New Jersey District Court
Judge:Brian R Martinotti
Referred: Leda D Wettre
Case #: 2:22-cv-02668
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:May 06, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 02, 2022 5:13 AM EDT
Defendant
JANSSEN ORTHO LLC
Defendant
JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By
MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY
contact info
Defendant
JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Defendant
ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Defendant
TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC.
Defendant
TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL USA, INC.
In Re
ELMIRON (PENTOSAN POLYSULFATE SODIUM) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Plaintiff
PATRICIA KALICKI
Represented By
MICHAEL A. LONDON
Douglas & London, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERT KALICKI
Represented By
MICHAEL A. LONDON
Douglas & London, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 04/17 3:39 PM
Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. Magistrate Judge E. S. Kiel no longer assigned to case. (sms)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/29 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 05/10 9:08 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL USA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (krg, )
Related: [-]
order Case Management Order Tue 05/10 9:08 AM
This case is part of MDL2973. Parties are expected to review and abide by all prior orders entered in this MDL, which can be found[LINK:Here] (krg, )
Related: [-]
mdl MDL Direct File Tue 05/10 9:09 AM
Member Case Direct File on 5/6/2022, for MDL 2973 ELMIRON (PENTOSAN POLYSULFATE SODIUM) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. (krg, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 06, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/06 12:44 PM
COMPLAINT against JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL USA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13392798) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PATRICIA KALICKI, ROBERT KALICKI.(LONDON, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement CMO 6A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 05/06 2:52 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (krg, )
Related: [-]