California Eastern District Court
Judge:John A Mendez
Referred: Deborah Barnes
Case #: 2:22-cv-00768
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:May 05, 2022
Terminated:Nov 29, 2023
Case in other court:Placer County Superior Court, S-CV-0048138
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 01, 2022 2:01 AM PDT
Defendant
Straumann USA, LLC
Represented By
Robert Yang
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Harold Ricky Jones, Jr.
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Bret Cochran
Represented By
Timothy B. Del Castillo
Castle Law: California Employment Counsel
contact info
Lisa L. Bradner
Castle Law: California Employment Counsel, PC
contact info

GPO Dec 23 2022
(Coll, A)STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 12/22/2022 MODIFYING the 7 Pretrial Scheduling Order as follows: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 3/16/2023. Rebuttal Experts due by 3/30/2023. Discovery cut-off is 5/18/2023. Dispositive Motions filed by 7/14/2023. Dispositive Motions heard by 9/12/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/8/2023 at 10:00 AM and Jury Trial set for 1/22/2024 at 09:00 AM, both in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez.
GPO Feb 01 2023
PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/1/23. (Kastilahn, A)
GPO Mar 24 2023
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 03/23/23 MODIFYING the 10 Scheduling Order as follows: Last day to disclose experts: 05/12/23; Last day to disclose rebuttal experts: 05/26/23; Discovery cut-off: 08/18/23; Last day to file dispositive motions: 10/13/23; Last day to hear dispositive motions: 12/12/23 at 01:30 PM; Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez and Trial set for 3/25/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez. (Benson, A.)
GPO Jun 27 2023
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 06/27/2023 CONTINUING the 6/30/2023 17 Motion to Compel hearing to 7/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. The parties shall meet and confer either in person, over Zoom, or telephonically by 7/14/2023 and the parties shall file either a withdrawal of the Motion to Compel or an Updated Joint Statement re Discovery Disagreement by 7/21/2023. (Spichka, K.)
GPO Jul 26 2023
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/25/2023 DENYING 22 Motion to Compel without prejudice to renewal; and The 7/28/2023 hearing is VACATED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
GPO Aug 24 2023
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 8/23/2023 MODIFYNG the Scheduling Order as follows: Discovery cut-off due by 10/10/2023. Las day to file Dispositive Motions 10/13/2023. Last day to hear dispositive Motions 12/12/2023, at 1:30 p.m. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 2/9/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez. Trial is SET for 3/25/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
GPO Oct 11 2023
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/10/2023 DENYING 29 Motion to Compel, DENYING 33 Amended Motion for Protective Order, DENYING 35 Motion to Compel, and VACATING the 10/13/2023 Hearing. (Huang, H)
GPO Nov 29 2023
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 11/29/2023 DISMISSING with prejudice all parties' claims, causes of action, and other parties, with each party bearing that party's own attorney's fees and costs. CASE CLOSED. (Clemente Licea, O)

Docket last updated: 70 minutes ago
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
45 45 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 11/29 1:07 PM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 11/29/2023 DISMISSING with prejudice all parties' claims, causes of action, and other parties, with each party bearing that party's own attorney's fees and costs. CASE CLOSED. (Clemente Licea, O)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
44 44 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 11/28 8:12 PM
STIPULATION of DISMISSAL With Prejudice of Entire Action and Order of Dismissal [FRCP 41(A)] by Straumann USA, LLC. (Jones, Harold)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
43 43 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 10/20 11:36 AM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by M Francel, Relief Courtroom Deputy for Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/20/2023: The Court has been advised by counsel that this action has SETTLED. See ECF No.42 . Accordingly, the parties are ORDERED to file dispositional documents no later than 12/11/2023 in accordance with the provisions of Local Rule 160. Any hearing dates and deadlines previously set in this matter, including the Motion Hearing set for 11/3/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Deborah Barnes, are hereby VACATED. (Francel, M.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
42 42 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 10/11 3:07 PM
NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Straumann USA, LLC. Dispositional Docs due by 11/6/2023. (Jones, Harold)
Related: [-]
41 41 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion for Discovery Wed 10/11 11:09 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/10/2023 DENYING29 Motion to Compel, DENYING33 Amended Motion for Protective Order, DENYING35 Motion to Compel, and VACATING the 10/13/2023 Hearing. (Huang, H)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
40 40 motion Discovery Tue 10/10 11:12 AM
MOTION for DISCOVERY by Bret Cochran. Motion Hearing set for 11/3/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes.(Richardson, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service
39 39 motion Discovery Tue 10/10 10:33 AM
MOTION for DISCOVERY by Bret Cochran. Motion Hearing set for 11/3/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes.(Richardson, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service
Friday, September 29, 2023
38 38 misc Statement re Discovery Disagreement Fri 09/29 7:53 PM
JOINT STATEMENT RE: DISCOVERY DISAGREEMENT filed by Defendant Straumann USA, LLC re33 AMENDED MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER amending30 Motion for Protective Order .(Jones, Harold)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Harold R. Jones In Support of Motion for Protective Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit to the Declaration of Harold R. Jones in Support of Motion for Protective Order,
Att: 3 Declaration of Ambrosia Espaillat,
Att: 4 Declaration of Bret Cochran
37 37 respm Statement Fri 09/29 7:03 PM
STATEMENT of Joint Statement re Discovery Disagreement re Defendant's Responses to RFP, Set Three by Plaintiff Bret Cochran re29 Motion for Discovery,.(Richardson, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Daniel Richardson
36 36 respm Statement Fri 09/29 6:57 PM
STATEMENT of JOINT STATEMENT RE DISCOVERY DIAGREEMENT - DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, SET FOUR by Plaintiff Bret Cochran re35 Motion to Compel.(Richardson, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration OF DANIEL RICHARDSON
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
35 35 motion Compel Wed 09/20 3:26 PM
MOTION to COMPEL Answers to Requests for Production and Production of Documents by Bret Cochran. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Richardson, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
34 34 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Thu 08/24 1:16 PM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 8/23/2023 MODIFYNG the Scheduling Order as follows: Discovery cut-off due by 10/10/2023. Las day to file Dispositive Motions 10/13/2023. Last day to hear dispositive Motions 12/12/2023, at 1:30 p.m. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 2/9/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez. Trial is SET for 3/25/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
33 33 motion Protective Order Fri 08/18 4:11 PM
AMENDED MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER amending30 Motion for Protective Order by Straumann USA, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Gurer, Gokalp)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice to Reschedule Motion Hearing Fri 08/18 2:59 PM
NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on29 Motion for Discovery, : Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Richardson, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
31 31 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 08/17 3:55 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Modify the Pretrial Scheduling Order by Bret Cochran. Attorney Richardson, Daniel Edward added. (Richardson, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
30 30 motion Protective Order Mon 08/07 4:50 PM
MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER by Straumann USA, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Gurer, Gokalp)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Discovery Mon 08/07 11:27 AM
MOTION for DISCOVERY by Bret Cochran. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Bradner, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
28 28 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Wed 07/26 10:08 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/25/2023 DENYING22 Motion to Compel without prejudice to renewal; and The 7/28/2023 hearing is VACATED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
27 27 order Minute Order Mon 07/24 8:51 AM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/24/2023: In light of Plaintiff's26 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion, the17 MOTION TO Compel Answers to Requests for Production set for 7/28/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes is VACATED. (Her, S)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
26 26 respm Withdrawal of Motion Fri 07/21 2:18 PM
WITHDRAWAL of17 Motion for Discovery filed by Bret Cochran. (Richardson, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
25 25 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 07/17 8:23 AM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/17/2023: In light of Defendant's23 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion, the19 MOTION for Protective Order set for 7/28/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes is VACATED.(Her, S)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
24 24 respm Statement Fri 07/14 4:07 PM
STATEMENT by Plaintiff Bret Cochran re22 Motion to Compel. Attorney Turpen, Spencer S. added.(Turpen, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Daniel E. Richardson,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Gokalp Y. Gurer,
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration of James O. Williamson
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Fri 07/14 2:41 PM
NOTICE TO WITHDRAW MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Straumann USA, LLC re20 Notice to Reschedule Hearing on Motion. (Gurer, Gokalp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
22 22 motion Compel Thu 06/29 2:02 PM
MOTION to COMPEL Answers to Requests for Production and Production of Documents by Bret Cochran. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Del Castillo, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
21 21 2 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Tue 06/27 2:21 PM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 06/27/2023 CONTINUING the 6/30/202317 Motion to Compel hearing to 7/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. The parties shall meet and confer either in person, over Zoom, or telephonically by 7/14/2023 and the parties shall file either a withdrawal of the Motion to Compel or an Updated Joint Statement re Discovery Disagreement by 7/21/2023. (Spichka, K.)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice to Reschedule Motion Hearing Tue 06/27 11:34 AM
NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on19 Motion for Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Gurer, Gokalp)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
19 19 motion Protective Order Fri 06/23 3:24 PM
MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER by Straumann USA, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Gurer, Gokalp)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2023
18 18 20 pgs misc Statement re Discovery Disagreement Fri 06/16 4:59 PM
JOINT STATEMENT RE: DISCOVERY DISAGREEMENT filed by Plaintiff Bret Cochran.(Bradner, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Daniel E. Richardson,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Gokalp Y. Gurer
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
17 17 2 pgs motion Discovery Wed 05/31 1:46 PM
MOTION for DISCOVERY by Bret Cochran. Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Bradner, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
16 16 3 pgs order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 03/24 9:30 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 03/23/23 MODIFYING the10 Scheduling Order as follows: Last day to disclose experts: 05/12/23; Last day to disclose rebuttal experts: 05/26/23; Discovery cut-off: 08/18/23; Last day to file dispositive motions: 10/13/23; Last day to hear dispositive motions: 12/12/23 at 01:30 PM; Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez and Trial set for 3/25/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez. (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
15 15 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 03/23 11:19 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modify the10 Pretrial Scheduling Order by Straumann USA, LLC. (Gurer, Gokalp) Modified on 3/24/2023 (Licea Chavez, V).
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
14 14 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 03/17 4:14 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Modify the Pretrial Scheduling Order re10 Stipulation and Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,, by Straumann USA, LLC. (Gurer, Gokalp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2023
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/02 3:34 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL by Straumann USA, LLC. Attorney Gurer, Gokalp Yusuf added. (Gurer, Gokalp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
12 12 order Protective Order Wed 02/01 12:35 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/1/23. (Kastilahn, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 26, 2023
11 11 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 01/26 4:26 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order by Straumann USA, LLC. (Jones, Harold)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 23, 2022
10 10 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 12/23 8:25 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 12/22/2022 MODIFYING the7 Pretrial Scheduling Order as follows: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 3/16/2023. Rebuttal Experts due by 3/30/2023. Discovery cut-off is 5/18/2023. Dispositive Motions filed by 7/14/2023. Dispositive Motions heard by 9/12/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/8/2023 at 10:00 AM and Jury Trial set for 1/22/2024 at 09:00 AM, both in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez. (Coll, A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
9 9 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 12/20 3:30 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for To Modify the Pretrial Scheduling Order re7 Scheduling Order,, by Straumann USA, LLC. (Jones, Harold)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2022
8 8 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 12/19 12:17 PM
[DISREGARD; dates noncompliant] STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER modifying the Pretrial Scheduling Order by Straumann USA, LLC. (Jones, Harold) Modified on 12/19/2022 (Michel, G.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
7 7 order Scheduling Order Fri 09/09 2:42 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 9/8/2022 ORDERING that all Discovery shall be completed by 2/17/2023. Disclosure of Expert Witnesses due by 2/16/2022. Supplemental disclosure and disclosure of any rebuttal experts shall be made by 12/30/2022. All Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 3/31/2023. Hearing on such Motions shall be on 6/7/2023 at 1:30 PM. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 7/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez. Jury Trial is SET for 8/28/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
6 6 misc Initial Disclosures Fri 07/01 2:02 PM
INITIAL DISCLOSURES pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(1) by Straumann USA, LLC. (Jones, Harold)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 06, 2022
5 5 notice Notice of Interested Parties Fri 05/06 4:01 PM
NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Straumann USA, LLC. Attorney Yang, Robert added. (Yang, Robert)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/06 4:00 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Straumann USA, LLC. (Yang, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Certificate of Service Fri 05/06 3:48 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Straumann USA, LLC re2 Civil New Case Documents for JAM,1 Notice of Removal,. (Jones, Harold)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil New Case Documents for JAM Fri 05/06 10:47 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 Order re Filing Requirements,
Att: 3 VDRP
Thursday, May 05, 2022
1 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Placer County Superior Courtt, case number S-CV-0048138 by Bret Cochran. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10216866)(Jones, Harold)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Declaration of Kara Forcier
Att: 3 Declaration of Harold R. Jones,
Att: 4 34 pgs Exhibit A to D