California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:22-mj-01517
Case Filed:May 02, 2022
Last checked: Thursday May 05, 2022 1:04 AM PDT
Defendant
Angelica Monique Madueno (2)
Represented By
Robert Llewellyn Swain
Law Offices Of Robert L Swain
contact info
Defendant
Fernando Valdemar Ortiz (1)
Represented By
Jason T. Conforti
Law Office Jason T. Conforti
contact info
Material Witness
Juan Delgado-Munos
Represented By
Christopher K. Monelt
Law Firm Of Christopher K. Monelt
contact info
Material Witness
Juan Diego Guerrero-Rizo
Represented By
Christopher K. Monelt
Law Firm Of Christopher K. Monelt
contact info
Material Witness
L.M.V.
Represented By
Christopher K. Monelt
Law Firm Of Christopher K. Monelt
contact info
Material Witness
Julio Cesar Valadez Fernandez
Represented By
Christopher K. Monelt
Law Firm Of Christopher K. Monelt
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Amy B. Wang
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2022 11:33 AM PDT
Friday, April 29, 2022
Arrest of Fernando Valdemar Ortiz, Angelica Monique Madueno (no document attached) (ekb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2022
1 1 7 pgs COMPLAINT as to Fernando Valdemar Ortiz, Angelica Monique Madueno.(ekb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Minute Order. Material Witness Attorney Christopher K. Monelt appointed for Julio Cesar Valadez Fernandez, Juan Diego Guerrero-Rizo, and Juan Delgado-Munos. Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Fernando Valdemar Ortiz, Angelica Monique Madueno: Initial Appearance set for 5/2/2022 before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. (no document attached) (ekb)
Related: [-]
3 3 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Fernando Valdemar Ortiz, Angelica Monique Madueno: Arraignment of MW Julio Cesar Valadez Fernandez, Juan Diego Guerrero-Rizo, and Juan Delgado-Munos set for 5/3/2022 before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. (no document attached) (mme)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler: Initial Appearance as to Fernando Valdemar Ortiz (1) held on 5/2/2022. Defendant consents to proceed via VTC. Attorney Jason T. Conforti(n/a) provisionally appointed. Financial Affidavit due at next hearing. Government oral motion to detain (Flight). ( Detention Hearing - RF set for 5/4/2022 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo.) Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 5/12/22 at 9:00am before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Arraignment set for 5/26/22 at 9:00am before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. ) (CD# 5/2/2022 AGS 22-1:2:46-2:56). (Plaintiff Attorney Badih Mouannes AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Daniell Lee FD-S/A). (aje)
Related: [-]
5 5 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Fernando Valdemar Ortiz, Angelica Monique Madueno (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
6 6 Oral MOTION to Detain (Flight)by USA as to Fernando Valdemar Ortiz. (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Angelica Monique Madueno (2) $15,000 PS (1 FRRA).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 5/2/22. (ecf)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Angelica Monique Madueno. (ecf)
Related: [-]
9 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler: Initial Appearance as to Angelica Monique Madueno (2) held on 5/2/2022. Defendant consents to proceed via VTC. Appointed attorney Robert Llewellyn Swain(n/a) provisionally. Financial Affidavit due by 5/12/22. Detention Hearing as to Angelica Monique Madueno held on 5/2/2022. USA oral motion for detention(Flight); motion denied as to Angelica Monique Madueno. Bond set as to Angelica Monique Madueno (2) $15,000 PS secured by 1 FRRA. Abstract issued 5/2/22. Bond packet due by 5/9/22 or defendant to self surrender to USMS by noon on 5/9/22. Defense counsel to file motion to dismiss. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 5/12/22 at 9:00am before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Arraignment set for 5/26/22 at 9:00am before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo..) (CD# 5/2/2022 AGS 22-1:4:49-5:42). (Plaintiff Attorney Badih Mouannes AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Daniell Lee FD-S/A). (aje)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs ORDER as to Fernando Valdemar Ortiz: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 5/2/22. (aje)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs ORDER as to Angelica Monique Madueno: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 5/2/22. (aje)
Related: [-]