New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Joan M Azrack
Referred: Steven Tiscione
Case #: 2:22-cv-02556
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:May 04, 2022
Terminated:Jun 06, 2023
Last checked: Monday Oct 31, 2022 4:39 AM EDT
Defendant
CoAdvantage Resources 23, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Schlossberg
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Jacqueline Wild
Jackson Lewis, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Brigitte Sajeski
Represented By
Morgan L Mickelsen
Phillips & Associates
contact info
Brittany Alexandra Stevens
Phillips & Associates, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, August 10, 2023
order Order(Other) Thu 08/10 9:38 AM
ORDER re28 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by CoAdvantage Resources 23, Inc. The stipulation is So Ordered. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 8/10/2023. (LP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
28 28 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 08/09 4:49 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by CoAdvantage Resources 23, Inc. (Schlossberg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
order Order Dismissing Case Tue 06/06 9:48 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The Court having been advised that this matter has settled, the case is dismissed, subject to reinstatement at the request of any party within 60 days. The Court retains jurisdiction to So Order any settlement documents if they are submitted within this period. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 6/6/2023. (LP)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
27 27 misc Letter Mon 06/05 4:03 PM
Letter by Brigitte Sajeski (Stevens, Brittany)
Related: [-]
order Status Report Order Mon 06/05 11:29 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Counsel shall immediately file the status report on the outcome of mediation which was due to be filed with the Court on May 8th. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 6/5/2023. (LV)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 02/27 5:32 PM
ORDER granting26 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery is extended as folows: all fact discovery to be completed by July 28, 2023; expert depositions by September 15, 2023; completion of all discovery by October 6, 2023; and the final date to take first step in dispositive motion practice by October 20, 2023. Counsel shall electronically file a status report on the outcome of mediation by May 8, 2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 2/27/2023. (LV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
26 26 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 02/23 11:46 AM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Brigitte Sajeski. (Stevens, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/06 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Bodansky on behalf of CoAdvantage Resources 23, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Bodansky, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
24 24 minutes Settlement Conference Wed 11/02 1:58 PM
Minute Entry for Settlement Conference held on 11/2/2022 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Mickelsen, Stevens for Plaintiff; Schlossberg, Wild for Defendants. Settlement discussions were held but the parties were unable to reach a disposition at this time. Parties will advise the Court when a further settlement conference would be productive. (LV)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2022
23 23 misc Letter 1 - Exparte Document - to be used ONLY in conjunction with primary event selection Mon 10/31 3:35 PM
Letter Ex Parte Settlement Position by Brigitte Sajeski (Stevens, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Letter to Jeffrey Schlossberg
Friday, October 28, 2022
22 22 misc Letter 1 - Exparte Document - to be used ONLY in conjunction with primary event selection Fri 10/28 2:57 PM
Letter - Ex Parte Settlement Position by CoAdvantage Resources 23, Inc. (Schlossberg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit letter to Brittany Stevens re settlement
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
21 21 motion Protective Order Tue 10/25 11:27 AM
MOTION for Protective Order (Stipulation and Order of Confidentiality) by CoAdvantage Resources 23, Inc.. (Schlossberg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 10/25 11:40 AM
ORDER granting21 Motion for Protective Order. The motion for protective Order and Stipulation of Confidentiality is approved and hereby entered as an Order of the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 10/25/2022. (LV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
20 20 minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion for Discovery Tue 10/11 8:19 PM
Minute Order for Motion Hearing held on 10/6/2022 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Stevens for Plaintiff; Schlossberg for Defendant. Defendants' Letter Motion for Discovery16 is denied at this time, as the request is over-broad. Parties will confer and attempt to agree on a much more limited disclosure of only those medical records pertaining to Plaintiff's pregnancy during the time of her employment, as described in the complaint. (FTR Log #AT&T (12:05 - 12:23).) (LV)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
19 19 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 10/03 3:52 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Morgan Mickelsen as Counsel by Brigitte Sajeski. (Stevens, Brittany)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 10/03 6:14 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Morgan L Mickelsen terminated. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 10/3/2022. (LV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
18 18 motion Adjourn Conference Tue 09/27 1:02 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by CoAdvantage Resources 23, Inc.. (Schlossberg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Discovery Tue 09/27 6:59 AM
ORDER deferring ruling on16 Motion for Discovery. A motion hearing will be held by phone at 10:00 a.m. on September 30, 2022 before the undersigned. Counsel for all parties must participate and shall connect to the conference through dial-in number 888-557-8511 with access code 3152145. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court, is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 9/27/2022. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Tue 09/27 3:40 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The motion hearing scheduled for September 30th will instead be held at 12:00 p.m. on October 6, 2022. Counsel shall use the same dial-in information previously provided. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 9/27/2022. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2022
17 17 respm Response to Motion Mon 09/26 5:01 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re16 Letter MOTION for Discovery filed by Brigitte Sajeski. (Stevens, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
16 16 motion Discovery Mon 09/19 2:13 PM
Letter MOTION for Discovery by CoAdvantage Resources 23, Inc.. (Schlossberg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Discovery Mon 09/19 6:50 PM
ORDER deferring ruling on16 Motion for Discovery. Plaintiff shall file a response by September 26th. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 9/19/2022. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/25 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Wild on behalf of CoAdvantage Resources 23, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Wild, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
14 14 minutes Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 08/17 8:24 AM
Minute Entry for Initial Conference Hearing held on 8/16/2022 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Mickelsen, Stevens for Plaintiff; Schlossberg for Defendant. The Court sets the following discovery deadlines: Deadline for completion of Rule 26(a) initial disclosures - 8/16/22; Completion of Phase I discovery - 10/17/22; Deadline for motions to join new parties or amend pleadings - 11/11/22; First requests for production of documents and interrogatories due by - 11/28/22; All fact discovery to be completed by3/6/23; Exchange of initial expert reports - 2/1/23; Exchange of rebuttal expert reports - 3/20/23; Expert depositions completed by - 4/28/23; All discovery completed by - 5/4/23; Final date to take first step in dispositive motion practice - 6/5/23. An in-person settlement conference will be held on November 2, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 910 of the Central IslipCourthouse. Parties are to submit their respective settlement positions via ex parte electronic filing no later than October 31, 2022. A motion to file ex parte is not required. Counsel are to refer to the Settlement Section of this Court's Individual Rules in preparation for the conference. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
13 13 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 08/01 4:23 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order with Letter to Judge enclosing discovery plan worksheet by CoAdvantage Resources 23, Inc. (Schlossberg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Document Adjourn Conference Thu 07/14 9:31 AM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File , MOTION to Adjourn Conference by CoAdvantage Resources 23, Inc.. (Schlossberg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 07/14 10:01 AM
ORDER terminating12 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting12 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The initial conference scheduled for August 4th will instead be held at 11:30 a.m. on August 16, 2022. Counsel shall use the same dial-in information previously provided. The Discovery Plan Worksheet remains due by August 2nd. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 7/14/2022. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/08 1:41 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint, by CoAdvantage Resources 23, Inc.. (Schlossberg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
10 10 discov Disclosure of Interested Parties Fri 07/08 1:32 PM
DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by CoAdvantage Resources 23, Inc.. (Schlossberg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/08 1:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Schlossberg on behalf of CoAdvantage Resources 23, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Schlossberg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
8 8 order Scheduling Order Thu 07/07 1:41 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference will be held at 12:00 p.m. on August 4, 2022 before the undersigned by phone. Counsel for all parties must participate and shall connect to the conference through dial-in number 888-557-8511 with access code 3152145. Counsel are to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court by August 2nd. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court, is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 7/7/2022. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/10 12:49 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brigitte Sajeski. CoAdvantage Resources 23, Inc. waiver sent on 5/9/2022, answer due 7/8/2022. (Stevens, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 05, 2022
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/05 2:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan L Mickelsen on behalf of Brigitte Sajeski (aty to be noticed) (Mickelsen, Morgan)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Thu 05/05 11:55 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/05 11:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Alexandra Stevens on behalf of Brigitte Sajeski (notification declined or already on case) (Stevens, Brittany)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 05/05 9:35 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 05/05 11:55 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
2 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint, by Brigitte Sajeski (Stevens, Brittany)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against CoAdvantage Resources 23, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15534941 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Brigitte Sajeski. (Stevens, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Right to Sue