New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Ramon E Reyes, Jr
Referred: Ramon E Reyes, Jr
Case #: 1:22-cv-02559
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:May 04, 2022
Terminated:Jan 03, 2023
Last checked: Monday Oct 31, 2022 5:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Nissim Baron
Defendant
Woodcraft Interiors Inc.
Plaintiff
Ricardo Ayala
Represented By
Victoria Spagnolo
Neil H. Greenberg & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Keith E. Williams
The Nhg Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Justin M. Reilly
The Nhg Law Group, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
order Order Dismissing Case Tue 01/03 10:42 PM
ORDER re15 Stipulation of Dismissal. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/3/2023. (MV)
Related: [-]
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 01/03 10:44 PM
Civil Case Terminated. See15 Stipulation of Dismissal. (MV)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 30, 2022
15 15 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 12/30 1:27 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Ricardo Ayala Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Justin
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 12/13 5:20 PM
Stipulation of dismissal /Status Report due by 12/23/2022. (MV)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
order Order on Motion for Settlement Mon 12/12 4:45 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Settlement. Having reviewed the settlement agreement, I find that "the agreement reflects a reasonable compromise of disputed issues [rather] than a mere waiver of statutory rights brought about by an employer's overreaching." Le v. SITA Information Networking Computing, USA, Inc., No. 07-CV-86, 2008 WL 724155, at *1 (E.D.N.Y. Mar. 13, 2008) (quotations and citation omitted); see also Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc., 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015). In reaching this conclusion, I have considered, among other things, (1) that the settlement amount as reflected in the settlement agreement is substantial and fair in light of litigation risk and is within the possible range of recovery; (2) that the attorney's fees and costs portion of the settlement is reasonable and commensurate with the degree of success obtained, see Fisher v. SD Protection Inc., 948 F.3d 593, 606-07 (2d Cir. 2020); (3) that the release provided for in the agreement is limited in scope; and (4) that the settlement agreement does not impose a duty of confidentiality. For the reasons above, the terms of the settlement are fair and reasonable and otherwise satisfy the factors set forth in Wolinksy v. Scholastic Inc., 900 F. Supp. 2d 332, 335-36 (S.D.N.Y. 2012). See Fisher, 948 F.3d at 600 (instructing that Wolinksy factors guide fairness inquiry). The settlement is therefore approved, and the motion for settlement approval is granted. The parties are directed to file a stipulation of dismissal by 12/23/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 12/12/2022. Related [+]
Related: [-] yes, Ramon
Thursday, December 08, 2022
14 14 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Thu 12/08 11:01 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Eric R. Komitee no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (So Ordered by Judge Eric Komitee, dated 12/8/2022) (SG)
Related: [-]
utility Case No Longer Referred Thu 12/08 11:00 AM
Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. (SG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/23 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Scott Cohen on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Cohen, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
order Order(Other) Tue 11/22 8:08 AM
ORDER re12 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by Ricardo Ayala --- The Consent to Jurisdiction form filed on November 21, 2022, must be signed by an attorney of record for defendants, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 11(a). Accordingly, counsel for defendants is directed to file a notice of appearance forthwith. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to provide a copy of this order to the defendants. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 11/22/2022. (AG)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
12 12 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Mon 11/21 6:37 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Ricardo Ayala. Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Justin
11 11 motion Settlement Mon 11/21 6:36 PM
MOTION for Settlement approval of a Fair Labor Standards Act case by Ricardo Ayala. Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Justin
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit Settlement Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit Damages Chart
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File 1 - Terminate Deadlines ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 11/08 2:50 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to File settlement agreement and Cheeks motion on 11/21/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 11/8/2022. (MV)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 11/07 5:42 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File settlement agreement and Cheeks motion by Ricardo Ayala. Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Justin
Friday, October 07, 2022
order Status Report Order Fri 10/07 1:26 PM
ORDER re9 Letter filed by Ricardo Ayala: Motion for Settlement is due on or before 11/7/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 10/7/2022. (MV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
9 9 misc Letter Thu 10/06 4:18 PM
Letter advising the Court that this matter has settled and the parties will be filing their Cheeks motion and settlement agreement within 30 days by Ricardo Ayala Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Justin
Thursday, September 29, 2022
order Status Report Order Thu 09/29 9:07 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: A review of the docket entries in this action indicates that there has been no activity in this case since 6/7/2022. No later than October 7, 2022, one of the following events must occur: (a) the parties must file a stipulation extending the defendants time to answer, (b) the plaintiff must file a motion for the entry of a notation of default or (c) the defendants must file an answer. If, none of the preceding events occurs by the deadlines set forth above, I will deem the plaintiff to have abandoned the case and will promptly file a Report and Recommendation urging the assigned District Judge to dismiss the case for failure to prosecute. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to his client and to the defendants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/29/2022. (Vertus, Miriam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/18 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Spagnolo on behalf of Ricardo Ayala (aty to be noticed) (Spagnolo, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 06/07 6:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricardo Ayala. Woodcraft Interiors Inc. served on 5/31/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (Williams, Keith)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 06/07 6:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricardo Ayala. Nissim Baron served on 5/27/2022, answer due 6/17/2022. (Williams, Keith)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/07 6:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Keith E. Williams on behalf of Ricardo Ayala (aty to be noticed) (Williams, Keith)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 05, 2022
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 05/05 9:04 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Thu 05/05 9:04 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 05/05 9:03 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/04 4:58 PM
COMPLAINT against Nissim Baron, Woodcraft Interiors Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15535267 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Ricardo Ayala. Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Justin
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 05/05 9:01 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]