Expenses awarded: $0.00; Awarded on 9/23/2022 Signed on 9/23/2022. (bng)
Related: [-] #17
22 22 order Approve Compromise and/or Settlement Fri 09/23 11:52 AM
Order Approving Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement Related [+] Signed on 9/23/2022. (bng)
Related: [-] #16
Thursday, September 15, 2022
20 20 trustee Bankruptcy Administrator Statement of Review Regarding Application for Comp & Reimburse Thu 09/15 10:25 AM
Bankruptcy Administrator's Statement of Review Regarding Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Richard M Blythe Related [+]. (Blythe, Richard)
Related: [-] 17 Application for Compensation of Attorney's Fee for John C. Larsen, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 5/2/2022 to 9/20/2022, Fee: $9,000.00, Expenses: $. Filed by Attorney John C. Larsen filed by Plaintiff Devonna Talley
Friday, August 19, 2022
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 08/19 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 08/19/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Notice of Hearing
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
18 18 court Notice of Hearing-Van200 Wed 08/17 10:34 AM
Notice of Hearing on Related [+] Hearing scheduled 9/21/2022 at 10:00 AM at Huntsville Federal Building (CRJ). (dwh)
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement filed by Plaintiff Devonna Talley,17 Application for Compensation filed by Plaintiff Devonna Talley
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
17 17 motion Compensation Tue 08/16 2:08 PM
Application for Compensation of Attorney's Fee for John C. Larsen, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 5/2/2022 to 9/20/2022, Fee: $9,000.00, Expenses: $. Filed by Attorney John C. Larsen (Larsen, John)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Approve Compromise and/or Settlement - Motion Tue 08/16 2:05 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement Regarding Alleged Stay Violation under Rule 9019 and Approval of Attorney's Fee Filed by Plaintiff Devonna Talley (Larsen, John)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 19, 2022
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 06/19 11:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 06/19/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order Vacating Order
Friday, June 17, 2022
14 14 order Vacating Order Fri 06/17 2:39 PM
Order Vacating Remaining Deadlines Signed on 6/17/2022 Related [+]. (dwh)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion to Extend Time
13 13 misc Report to Court Fri 06/17 10:34 AM
Report to Court Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff Devonna Talley. (Larsen, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2022
12 12 court Return Mail Thu 06/16 8:46 AM
Return Mail of Ollo Card Services Related [+] (dwh)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Sunday, June 05, 2022
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 06/05 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 06/05/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Friday, June 03, 2022
10 10 order Extend Time Fri 06/03 2:55 PM
Order Extending Deadline to Respond to Complaint to June 17, 2022 by 4:00 p.m. CDT Related [+] Signed on 6/3/2022. (dwh)
Related: [-] 7
9 9 misc Corporate Parent Disclosure Statement Fri 06/03 11:53 AM
Corporate Parent Disclosure Statement Filed by Defendant Fair Square Financial, LLC d/b/a Ollo Card Services. (Hancock, William)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Corporate Parent Disclosure Statement Fri 06/03 11:48 AM
Corporate Parent Disclosure Statement Filed by Defendant The Bank of Missouri. (Hancock, William)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extend Time Fri 06/03 11:45 AM
Motion to Extend Time Motion for Leave to Extend Time to File a Responsive Pleading Filed by Defendants Fair Square Financial, LLC d/b/a Ollo Card Services, The Bank of Missouri (Hancock, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 05/17 3:54 PM
Amended Complaint by Devonna Talley against Fair Square Financial, LLC d/b/a Ollo Card Services, The Bank of Missouri. (Larsen, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Cardmember Agreement
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - BNC Certificate of Notice
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Ollo-BOM Text Message
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Ollo Letter 5-2-22
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Ollo-BOM Emails
Thursday, May 05, 2022
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/05 5:04 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. (Larsen, John)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued Fair Square Financial, LLC D/B/A Ollo Card Services (bng)
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/05 4:59 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. (Larsen, John)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued The Bank of Missouri (bng)
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Wed 05/04 8:35 AM
Summons Issued Fair Square Financial, LLC D/B/A Ollo Card Services (bng)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Wed 05/04 8:32 AM
Summons Issued The Bank of Missouri (bng)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/03 12:01 PM
Adversary case 22-80194 14 Related [+]) Complaint by Devonna Talley against The Bank of Missouri, Fair Square Financial, LLC d/b/a Ollo Card Services. Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $350 (Larsen, John)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Cardmember Agreement
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - BNC Certificate of Notice
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Ollo-BOM Text Message
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Ollo-BOM Emails