Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:22-cv-01441
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Cause28:1442 Notice of Removal-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 05, 2022
Case in other court:Ohio Southern, 1:22-cv-00220
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 01, 2022 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
Defendant
Corteva, Inc.
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
John Doe 1-49
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc.
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
EI DuPont de Nemours and Company
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Defendant
The Chemours Company
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Represented By
Erin Rhinehart
Faruki Ireland Cox Rhinehart & Dusing Pll
contact info
Raika Nicole Casey
Faruki Pll
contact info
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086
Defendant
3M Company
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341
Defendant
AGC Inc
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
13995 Pasteur Blvd.
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Represented By
Erin Rhinehart
Faruki Ireland Cox Rhinehart & Dusing Pll
contact info
Raika Nicole Casey
Faruki Pll
contact info
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
Plaintiff
City of Portsmouth
728 Second Street
Portsmouth, OH 45662
Represented By
David Dale Seif, Jr., Jr.
Seif & Mcnamee, LLC
contact info
Zachary C Schaengold
Baron And Budd PC
contact info
Luana N Smith
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Robert R Miller
contact info
Philip F Cossich
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Brandon J Taylor
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Christina Cossich
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Fire Products GP Holding LLC
Terminated: 05/06/2022
Defendant
Johnson Controls International plc
Terminated: 05/06/2022
Defendant
Angus International Safety Group LTD
Terminated: 05/06/2022
Defendant
Central Sprinkler LLC
Terminated: 05/06/2022


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
28 28 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 05/16 12:19 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice between Plaintiffs and Tyco, Chemguard, ChemDesign, and Released Parties by Tyco Fire Products LP.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dukes, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Case List
Thursday, May 15, 2025
27 27 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 05/15 6:03 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by BASF Corp.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
26 26 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 07/09 7:39 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by 3M Company, The.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, April 14, 2023
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/14 12:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carla Burke Pickrel on behalf of City of Portsmouth, Village of Bridgeport Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01441-RMG, 2:22-cv-02357-RMG(Burke Pickrel, Carla)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/14 12:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Summy on behalf of City of Portsmouth, Village of Bridgeport Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01441-RMG, 2:22-cv-02357-RMG(Summy, Scott)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
23 23 service Summons Issued Wed 05/11 4:02 PM
Summons Issued as to 3M Company, AGC Chemicals Americas Inc, AGC Inc, Archroma Management LLC, Archroma US Inc, Arkema Inc, BASF Corporation, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Carrier Global Corporation, ChemDesign Products Inc, Chemguard Inc, Chemicals Incorporated, Chubb Fire LTD, Clariant Corporation, Corteva, Inc., Deepwater Chemicals Inc, John Doe 1-49, DuPont De Nemours Inc., Dynax Corporation, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, Kidde PLC Inc, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, Nation Ford Chemical Company, National Foam Inc, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC LLC, Tyco Fire Products LP, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 06, 2022
21 21 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 05/06 4:36 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by City of Portsmouth of Angus International Safety Group, Ltd., Central Sprinkler, LLC, Fire Products GP Holding, LLC, and Johnson Controls International, plc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01441-RMG(Taylor, Brandon)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/06 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon J Taylor on behalf of City of Portsmouth Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01441-RMG(Taylor, Brandon)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/06 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Philip F Cossich on behalf of City of Portsmouth Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01441-RMG(Cossich, Philip)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/06 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Cossich on behalf of City of Portsmouth Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01441-RMG(Cossich, Christina)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/06 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Luana N Smith on behalf of City of Portsmouth Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-01441-RMG(Smith, Luana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 05, 2022
16 16 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Ohio Southern, 1:22-cv-00220, City of Portsmouth v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-1441-RMG. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) is open as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re new Case Management Orders and other new documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 24, (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B, 3.C, 3.D, 3.E, 3.F, 4, 4.A, 5.A, 5.B, 5.C, 5.D, 5.E, 6.A, 6.B, 6.C, 6.D, 6.E, 10.A, 11.A, 11.B, 12.A, 13.A, 15.A, 16.A, 16.B, 16.C, 16.D, 18.A, 19.A, 19.B, 19-C) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed in the Lead case and on the Court's MDL website. Please also read CLERKS NOTICE / NOTICE (s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference will be a Telephone Conference set for 6/10/2022 10:00 AM, before Honorable Richard M Gergel (call-in instructions will be circulated the week of prior to each telephonic status conference). See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at[LINK:MDL-2873] (sshe, )
Related: [-]
14 14 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Thu 05/05 2:15 PM
Case transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 1:22-cv-00220. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice Other Thu 05/05 10:26 AM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 88) - Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to the District of South Carolina for the reasons stated in the order of December 7, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel (pb)
Related: [-]
misc MDL Member Case Opened Thu 05/05 2:32 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Ohio Southern, 1:22-cv-00220, City of Portsmouth v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-1441-RMG. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) is open as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re new Case Management Orders and other new documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 24, (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B, 3.C, 3.D, 3.E, 3.F, 4, 4.A, 5.A, 5.B, 5.C, 5.D, 5.E, 6.A, 6.B, 6.C, 6.D, 6.E, 10.A, 11.A, 11.B, 12.A, 13.A, 15.A, 16.A, 16.B, 16.C, 16.D, 18.A, 19.A, 19.B, 19-C) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed in the Lead case and on the Court's MDL website. Please also read CLERKS NOTICE / NOTICE (s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference will be a Telephone Conference set for 6/10/2022 10:00 AM, before Honorable Richard M Gergel (call-in instructions will be circulated the week of prior to each telephonic status conference). See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at[LINK:MDL-2873] (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
NOTATION ORDER granting re12 Defendants Chemguard, Inc. and Tyco Fire Products LP's Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff City of Portsmouth's Complaint. Defendants Chemguard, Inc. and Tyco Fire Products LP shall have up to and including 28 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation enters its decision on whether to transfer to the Multi-District Litigation to answer, move, or otherwise plead. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 5/3/22. (sct) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2022
12 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff City of Portsmouth's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Defendants Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Rhinehart, Erin) Modified event type on 5/2/2022 (kl). [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex 1
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
11 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Douglas R. Cole for all further proceedings. Judge Michael R. Barrett no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 4/27/2022. (kkz) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
10 10 NOTICE by Defendants Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP re8 Notice (Other) of Removal Papers Filed with Scioto County Common Pleas Court (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex 1
9 9 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket8 Notice (Other) filed by Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard, Inc.., and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket8 Notice (Other) filed by Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard, Inc.. as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 4/27/2022. (bjc) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE by Defendants Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP of Removal Papers Filed with the Scioto County Common Pleas Court (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
7 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael R. Barrett for all further proceedings. Judge Matthew W. McFarland no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 04/26/2022. (kaf) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
6 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Chemguard, Inc.. (Casey, Raika) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
Related: [-]
5 5 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, originally filed on 3/22/2022 in Scioto County Common Pleas Court (Case No. 22CIH00056), by City of Portsmouth. (kh) Modified docket text to add case number on 4/25/2022 (kh). [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Tyco Fire Products LP. (Casey, Raika) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Raika Nicole Casey for Defendants Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP (Casey, Raika) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Rhinehart for Defendants Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Scioto County Court of Common Pleas, case number 22CIH00056 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8836312), filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Complaint,
Att: 4 Summons
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (kh) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 5/5/2022.]
Related: [-]