Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Wendy Beetlestone
Referred: Lynne A Sitarski
Case #: 2:22-cv-01777
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:May 08, 2022
Re-opened:Apr 07, 2025
Terminated:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: Friday Nov 04, 2022 5:01 AM EDT
Defendant
DREXEL UNIVERSITY
3141 CHESTNUT STREET
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19104
Represented By
LESLIE MILLER GREENSPAN
The Tucker Law Group
contact info
JOE H. TUCKER, JR.
Tucker Law Group
contact info
Defendant
ROGER KURTZ
Represented By
LESLIE MILLER GREENSPAN
The Tucker Law Group
contact info
JOE H. TUCKER, JR.
Tucker Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
MARILYN GAYE PIETY FOLEY
Represented By
BRIAN J. FOLEY
Brian J. Foley
contact info

GPO May 23 2023
MEMORANDUM; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 5/23/23. 5/23/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
GPO May 23 2023
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S DREXEL UNIVERSITY AND DR. KURTZ'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 5/23/23. 5/23/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
GPO Jun 01 2023
MEMORANDUM; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 5/31/23. 6/1/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
GPO Jun 01 2023
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT DREXEL UNIVERSITY'S AND DR. KURTZ'S PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 5/31/23. 6/1/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
GPO Jul 25 2024
OPINION; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 7/25/24. 7/25/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
GPO Jul 25 2024
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. THE MOTION IS DENIED AS PIETY FOLEY'S CLAIMS UNDER THE EQUAL PAY ACT OF 1963; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 7/25/24. 7/25/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
GPO Apr 04 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 4/4/25. 4/4/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
GPO Apr 04 2025
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT DREXEL UNIVERSITY'S MOTION FOR POST TRIAL RELIEF PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 50 AND 59 IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 4/4/25. 4/4/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
293 293 appeal USCA Notice of Docketing ROA Wed 05/07 10:06 AM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re292 Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Payment) filed by DREXEL UNIVERSITY. USCA Case Number 25-1863 (dt)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
292 292 appeal Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Payment) Fri 05/02 9:43 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by DREXEL UNIVERSITY. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number APAEDC-18260368.(MCBRIDE, MAUREEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service