Virginia Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:22-cr-00047
Case Filed:May 04, 2022
Terminated:Jun 27, 2023
Last checked: Thursday May 05, 2022 3:56 AM EDT
Defendant
Patrick Tate Adamiak (1)
Represented By
David Michael Good
David Michael Good PC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
William David Muhr
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/11/2023 7:45 PM EDT
Friday, April 08, 2022
1 1 1 pgs CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Patrick Tate Adamiak (1). (dbra, ) [2:22-mj-00084]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Criminal Cover Sheet
2 2 9 pgs AFFIDAVIT in Support of Criminal Complaint by USA as to Patrick Tate Adamiak1 Criminal Complaint (dbra, ) [2:22-mj-00084]
Related: [-]
3 3 Arrest Warrant Issued and Delivered to USM in case as to Patrick Tate Adamiak. (dbra, ) [2:22-mj-00084]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller:Initial Appearance as to Patrick Tate Adamiak held. AUSA Bill Muhr present. Deft present in custody and advised of rights, charges and right to counsel. Counsel desired; Court denied appointment of counsel. Govt made motion for detention; Temporary Detention Order entered. Deft remanded to custody of USM. Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 4/13/2022 at 02:00 PM in Norfolk Mag Courtroom 2 Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (Court Reporter FTR.)(dbra, ) [2:22-mj-00084]
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/8/2022 in case as to Patrick Tate Adamiak. (dbra, ) [2:22-mj-00084]
Related: [-]
7 7 Temporary Detention Order as to Patrick Tate Adamiak. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 4/8/2022. (dbra, ) [2:22-mj-00084]
Related: [-]
8 8 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Patrick Tate Adamiak (dbra, ) [2:22-mj-00084]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2022
9 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David Michael Good appearing for Patrick Tate Adamiak (Good, David) [2:22-mj-00084]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
10 10 Pretrial Services Bond REPORT (Initial Pretrial Services Bond Report) (SEALED - government and defense counsel) as to Patrick Tate Adamiak. (bell, robert) [2:22-mj-00084]
Related: [-]
11 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller:Matter came on for Detention and Preliminary Hearing as to Patrick Tate Adamiak on 4/13/2022. Appearances : AUSA Bill Muhr for the Government,CJA Attorney David Good for defendant. (2:00 pm to 2:14 pm) Defendant is present in custody. Defendant waived preliminary hearing. Government withdrew the motion for detention and agreed to set conditions of release. Court ordered the defendant released on $2000 unsecured bond with standard felony conditions. Oral DPPA admonishment given and court entered order. (Tape #FTR.)(cdod, ) [2:22-mj-00084]
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on its own initiative. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020), the Court ORDERS the United States to adhere to the disclosure obligations set forth in Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Brady v. Maryland instructs that the suppression by the prosecution of evidence favorable to an accused violates due process where the evidence is material either to guilt or to punishment, irrespective of the good faith or bad faith of the prosecution. 373 U.S. at 87. Failure to adhere to this requirement may result in serious consequences, up to and including vacating a conviction or disciplinary action against the prosecution. Having given counsel the oral admonition required by the Due Process Protections Act, this Order serves as the reminder of prosecutorial obligation and duties in accordance with Rule 5(f) and the Eastern District of Virginia Standing Order concerning the same as to Patrick Tate Adamiak. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 4/13/2022. (cdod, ) [2:22-mj-00084]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
13 13 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Patrick Tate Adamiak (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 4/14/2022. (dbra, ) [2:22-mj-00084]
Related: [-]
14 14 Unsecured Bond Entered as to Patrick Tate Adamiak in amount of $ 2,000.00 (dbra, ) [2:22-mj-00084]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
Set Hearings as to Patrick Tate Adamiak: Arraignment set for 5/11/2022 at 02:30 PM in Norfolk Mag Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (jhie, )
Related: [-]
15 15 8 pgs INDICTMENT RETURNED AND FILED IN OPEN COURT as to Patrick Tate Adamiak (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11. On motion of the Government, arraignment to be set for 5/11/22 at 2:30 p.m. (jhie, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet