Missouri et al v. Biden et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Terry A Doughty |
Referred: | Kayla D Mcclusky |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-01213 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | May 05, 2022 |
Case in other court: | 5CCA, 22-30531 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 01, 2022 4:07 AM CDT |
Defendant
Timothy W Manning
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dana Remus
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lauren Protentis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joshua Peck
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kristen Muthig
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Murray
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janell Muhammed
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lorena Molina-Irizarry
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gina McCarthy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Matthew Masterson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark A Robbins
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tericka Lambert
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Daniel Kimmage
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brad Kimberly
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U S Dept of Justice
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Erica Jefferson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Karine Jean-Pierre
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Clarke Humphrey
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Xavier Becerra
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Andrew Slavitt
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kim Wyman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eric Waldo
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Benjamin Wakana
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Samantha Vinograd
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U S Dept of Treasury
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Samaruddin K Stewart
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U S Dept of State
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allison Snell
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mina Hsiang
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Silvers
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jennifer Shopkorn
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aisha Shah
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brian Scully
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Zachary Henry Schwartz
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dori Salcido
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Courtney Rowe
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Laura Rosenberger
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cybersecurity & Infrastructure Security Agency
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Subhan Cheema
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Elvis M Chan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U S Census Bureau
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Leah Bray
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wally Adeyemo
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
National Institute of Allergy & Infectious Diseases
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Vivek H Murthy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anthony Fauci
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Yolanda Byrd
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jennifer Rene Psaki
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nina Jankowicz
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dept of Homeland Security
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dept of Health & Human Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jen Easterly
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Centers for Disease Control & Prevention
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joseph R Biden, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U S Dept of Commerce
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carol Crawford
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Geoffrey Hale
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Laura Dehmlow
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kristin Galemore
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jay Dempsey
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U S Election Assistance Commission
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kate Galatas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Federal Bureau of Investigation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rob Flaherty
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alexis Frisbie
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christy Choi
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U S Food & Drug Administration
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Missouri
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aaron Kheriaty
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Louisiana
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martin Kulldorff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jayanta Bhattacharya
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jill Hines
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jim Hoft
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Movant
Kimberly D Hogan
Terminated: 08/01/2022
10015 Lake Creek Pkwy #621
Austin, TX 78729 |
|
Movant
Mike Webb
Terminated: 08/01/2022
Major 955 S Columbus St #426
Arlington, VA 22204 |
|
Movant
Judson Witham
Terminated: 07/29/2022
15215 Aiken
Wake Forest, NC 27587 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
350 | 350
notice
Notice of Motion Setting
Fri 04/26 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding:349 MOTION for Discovery . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Leday, A) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
349 | 349
motion
Discovery
Thu 04/25 1:39 PM
MOTION for Discovery by Childrens Health Defense, Robert F Kennedy, Jr, Connie Sampognaro. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/25/2024.(aty,Maturin, Glynn) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Mary Holland Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit G. Shelly Maturin, II Declaration with Exhibits, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed order | ||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
348 | 348
3
pgs
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 04/24 3:01 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER of USCA that Appellants' unopposed motion to hold this appeal in abeyance pending the Supreme Courts disposition of Murthy v. Missouri, No. 23-411 (U.S.) is GRANTED. (crt,WalkerSld, B) |