Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-05857
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:May 03, 2022
Terminated:May 05, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Oct 30, 2022 5:24 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
ERIK MARTINEZ
Represented By
SINDHU SUSAN DANIEL
Grant & Eisenhofer Pa - Wilmington De
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 05, 2023
2 2 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 05/09 10:57 AM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibits A and B are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. Active-duty plaintiffs and non-veterans are hereby granted leave to file a motion to reopen their case which must be accompanied by a statement clarifying their status with respect to military service. Any motion to reopen on this basis must be filed only on the individual docket for a plaintiff's case by June 5, 2023. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/5/2023. (erl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 05/03 2:15 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6983332.), filed by ERIK MARTINEZ. (DANIEL, SINDHU)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet