New Jersey District Court
Judge:Madeline Cox Arleo
Referred: Andre M Espinosa
Case #: 2:22-cv-02648
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1442 Notice of Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 05, 2022
Re-opened:Sep 25, 2023
Terminated:Sep 25, 2023
Case in other court:Hudson County, HUD-L-03-00022
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 01, 2022 4:42 AM EDT
Defendant
BLACKHAWK CLAIMS SERVICES
Represented By
MITCHELL WALDMAN
Hurvitz & Waldman
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
Defendant
SALVASEN HEALTH
Represented By
JAMES P CHOU
Moritt Hock & Hamroff LLP
contact info
Defendant
XYZ CORPS. 1-10
Notice Only
arbnwk
Notice Only
PHV ALEXANDER LITT
Notice Only
PHV IVY OXENDINE
Notice Only
PHV JOHN OXENDINE
Notice Only
PHV PETER B. ZLOTNICK, ESQ.
Plaintiff
MICHELLE FERREIRA
Represented By
TY HYDERALLY
Hyderally & Associates, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, September 25, 2023
57 57 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Mon 09/25 1:29 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 9/25/2023. (ld, )
Related: [-]