Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:22-cr-00699
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2022
Last checked: Friday May 06, 2022 2:44 AM CDT
Defendant
Jorge Luis Alvarado-Rivera (1)
Represented By
Christina M. Norton
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Rex G. Beasley
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2022 3:42 AM CDT
Saturday, March 12, 2022
Arrest of Jorge Luis Alvarado-Rivera (mcda) [2:22-mj-00558-VRG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 16, 2022
ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 3/12/2022 as to Jorge Luis Alvarado-Rivera. (mcda) [2:22-mj-00558-VRG]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Jorge Luis Alvarado-Rivera. (mcda) [2:22-mj-00558-VRG]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Jorge Luis Alvarado-Rivera (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Jorge Luis Alvarado-Rivera (1).By Judge Victor R. Garcia. (mcda) [2:22-mj-00558-VRG]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia as to Jorge Luis Alvarado-Rivera. (mcda) [2:22-mj-00558-VRG]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Victor R. Garcia as to Jorge Luis Alvarado-Rivera. (mcda) [2:22-mj-00558-VRG]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Victor R. Garcia:Video Initial Appearance as to Jorge Luis Alvarado-Rivera held on 3/16/2022 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 3/21/2022 9:00AM before Judge Victor R. Garcia, SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Jorge Luis Alvarado-Rivera (Court Reporter FTR GOLD - CLEVRIE.) (mcda) [2:22-mj-00558-VRG]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Jorge Luis Alvarado-Rivera. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (mcda) [2:22-mj-00558-VRG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 17, 2022
5 5 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Jorge Luis Alvarado-Rivera (Norton, Christina) [2:22-mj-00558-VRG]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE Assertion of Rights by Jorge Luis Alvarado-Rivera (Norton, Christina) [2:22-mj-00558-VRG]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Jorge Luis Alvarado-Rivera. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (bot1) [2:22-mj-00558-VRG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
Notice of Correction: Docket entry #9 was deleted because it was a duplicate of docket entry #8 . (jk)
Related: [-]
8 8 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Jorge Luis Alvarado-Rivera (1) count(s) 1. (bot1)
Related: [-] dacted Version
11 11 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Jorge Luis Alvarado-Rivera (bot2)
Related: [-]