Cypress Municipal Water Services, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:22-bk-90039
Lead case is: 4:22-bk-90039
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:22-bk-90036 |
Case Filed: | May 08, 2022 |
Terminated: | Sep 26, 2022 |
Debtor
Cypress Municipal Water Services, LLC
5727 S Lewis Ave Ste 300
Tulsa, OK 74105-7144 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 29 minutes ago |
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 09/28 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/28/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
order
Final Decree (No Form)
Mon 09/26 11:52 AM
COPY OF Final Decree and Order Closing Certain Cases, Signed on 9/26/2022 (TylerLaws) |
|
Wednesday, May 11, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 05/11 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/11/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, May 09, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
order
Joint Administration
Mon 05/09 9:24 AM
Order for Joint Administration under 22-90039 Signed on 5/9/2022 (LinhthuDo) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice of Complex Case
Mon 05/09 1:09 AM
Notice of Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case (Filed By Cypress Municipal Water Services, LLC ). (Grogan, James) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Joint Administration
Mon 05/09 12:49 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor Cypress Municipal Water Services, LLC Hearing scheduled for 5/9/2022 at 01:30 PM. (Grogan, James) |
|
utility
Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY)
Mon 05/09 9:24 AM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 22-90039 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (LinhthuDo) |
||
Sunday, May 08, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
36
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event]
Sun 05/08 10:16 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Cypress Municipal Water Services, LLC. (Grogan, James) |
|
crditcrd
none
Sun 05/08 11:17 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 22-90036 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23689047. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |