Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:William M Ray, II
Referred: John K Larkins, III
Case #: 1:22-cv-01769
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:May 04, 2022
Terminated:Aug 31, 2022
Last checked: Monday Oct 31, 2022 6:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Amsher Collection Services, Inc.
Defendant
Financial Data Systems LLC
Defendant
I.C. System, Inc.
Defendant
Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Defendant
SCA Collections Inc.
Plaintiff
Ben Jones
5175 Walker Road
Stone Mountain, GA 30088


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
9 9 misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Wed 08/31 9:50 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (tas)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 08/31 9:53 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III terminated from case. (tas)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 08/31 9:53 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ben Jones re9 Clerks Entry of Dismissal. (tas)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/31 9:47 AM
Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41.a.1.i by Ben Jones. (tas)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 15, 2022
7 7 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 08/15 1:56 PM
ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to show cause in writing, within 14 days of the date of this order, why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m). The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this matter at the expiration of the aforementioned period. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 8/15/2022. (tas)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 08/15 1:57 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ben Jones re7 Order to Show Cause. (tas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 05/06 2:53 PM
Summons Issued as to I.C. System, Inc. (bgt)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 05/06 2:52 PM
Summons Issued as to Amsher Collection Services, Inc. (bgt)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs service Summons Issued Fri 05/06 2:41 PM
Summons Issued as to Financial Data Systems LLC. (bgt)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 05/06 2:40 PM
Summons Issued as to Midland Credit Management, Inc. (bgt)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 05/06 2:33 PM
Summons Issued as to SCA Collections Inc. (bgt)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/06 2:14 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Ben Jones. (Filing fee $402, receipt number GAN100138089) (bgt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet