Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists v. Zone V Productions, Ltd.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | Gail J Standish |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-02940 |
Nature of Suit | 720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations |
Cause | 09:0009 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award |
Case Filed: | May 03, 2022 |
Terminated: | Sep 07, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 30, 2022 2:39 AM PDT |
Petitioner
Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Zone V Productions, Ltd.
3244 Minerva St.
Ferndale, MI 48220 |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, September 07, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
judgmentCV
Judgment
Wed 09/07 11:55 AM
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL by Judge Percy Anderson. In accordance with the Court's September 7, 2022 Minute Order dismissing this action for failure to comply with a Court Order, it is HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the action is dismissed without prejudice. RE: MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-COURT ORDER,11 . (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (aco) |
|
11 | 11
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 09/07 11:50 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson.The Court finds that Petitioner has failed to comply with the Court's Order. The Court therefore dismisses this action without prejudice for failure to comply with a Court order. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) |
|
Wednesday, August 24, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 08/24 2:25 PM
MINUTES ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Percy Anderson. The court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before September 3, 2022, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) |
|
Sunday, August 14, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 08/15 11:15 AM
MINUTES ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Percy Anderson. The court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before August 22, 2022, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) |
|
Thursday, May 05, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 05/06 11:35 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. Both theCourt and the attorneys bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in the Federal Courts. To secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action, Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, all counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Central District of California. [SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS]. (aco) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program
Thu 05/05 2:11 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:22-cv-02940 PA(GJSx). (rn) |
|
Wednesday, May 04, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Statement
Wed 05/04 11:50 AM
STATEMENT of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge re: Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form4 . (Kokish, Iris) |
|
5 | 5
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Wed 05/04 10:52 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 served on May 4, 2022. (Kokish, Iris) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form
Wed 05/04 10:16 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh) |
|
Att: 1 CV-11C | ||
Tuesday, May 03, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 05/03 2:08 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, (Kokish, Iris) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 05/03 2:04 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists. (Kokish, Iris) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 05/03 1:49 PM
MOTION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN CONFORMITY THEREWITH; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF IRIS R. BRADSTREET IN SUPPORT THEREOF Receipt No: ACACDC-33231196 - Fee: $402, filed by Petitioner Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists. (Attorney Iris R Kokish added to party Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists(pty:pet))(Kokish, Iris) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment |