Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-06004
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:May 06, 2022
Terminated:Jul 18, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 02, 2022 4:48 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
VITO A BASILE
Represented By
TAYLOR CHRISTOPHER BARTLETT
Heninger Garrison Davis Llc - Birmingham Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, July 18, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order Order Dismissing Case Mon 07/18 9:28 AM
ORDER granting 4 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/18/2022. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 07/13 8:53 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:4 MOTION to Dismiss (no response) (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
4 4 motion Dismiss Mon 06/27 9:11 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by VITO A BASILE. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/11/2022) . (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 06, 2022
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 05/06 7:53 AM
NOTICE of Designated Forum - Kentucky Eastern by VITO A BASILE (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 05/06 7:52 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/06 7:51 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6998054.), filed by VITO A BASILE. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]