Original Case: 3:21-cv-02923

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-01871
Typecivil / private / federal question
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Case Filed:May 06, 2022
Terminated:Jun 15, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jun 16, 2023 4:27 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
ADAM LIEBERMAN
Represented By
Adam Lieberman
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
GENESE LIEBERMAN
Represented By
Genese Lieberman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CREDIT ONE BANK NA
Represented By
Andrew J. Soven
Holland & Knight
contact info

GPO Jun 15 2023
NOT PRECEDENTIAL PER CURIAM OPINION Coram: JORDAN, GREENAWAY, JR. and NYGAARD, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 8.

Docket last updated: 06/16/2023 4:27 AM EDT
Friday, May 06, 2022
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Adam Lieberman and Genese Lieberman in District Court No. 3-21-cv-02923. (JK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Case Docketed
Att: 2 1 pgs District Court Order
Att: 3 6 pgs District Court Opinion
Att: 4 1 pgs Case Caption
Att: 5 2 pgs Case Opening Letter