Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-10942

Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mike K Nakagawa
Case #: 2:22-ap-01069
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:May 03, 2022
Terminated:Sep 20, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
MARK A. MURPHY, AN INDIVIDUAL
POST OFFICE BOX 90250
HENDERSON, NV 89009
Represented By
MARK A. MURPHY, AN INDIVIDUAL
contact info
Defendant
MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
2700 EAST SUNSET ROAD SUITE, 9
LAS VEGAS, NV 89120
Represented By
MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
contact info
Defendant
AMERICAN COLOCATION SERVICES, LLC, a Nevada domestic limited liability company
Represented By
AMERICAN COLOCATION SERVICES, LLC, a Nevada domestic limited liability company
contact info
Defendant
BLACK ROCK BUSINESS SERVICES, LLC, a Nevada domestic limited liability company
Represented By
BLACK ROCK BUSINESS SERVICES, LLC, a Nevada domestic limited liability company
contact info
Defendant
MARK A. MURPHY FOUNDATION, a Nevada Domestic Nonprofit Corporation
Represented By
MARK A. MURPHY FOUNDATION, a Nevada Domestic Nonprofit Corporation
contact info
Defendant
STEEL DUST PROPERTIES, LLC f/k/a PLEASURE INVESTMENTS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company
Represented By
STEEL DUST PROPERTIES, LLC f/k/a PLEASURE INVESTMENTS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company
contact info
Defendant
PATRIOT BUSINESS SERVICES, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company
Represented By
PATRIOT BUSINESS SERVICES, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company
contact info
Defendant
ROCKIN K RANCH, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company
Represented By
ROCKIN K RANCH, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company
contact info
Defendant
VIRGINIA A. KIRKENDALL FOUNDATION, a Nevada Domestic Nonprofit Corporation
Represented By
VIRGINIA A. KIRKENDALL FOUNDATION, a Nevada Domestic Nonprofit Corporation
contact info
Defendant
TRIANGLE CONSULTANTS, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABLE COMPANY
Represented By
TRIANGLE CONSULTANTS, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABLE COMPANY
contact info
Plaintiff
J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION
2700 EAST SUNSET ROAD SUITE 9
LAS VEGAS, NV 89008
Represented By
GREGORY E GARMAN
Garman Turner Gordon
contact info
Plaintiff
J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
7901 4TH STREET NORTH SUITE 300
ST. PETERSBURG, FL 33702
Represented By
GREGORY E GARMAN
Garman Turner Gordon
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Thursday, December 29, 2022
24 24 court Document (Adv Court Event) Thu 12/29 3:19 PM
(COPY) 12/20/22 USDC ORDER DISMISSING BANKRUPTCY AND RELATED CASES Related [+]...ORDERED that case numbers...22-cv-01636-CDS-EJY...are DISMISSED...CDS 12/20/22. (dcl)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff J AND J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION, Plaintiff J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
22 22 court Close Adversary Case Tue 09/20 4:17 PM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case 22-1069 (dcl)
Related: [-]
20 20 adv_misc Document (Adv) Tue 09/20 4:10 PM
(Copy) Document MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 9/20/2022. Filed by Error: party not know Related [+] (dcl)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff J AND J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION, Plaintiff J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.
Friday, September 16, 2022
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Fri 09/16 9:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/16/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Withdrawal of the Reference Documents Forwarded to BNC for Noticing
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
18 18 court Withdrawal of the Reference Documents Forwarded to BNC for Noticing (E-mail)(BNC) Wed 09/14 9:45 AM
Clerk Forwarded Withdrawal of the Reference Documents to BNC for Noticing Related [+] (dcl)
Related: [-] 15 Order,17 Withdrawal of the Reference Transmittal Form.
17 17 court Withdrawal of the Reference Transmittal Form (BNC) (E-mail) (Adv) Wed 09/14 9:41 AM
Withdrawal of the Reference Transmittal Form. Related [+] (dcl)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff J AND J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION, Plaintiff J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.
Thursday, September 01, 2022
16 16 court Minute Entry - Hearing Vacated Per Court Instructions (ADV) Thu 09/01 1:54 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 9/8/2022 10:00 AM. Vacated Per Court Instructions Related [+] (sm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by J AND J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION, J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
15 15 3 pgs orderad Order (generic) (Adv) Wed 08/31 12:40 PM
(COPY) 8/23/22 USDC ORDER GRANTING RECEIVER'S EX PARTE MOTION...WITHDRAWING REFERENCE TO BANKRUPTCY COURT.. Related [+]...ORDERED...the reference to the Bankruptcy Court of the adversary proceeding.. 22-01069 is withdrawn...CDS EOD 8/23/22 (dcl)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff J AND J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION, Plaintiff J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.
Friday, May 06, 2022
14 14 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 05/06 2:14 PM
Summons Service Executed on TRIANGLE CONSULTANTS, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABLE COMPANY 5/5/2022 Filed by GREGORY E GARMAN on behalf of J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION ; J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY Related [+] (GARMAN, GREGORY)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION, Plaintiff J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,4 Summons Issued.
13 13 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 05/06 2:03 PM
Summons Service Executed on VIRGINIA A. KIRKENDALL FOUNDATION, a Nevada Domestic Nonprofit Corporation 5/5/2022 Filed by GREGORY E GARMAN on behalf of J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION ; J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY Related [+] (GARMAN, GREGORY)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION, Plaintiff J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,4 Summons Issued.
12 12 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 05/06 2:02 PM
Summons Service Executed on STEEL DUST PROPERTIES, LLC f/k/a PLEASURE INVESTMENTS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company 5/5/2022 Filed by GREGORY E GARMAN on behalf of J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION ; J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY Related [+] (GARMAN, GREGORY)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION, Plaintiff J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,4 Summons Issued.
11 11 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 05/06 2:01 PM
Summons Service Executed on ROCKIN K RANCH, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company 5/5/2022 Filed by GREGORY E GARMAN on behalf of J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION ; J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY Related [+] (GARMAN, GREGORY)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION, Plaintiff J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,4 Summons Issued.
10 10 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 05/06 1:59 PM
Summons Service Executed on PATRIOT BUSINESS SERVICES, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company 5/5/2022 Filed by GREGORY E GARMAN on behalf of J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION ; J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY Related [+] (GARMAN, GREGORY)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION, Plaintiff J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,4 Summons Issued.
9 9 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 05/06 1:58 PM
Summons Service Executed on MARK A. MURPHY, AN INDIVIDUAL 5/5/2022 Filed by GREGORY E GARMAN on behalf of J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION ; J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY Related [+] (GARMAN, GREGORY)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION, Plaintiff J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,4 Summons Issued.
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 05/06 1:57 PM
Summons Service Executed on MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY 5/5/2022 Filed by GREGORY E GARMAN on behalf of J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION ; J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY Related [+] (GARMAN, GREGORY)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION, Plaintiff J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,4 Summons Issued.
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 05/06 1:54 PM
Summons Service Executed on MARK A. MURPHY FOUNDATION, a Nevada Domestic Nonprofit Corporation 5/5/2022 Filed by GREGORY E GARMAN on behalf of J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION ; J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY Related [+] (GARMAN, GREGORY)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION, Plaintiff J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,4 Summons Issued.
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 05/06 1:53 PM
Summons Service Executed on BLACK ROCK BUSINESS SERVICES, LLC, a Nevada domestic limited liability company 5/5/2022 Filed by GREGORY E GARMAN on behalf of J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION ; J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY Related [+] (GARMAN, GREGORY)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION, Plaintiff J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,4 Summons Issued.
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 05/06 1:50 PM
Summons Service Executed on AMERICAN COLOCATION SERVICES, LLC, a Nevada domestic limited liability company 5/5/2022 Filed by GREGORY E GARMAN on behalf of J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION ; J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY Related [+] (GARMAN, GREGORY)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION, Plaintiff J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,4 Summons Issued.
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
4 4 court Summons Issued Wed 05/04 3:49 PM
Summons Issued on AMERICAN COLOCATION SERVICES, LLC, a Nevada domestic limited liability company , BLACK ROCK BUSINESS SERVICES, LLC, a Nevada domestic limited liability company , MARK A. MURPHY FOUNDATION, a Nevada Domestic Nonprofit Corporation , MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY , MARK A. MURPHY, AN INDIVIDUAL , PATRIOT BUSINESS SERVICES, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company , ROCKIN K RANCH, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company , STEEL DUST PROPERTIES, LLC f/k/a PLEASURE INVESTMENTS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company , TRIANGLE CONSULTANTS, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABLE COMPANY , VIRGINIA A. KIRKENDALL FOUNDATION, a Nevada Domestic Nonprofit Corporation (cly)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference) Wed 05/04 3:48 PM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 9/8/2022 at 10:00 AM at Remote. Related [+] (cly)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION, Plaintiff J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
2 2 cmp Request to Issue Summons Tue 05/03 4:33 PM
Request to Issue Summons On: AMERICAN COLOCATION SERVICES, LLC, a Nevada domestic limited liability company, BLACK ROCK BUSINESS SERVICES, LLC, a Nevada domestic limited liability company, MARK A. MURPHY FOUNDATION, a Nevada Domestic Nonprofit Corporation, MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, MARK A. MURPHY, PATRIOT BUSINESS SERVICES, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company, ROCKIN K RANCH, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company, STEEL DUST PROPERTIES, LLC f/k/a PLEASURE INVESTMENTS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company, TRIANCLE CONSULTANTS, LLC, a Nevada limited liable company, VIRGINIA A. KIRKENDALL FOUNDATION, a Nevada Domestic Nonprofit Corporation. Filed by GREGORY E GARMAN on behalf of J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION (GARMAN, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/03 4:29 PM
Adversary case 22-01069 Complaint ADVERSARY COMPLAINT Filed by J & J CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION, J AND J PURCHASING, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY vs. MARK A. MURPHY, MARK A. MURPHY, LTD., A NEVADA DOMESTIC PROFESSIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, AMERICAN COLOCATION SERVICES, LLC, a Nevada domestic limited liability company, BLACK ROCK BUSINESS SERVICES, LLC, a Nevada domestic limited liability company, MARK A. MURPHY FOUNDATION, a Nevada Domestic Nonprofit Corporation, STEEL DUST PROPERTIES, LLC f/k/a PLEASURE INVESTMENTS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company, PATRIOT BUSINESS SERVICES, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company, ROCKIN K RANCH, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company, VIRGINIA A. KIRKENDALL FOUNDATION, a Nevada Domestic Nonprofit Corporation, TRIANCLE CONSULTANTS, LLC, a Nevada limited liable company Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)(GARMAN, GREGORY)
Related: [-]