Utah District Court
Case #: 2:22-cr-00159
Case Filed:May 04, 2022
Last checked: Friday May 06, 2022 1:32 AM MDT
Defendant
Alexander Berg (1)
Represented By
Edward K. Brass
Brass & Cordova
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jamie Z. Thomas
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Stephen L. Nelson
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Oct 07 2022
MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order denying 38 Motion as to Alexander Berg (1). The court DISMISSES without prejudice the Petition to Adjudicate Third Party Interest of Joshua Berg in Forfeited Property for failure to state a claim. If he has good cause, Petitioner may move for leave to file an amended petition within 14 days of this decision. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 10/06/2022.(mh)
GPO Jan 06 2023
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER- GRANTS the United States' 49 Motion to Dismiss Petition to Assert Third-Party Interest in Property. The court hereby DISMISSES Mr. Berg's 45 Petition to Assert Third Party Interest in Property without prejudice. Mr. Berg may seek leave to file a final amended petition within 30 days of this Order if he has a good faith basis for doing so. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 1/6/2023.(mh)

Docket last updated: 06/11/2022 4:43 PM MDT
Monday, April 18, 2022
1 1 13 pgs SEALED COMPLAINT as to Alexander Berg (1). Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead Related [+] [2:22-mj-00256-DBP]
Related: [-] b
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
3 3 ORDER SETTING IN-PERSON HEARING OR TRIAL as to Alexander Berg Initial Appearance set for 4/21/2022 at 09:30 AM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 4/19/22.(ksm) [2:22-mj-00256-DBP]
Related: [-]
4 4 5 pgs MOTION for Detention by USA as to Alexander Berg. (jl) [2:22-mj-00256-DBP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 21, 2022
Case unsealed as to Alexander Berg (tls) [2:22-mj-00256-DBP]
Related: [-]
5 5 **SEALED DOCUMENT** PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT as to Alexander Berg (mec) [2:22-mj-00256-DBP]
Related: [-]
6 6 Oral MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Alexander Berg. (tls) [2:22-mj-00256-DBP]
Related: [-]
7 7 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 6 Oral Motion to Unseal Case as to Alexander Berg (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 04/21/2022. No attached document. (tls) [2:22-mj-00256-DBP]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF Unsealing Criminal Case as to Alexander Berg (tls) [2:22-mj-00256-DBP]
Related: [-]
9 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead: Initial Appearance as to Alexander Berg held on 4/21/2022. Defendant present with counsel and in custody. Government moves to unseal. Motion is granted. Charges, rights and penalties explained. Defendant acknowledges understanding of the nature of the pending charges. Government is seeking detention. Defendant requests detention hearing held at a later date. The Court sets the matter for hearing and orders defendant detained in USMS custody pending further order of the Court. Arraignment set for 5/5/2022 at 10:30 AM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Detention Hearing set for 4/27/2022 at 01:00 PM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Attorney for Plaintiff: Stephen Nelson, Attorney for Defendant: Ed Brass, Retained. Interpreter: Not Needed. Probation Officer: Caroline Bye-Routh. Court Reporter: Electronic/Zoom. (Time Start: 9:28:32, Time End: 9:35:16, Room 8.400). (tls) [2:22-mj-00256-DBP]
Related: [-]
10 10 DOCKET TEXT ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Alexander Berg. No attached document. Detention Hearing set for 4/27/2022 at 01:00 PM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 04/21/2022. (tls) [2:22-mj-00256-DBP]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2022
11 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Edward K. Brass appearing for Alexander Berg (Brass, Edward) [2:22-mj-00256-DBP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
12 12 **SEALED DOCUMENT** AMENDED PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT as to Alexander Berg (mec) [2:22-mj-00256-DBP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
13 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead: Detention Hearing as to Alexander Berg held on 4/27/2022. Defendant present with counsel and in custody. The Court hears argument from the parties regarding the issue of detention. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court imposes conditions and orders defendants release from custody. SEE ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE. Note: Any future review of detention will remain with the magistrate judge who entered the first detention order, even if an order of referral to a different magistrate judge is entered on this defendant's case. Attorney for Plaintiff: Stephen Nelson, Attorney for Defendant: Ed Brass, Retained. Interpreter: Not Needed. Probation Officer: Caroline Bye-Routh. Court Reporter: Electronic. (Time Start: 12:58:27, Time End: 1:32:45, Room 8.400). (tls) [2:22-mj-00256-DBP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 28, 2022
14 14 Receipt for Surrender of Passport as to Alexander Berg, issued by USA. (UTD, Intakeone) [2:22-mj-00256-DBP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
15 15 6 pgs INDICTMENT as to Alexander Berg (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. Assigned to Judge David Barlow. Related [+] (kb).
Related: [-] b
Att: 1 (5/6/2022) rescanned for OCR