Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10149

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Christopher J Panos
Case #: 1:22-ap-01023
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:May 09, 2022
Terminated:Dec 05, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Brian A Poillucci
16 Earl Street
Taunton, MA 02780
Represented By
Thomas Benner
Benner & Weinkauf, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher J. Raymond
47 Bairos Lane
Taunton, MA 02780
Represented By
James P. Devlin
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 12/05 4:43 PM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 22-01023 Settled Complaint. (ab)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 12/05 4:44 PM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1023 Closed. (ab)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
35 35 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 11/23 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 11/22/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34 Order on Motion for Approval
Monday, November 20, 2023
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Approval Mon 11/20 4:59 PM
Order dated 11/20/2023 Re:33 Motion filed by Defendant Brian A Poillucci to Approve [Re:32 Agreement for Judgment]. UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE JOINT MOTION TO APPROVE STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT [DKT. NO. 33] AND THE RECORD OF THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING, THE MOTION IS GRANTED AND THE AGREEMENT FOR JUDGMENT [DKT. NO. 32] IS APPROVED. (ab)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
33 33 motion Approve Thu 04/06 2:07 PM
Motion filed by Defendant Brian A Poillucci to Approve [Re:32 Agreement for Judgment] with certificate of service. (Benner, Thomas)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Agreement for Judgment Thu 04/06 2:05 PM
Agreement for Judgment By Defendant Brian A Poillucci Christopher Raymond filed by Defendant Brian A Poillucci (Benner, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
31 31 utility Corrective Entry Wed 04/05 4:20 PM
Order Requiring Corrective Action. You are hereby ORDERED to file the required document(s) identified in the attached order within (2) business days of the date of this order Related [+]. (ab)
Related: [-] 30 Agreement for Judgment By Defendant Brian A Poillucci Christopher J. Raymond
30 30 misc Agreement for Judgment Wed 04/05 11:59 AM
Agreement for Judgment By Defendant Brian A Poillucci Christopher J. Raymond Related [+] filed by Defendant Brian A Poillucci (Benner, Thomas)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, April 03, 2023
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Mon 04/03 7:43 AM
Endorsed Order dated 4/3/2023 Re:28 Motion filed by Defendant Brian A Poillucci to Extend Time to File Documents [Re:25 Order]. GRANTED. (Telam, Usbc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
28 28 motion Extend Time Fri 03/31 4:31 PM
Motion filed by Defendant Brian A Poillucci to Extend Time to File Documents [Re:25 Order] with certificate of service. (Benner, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
27 27 misc Supplemental Document Mon 03/06 3:27 PM
Supplemental Document: Status Report Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Christopher J. Raymond (Devlin, James)
Related: [-] 25 Order
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 03/02 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 03/01/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Order
Monday, February 27, 2023
25 25 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Mon 02/27 11:10 AM
Order dated 2/27/2023 Re:21 Proceeding Memorandum and Order dated 1/12/2023 Re: 16 Notice of Intent to File Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Phone Conference filed by Plaintiff Christopher J. Raymond. NO SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION HAVING BEEN FILED BY THE EXTENDED DEADLINE, THE PARTIES SHALL FILE A STATUS REPORT ON OR BEFORE MARCH 6, 2023. (Telam, Usbc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 26, 2023
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Thu 01/26 2:03 PM
Endorsed Order dated 1/26/2023 Re:23 Assented to Motion filed by Plaintiff Christopher J. Raymond to Extend Time to File Documents [Re:21 Order]. GRANTED. THE DEADLINE FOR THE PLAINTIFF TO FILE A SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION PER THE ORDER ENTERED AT DKT. NO. 21 IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO FEBRUARY 16, 2023. (Telam, Usbc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
23 23 motion Extend Time Wed 01/25 9:21 AM
Assented to Motion filed by Plaintiff Christopher J. Raymond to Extend Time to File Documents [Re:21 Order] with certificate of service. (Devlin, James)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 14, 2023
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 01/15 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 01/14/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order
Thursday, January 12, 2023
21 21 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 01/12 9:09 AM
Proceeding Memorandum and Order dated 1/12/2023 Re:16 Notice of Intent to File Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Phone Conference filed by Plaintiff Christopher J. Raymond. HEARING HELD. THE PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE THE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION BY NO LATER THAN 1/27/2023. (Telam, Usbc)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held Thu 01/12 9:07 AM
Hearing Held 1/11/2023 Re:16 Notice of Intent to File Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Phone Conference. (Telam, Usbc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2022
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 12/23 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/22/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
19 19 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 12/20 3:34 PM
Order Dated 12/20/2022 Re:16 Notice of Intent to File Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Phone Conference filed by Plaintiff Christopher J. Raymond. THE TELEPHONIC HEARING IS HEREBY CONTINUED TO JANUARY 11, 2023 AT 10:30 A.M. MOVANT TO SERVE NOTICE OF THE CONTINUED HEARING ON ALL PARTIES IN INTEREST AND FILE A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE EVIDENCING THE SAME. TO PARTICIPATE THE ATTENDEES SHALL DIAL (877) 873-8018 AND ENTER ACCESS CODE 1167883. (ab)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Scheduled/Cont/Resched (No Forms Attached) Tue 12/20 3:38 PM
Telephonic Hearing Held and Continued to 1/11/2023 at 10:30 AM Re:16 Notice of Intent to File Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Phone Conference filed by Plaintiff Christopher J. Raymond. (ab)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 10, 2022
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Sun 12/11 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/10/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Hearing Scheduled
Thursday, December 08, 2022
17 17 court Hearing Scheduled (Forms Attached) Thu 12/08 9:57 AM
Telephonic Hearing Scheduled for 12/20/2022 at 10:30 AM on16 Plaintiff's Notice of Intent to File Motion for Summary Judgment. TO PARTICIPATE, ATTENDEES SHALL DIAL (877) 873-8018 AND ENTER ACCESS CODE 1167883. To facilitate informal discussions similar to those that occur just prior to in-person hearings that may narrow or resolve issues, the Court encourages parties to confer by telephone prior to the scheduled hearing. When stating their names for the record, participants are invited to also state that the parties have reached resolution on some or all of the issues on for hearing. (hm)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice Thu 12/08 8:42 AM
Notice of Intent to File Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Phone Conference with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff Christopher J. Raymond. (Devlin, James)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 12, 2022
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 11/13 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 11/12/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Pre-Trial Order
Thursday, November 10, 2022
14 14 order Pre-Trial Order Thu 11/10 4:54 PM
Case Management and Scheduling Order Dated 11/10/2022 Related [+]. See Order for Full Text. (ab)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint by Christopher J. Raymond against Brian A Poillucci
Sunday, August 28, 2022
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 08/29 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 08/28/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order
Friday, August 26, 2022
12 12 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 08/26 9:51 AM
Proceeding Memorandum and Order dated 8/26/2022 Re:1 Complaint. A CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER SHALL ENTER. (lb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
court Hearing Held Fri 08/26 9:50 AM
Status Conference Held Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Christopher J. Raymond. (lb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2022
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 07/23 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 07/22/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
10 10 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 07/20 5:00 PM
Order dated 7/20/2022 Re:8 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Christopher J. Raymond. THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED. THE DEADLINE FOR FILING A JOINT CERTIFICATION AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND EXCHANGING RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURES IS EXTENDED TO AUGUST 1, 2022. THE JULY 21, 2022 RULE 16 CONFERENCE IS CONTINUED TO AUGUST 24, 2022 AT 2:00 P.M. BY TELEPHONE. TO PARTICIPATE, PARTIES SHALL DIAL (877) 873-8018 AND ENTER ACCESS CODE 1167883. (clm, USBC)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference Wed 07/20 4:33 PM
Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference and Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan with certificate of service filed by Defendant Brian A Poillucci (Benner, Thomas)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Scheduled/Cont/Resched (No Forms Attached) Wed 07/20 4:52 PM
Telephonic Rule 16 Conference Continued to 8/24/2022 at 2:00 PM Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Christopher J. Raymond against Brian A Poillucci. (clm, USBC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
8 8 misc Stipulation Wed 06/29 5:44 PM
Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Christopher J. Raymond to Extend Time for Filing Joint Certification and Exchange Initial Disclosures with certificate of service. (Devlin, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 06/16 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 06/15/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Scheduling Order
Monday, June 13, 2022
6 6 order Scheduling Order Mon 06/13 2:21 PM
Preliminary Scheduling Order dated 6/13/2022 Re:1 Complaint by Christopher J. Raymond against Brian A Poillucci. See Order For Full Text. (clm, USBC)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Scheduled/Cont/Resched (No Forms Attached) Mon 06/13 1:14 PM
Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2022 at 2:30 PM Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Christopher J. Raymond against Brian A Poillucci. (clm, USBC)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/03 11:02 AM
Answer to Complaint with certificate of service filed by Brian A Poillucci. (Benner, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 05/10 3:07 PM
Summons Service Executed on Brian A Poillucci 5/10/2022 (Devlin, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2022
3 3 court Summons Issued Mon 05/09 3:38 PM
Summons Issued on Brian A Poillucci. Answer Due 6/8/2022. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (clm, USBC)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Add Attorney for Debtor Mon 05/09 3:26 PM
Attorney Thomas Benner for Defendant Brian A Poillucci added to Adversary Proceeding 1:22-ap-1023 pursuant MLBR 9010-2. (clm, USBC)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/09 11:51 AM
Adversary case 22-01023 Complaint by Christopher J. Raymond against Brian A Poillucci. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury))(Devlin, James)
Related: [-]