Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Karen Gren Scholer
Referred: David L Horan
Case #: 3:22-cv-01015
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 05, 2022
Terminated:Aug 30, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 01, 2022 4:10 AM CDT
Defendant
Mansfield Independent School District Board of Trustees
Defendant
Clint Q Smith Elementary
Defendant
Margarete Youree
Defendant
Jimmy Womack
Defendant
Jim Vaszauskas
Defendant
Raul M Taylor
Defendant
Marc Smith
Defendant
Carol Rittiman
Defendant
Tiara Marie Richard
Defendant
Greg Minter
Defendant
Brandi McIntosh Lee
Defendant
Mansfield Independent School District Police Department
Defendant
Mansfield Independent School District
Defendant
Thomas Grant Lovett
Defendant
Carl Jackson
Defendant
Chavela Marie Hampton
Defendant
Matthew Garcia
Defendant
Duncanville Independent School District Police Department
Defendant
Duncanville Independent School District Board of Trustees
Defendant
Duncanville Independent School District
Defendant
Kimberly Cantu
Mansfield, TX 76063
Defendant
Kathleen Brown
Plaintiff
Brittany Wilkins
Individually and as Next Friend of O.B. 5610 Pleasant Ridge Road
Dallas, TX 75236

GPO Aug 10 2022
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE on Case re: 3 Complaint. The Court should dismiss this action without prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 8/10/2022) (mjr)
GPO Aug 30 2022
en Gren Scholer on 8/30/2022) (ndt) Order Accepting 8 Findings and Recommendations re: 3 Complaint filed by Brittany Wilkins. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants will be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Ordered by Judge Kar

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
10 10 order Judgment Wed 08/31 9:24 AM
JUDGMENT: The Court has entered its order accepting the Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation in this case. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiffs action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). The Clerk shall transmit a true copy of this Judgment and the Order Accepting the Findings and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge to all parties. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/30/2022) (ndt)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations Wed 08/31 9:17 AM
Order Accepting8 Findings and Recommendations re:3 Complaint filed by Brittany Wilkins. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants will be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/30/2022) (ndt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
8 8 motion Findings and Recommendations Thu 08/11 8:51 AM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE on Case re:3 Complaint. The Court should dismiss this action without prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 8/10/2022) (mjr)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2022
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/09 4:34 PM
ORDER GRANTING LIMITED4 LEAVE TOPROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: Service of process shall not issue, if at all, until the Court completes its screening of this action under 28 U.S.C. §1915(e)(2). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 5/9/2022) (oyh)
Related: [-]
6 6 6 pgs order Order And Notice of Deficiency Mon 05/09 4:29 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER REQUIRING AMENDED COMPLAINT: Brittany Wilkins must address the following deficiency: the complaint lacks facts to allege a plausible claim, the Court requires Wilkins to file an amended complaint. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 6/9/2022. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 5/9/2022) (oyh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 05, 2022
5 5 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 05/06 1:32 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brittany Wilkins. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (sxf)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 05/06 1:30 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brittany Wilkins. (sxf)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint Fri 05/06 1:26 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Kathleen Brown, Kimberly Cantu, Clint Q. Smith Elementary, Duncanville Independent School District, Duncanville Independent School District Board of Trustees, Duncanville Independent School District Police Department, Matthew Garcia, Chavela Marie Hampton, Carl Jackson, Thomas Grant Lovett, Mansfield Independent School District, Mansfield Independent School District Board of Trustees, Mansfield Independent School District Police Department, Brandi McIntosh Lee, Greg Minter, Tiara Marie Richard, Carol Rittiman, Marc Smith, Raul M Taylor, Jim Vaszauskas, Jimmy Womack, Margarete Youree filed by Brittany Wilkins. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (sxf) (sxf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (5/6/2022) Summons
2 2 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Fri 05/06 12:02 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (sxf)
Related: [-]
1 1 qcref Scholer Fri 05/06 11:59 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sxf)
Related: [-]