Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Marc T Treadwell
Referred: Stephen Hyles
Case #: 5:22-cv-00175
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 06, 2022
Terminated:Nov 04, 2022
Case in other court:Georgia Northern, 1:22-cv-01620
Defendant
JASMINE YOUNG
Defendant
MACKWELL
Defendant
TURNER
Defendant
WHEELER
Defendant
WHITTINGTON
Plaintiff
JOSHUA EMMANUEL PRESTON

GPO Jun 07 2022
ORDER denying 6 MOTION to Supplement the Record, granting 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; ORDER to Recast Complaint. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 6/7/2022. (msg)

Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, November 04, 2022
18 18 order Judgment Fri 11/04 3:20 PM
JUDGMENT (ggs)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Order on Report and Recommendations Fri 11/04 1:58 PM
ORDER ADOPTING16 Report and Recommendations; DENYING14 Motion for TRO. Preston's13 complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 11/4/2022. (kat)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
16 16 motion Report and Recommendation Wed 10/05 11:16 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re13 Recast Complaint/Petition and14 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by JOSHUA EMMANUEL PRESTON. It is RECOMMENDED that this action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order be denied as moot. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 10/5/22. (mjm) Modified on 10/5/2022 to add text. (ggs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
15 15 misc Letter Tue 08/30 1:37 PM
Letter regarding retaliation(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope addressed to NDGA,
Att: 2 Cover Letter From NDGA forwarding document to MDGA,
Att: 3 Envelope NDGA
14 14 motion Temporary Restraining Order Tue 08/30 1:32 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Filed by JOSHUA EMMANUEL PRESTON.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope addressed to NDGA,
Att: 2 Cover Letter From NDGA forwarding document to MDGA,
Att: 3 Exhibit NDGA
Monday, August 15, 2022
13 13 cmp Recast Complaint/Petition Mon 08/15 1:58 PM
RECAST1 Complaint, against All Defendants by JOSHUA EMMANUEL PRESTON(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional request for relief,
Att: 2 Envelope
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
12 12 misc Letter Tue 08/02 11:48 AM
Letter regarding incidents at prison(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, July 25, 2022
11 11 respoth Response to Court Order Mon 07/25 1:02 PM
RESPONSE to Court Order filed by JOSHUA EMMANUEL PRESTON re10 Order to Show Cause(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional statement,
Att: 2 Additional statement,
Att: 3 Additional statement,
Att: 4 Envelope
Thursday, July 14, 2022
10 10 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 07/14 12:54 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 7/14/2022. (msg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
9 9 6 pgs order Order Order to Amend/Recast/Supplement Complaint Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 06/07 1:07 PM
ORDER denying6 MOTION to Supplement the Record, granting2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; ORDER to Recast Complaint. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 6/7/2022. (msg)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 23, 2022
8 8 misc Letter Mon 05/23 3:26 PM
Letter from JOSHUA PRESTON(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
7 7 misc Letter Wed 05/18 11:37 AM
Letter from JOSHUA E. PRESTON(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, May 16, 2022
6 6 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 05/16 12:22 PM
MOTION to Supplement the Record Filed by JOSHUA EMMANUEL PRESTON.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit First Letter to Sgt Mackwell,
Att: 2 Exhibit GDOC Standard Operating Procedures re Use of Force and Restraint for Offender Control,
Att: 3 Exhibit GDOC - Use of Force Supplemental Report,
Att: 4 Envelope
Monday, May 09, 2022
utility Motion(s) Referred Mon 05/09 8:21 AM
MOTION(S) REFERRED:2 to US Magistrate Judge.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(ggs)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 06, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 05/06 4:53 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tam)
Related: [-]
4 4 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Fri 05/06 4:39 PM
Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:22-cv-01620. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order Fri 05/06 4:29 PM
ORDER this action is hereby TRANSFERRED to the MIDDLE DISTRICT OF GEORGIA, Macon Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 5/6/2022. (kxm) [Transferred from gand on 5/6/2022.]
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 05/06 4:49 PM
Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL and US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES. (tam)
Related: [-]
Case electronically transferred to District of USDC MDGA Macon. (kxm) [Transferred from gand on 5/6/2022.]
Related: [-]
Civil Case Terminated. (kxm) [Transferred from gand on 5/6/2022.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
Submission of2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (eop) [Transferred from gand on 5/6/2022.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2022
2 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Signature of Authorized Officer and Account Statement In Support by Joshua Emmanuel Preston. (eop) [Transferred from gand on 5/6/2022.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT filed by Joshua Emmanuel Preston.(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 5/6/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet