California Eastern District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Thurston
Referred: Sheila K Oberto
Case #: 1:22-cv-00548
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 07, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Nov 03, 2022 2:00 AM PDT
Defendant
Todd Mumma
Represented By
Glen Earl Gates
Gates Law Group, Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
A. M.
Represented By
Michelle Letricia Tostenrude
Law Office Of Kevin G. Little
contact info
Kevin G Little
Law Office Of Kevin G. Little
contact info

GPO May 13 2022
ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED REQUEST FOR EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ORDER SETTING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on May 13, 2022. (Munoz, I)
GPO May 26 2022
ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION TO RESCHEDULE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING AND RETAIN INJUNCTION IN PLACE signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on May 26, 2022. Motion Hearing currently set for 5/27/2022 has been CONTINUED to 8/19/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Munoz, I)
GPO Jul 06 2022
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File a Motion for Appointment of a Guardian Ad Litem, signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 07/06/2022. Filing Deadline: 8/1/2022. (Maldonado, C)
GPO Jul 26 2022
ORDER Finding that a Guardian Ad Litem is Unnecessary, signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 07/26/2022. (Maldonado, C)
GPO Sep 14 2022
STIPULATION and ORDER re: STAY OF CIVIL ACTION DUE TO PENDING CRIMINAL PROCEEDINGS, AND NOTIFICATION OF THE CONCLUSION OF CRIMINAL PROCEEDINGS. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/14/2022. (Kusamura, W)
GPO Oct 03 2022
ORDER Pursuant to the Stipulation of the Parties to Retain the Terms of the Temporary Injunction signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 09/30/2022.(Flores, E)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, March 03, 2025
49 49 order Minute Order Mon 03/03 8:49 AM
MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/3/2025: (Text Only Entry). On February 28, 2025, Defendant filed on the docket his initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Doc.48 .) This filing contravenes Rule 5(d), which provides that "disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1)... must not be filed until they are used in the proceeding or the court orders filing[.]" Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(d)(1)(A). Defendant did not file his initial disclosures in connection with any particular use in this proceeding or a court order directing their filing. In accordance with Rule 5(d)(1)(A), that docket entry (Doc. 48 ), is hereby STRICKEN from the docket. (Deputy Clerk WAK)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
48 48 misc Initial Disclosures Fri 02/28 2:04 PM
INITIAL DISCLOSURES pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(1) by Todd Mumma.(Gates, Glen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service Proof of Service of FRCP 26 Preliminary Disclosures
Friday, January 24, 2025
47 47 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/24 10:01 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/24/2025:. Non-Expert Discovery due by 11/14/2025. Expert Disclosures due by 12/19/2025. Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 3/27/2026. Dispositive Motions filed by 4/10/2026. Pretrial Conference set for 8/10/2026 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial set for 10/6/2026 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Deputy Clerk WAK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
46 46 minutes Scheduling Conference Fri 01/24 8:31 AM
MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held telephonically before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 1/23/2025. Scheduling Order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel Michelle Tostenrude present. Defendants Counsel Glen Gates present. (Deputy Clerk WAK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
45 45 order Minute Order Tue 01/21 4:52 PM
MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/21/2025: (Text Only Entry). **NOTE NEW CALL IN NUMBER** The parties are GRANTED permission to appear telephonically for the upcoming Scheduling Conference set on 1/23/2025 before Judge Oberto by dialing 669-254-5252; Meeting ID 160 801 1115; passcode 449390, at the time of the hearing. You shall email Courtroom Deputy Wendy Kusamura, at WKusamura@caed.uscourts.gov, to advise the court who will be appearing telephonically. (Deputy Clerk WAK)
Related: [-]
44 44 misc Scheduling Report Tue 01/21 3:16 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT filed by A. M.. (Little, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
43 43 order Minute Order Fri 01/17 9:43 AM
MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/17/2025: (Text Only Entry). Pursuant to the Order Resetting the Mandatory Scheduling Conference (Doc. 42 ), the parties were to file their joint scheduling report one full week prior to their scheduling conference, which is set for January 23, 2025. No joint scheduling report has been filed. The parties shall file their joint scheduling report by no later than January 21, 2025. Failure to comply with this order may be grounds for the imposition of sanctions on any and all counsel as well as any party or parties who cause non-compliance with this order. See E.D. Cal. Local Rule 110. (Deputy Clerk WAK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
42 42 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Tue 12/10 9:13 AM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/10/2024: In light of the lifting of the stay in this case ( see Doc. 41 ), the Initial Scheduling Conference is RESET for January 23, 2025, at 9:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties SHALL file their joint scheduling report by no later than 7 days before the Conference. (Kusamura, W)
Related: [-]
41 41 order Minute Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 12/10 8:07 AM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) Given the conclusion of the related criminal action, the stay imposed in this case on September 14, 2022 pursuant the parties' stipulation31 , is LIFTED . The matter is referred to the assigned magistrate judge for further scheduling signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on December 10, 2024. (Munoz, I)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 24, 2024
40 40 misc Response Sun 11/24 12:06 AM
RESPONSE by A. M. to 39 Minute Order,. (Little, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
39 39 order Minute Order Fri 11/15 8:05 AM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) In light of the termination of the related criminal action, within 5 court days, the parties SHALL file a joint statement as to whether this action should remained stayed signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on November 15, 2024. (Munoz, I)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
38 38 misc Transcript Tue 12/27 11:48 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9-30-22, MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston, filed by Court Reporter Karen Hooven, Phone number 559-264-0584 E-mail karenhooven@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 1/20/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/27/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/27/2023. (Hooven, Karen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
37 37 1 pgs misc Transcript Ordering Form Tue 12/20 9:18 AM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Todd Mumma for proceedings held on 09/30/2022 before Judge Thurston. Court Reporter Karen Hooven. (Gates, Glen)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
36 36 1 pgs order Order Mon 10/03 9:40 AM
ORDER Pursuant to the Stipulation of the Parties to Retain the Terms of the Temporary Injunction signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 09/30/2022.(Flores, E)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
34 34 202 pgs misc Exhibit Fri 09/30 1:03 PM
EXHIBIT In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by A. M.. (Little, Kevin)
Related: [-]
minutes Motion Hearing Mon 10/03 9:16 AM
MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston:5 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING held on 9/30/2022. Order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel Kevin Little present. Defendants Counsel Glen Gates present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Karen Hooven. (Munoz, I)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
33 33 6 pgs misc Reply Thu 09/22 6:44 PM
REPLY by A. M. re32 Declaration,24 Opposition to Motion. (Little, Kevin)
Related: [-]
32 32 2 pgs misc Declaration Thu 09/22 4:13 PM
DECLARATION of Todd Mumma. (Gates, Glen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
31 31 5 pgs order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Case Stayed Wed 09/14 3:35 PM
STIPULATION and ORDER re: STAY OF CIVIL ACTION DUE TO PENDING CRIMINAL PROCEEDINGS, AND NOTIFICATION OF THE CONCLUSION OF CRIMINAL PROCEEDINGS. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/14/2022. (Kusamura, W)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
30 30 5 pgs misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 09/13 2:20 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Stay of Civil Case by A. M.. (Little, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
28 28 5 pgs misc Scheduling Report Fri 09/09 2:24 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by A. M.. (Little, Kevin)
Related: [-]
order Minute Order Fri 09/09 11:27 AM
MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/9/222: (Text Only Entry) Pursuant to the Order Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference (Doc.4 ), the parties were to file their joint scheduling report one full week prior to their scheduling conference, which is set for September 15, 2022. No joint scheduling report has been filed. The parties shall file their joint scheduling report by no later than September 13, 2022. Failure to comply with this order may be grounds for the imposition of sanctions on any and all counsel as well as any party or parties who cause non-compliance with this order. See E.D. Cal. Local Rule 110. (Kusamura, W)
Related: [-]
order Minute Order Fri 09/09 3:12 PM
MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/9/2022: (Text Only Entry) The Court is in receipt of the parties' Joint Scheduling Report, in which they indicate that Defendant has an associated pending criminal matter, that the action should be stayed, and that a further scheduling conference will be "necessary once [that] criminal matter is concluded." (Doc.28 .) Accordingly, by no later than September 13, 2022, the parties SHALL file a stipulation to stay the case. Once entered, the Court will vacate the Scheduling Conference, to be re-set upon the lifting of the stay. (Kusamura, W)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
order Minute Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing Thu 09/01 10:31 AM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) Pursuant to the agreement of the parties off the record, the hearing on the pending preliminary injunction is reset for September 30, 2022 at 1:30 pm via zoom. In addition, also by agreement, the current stipulated injunction shall continue up to and through the continued hearing date. Any reply shall be filed on or before September 15, 2022 signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on September 1, 2022. (Munoz, I)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
order Order on Ex Parte Application Fri 08/12 11:49 AM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Having reviewed and considered Defendant's ex parte application23 and good cause appearing, Defendant's request to late-file his opposition to the pending motion for injunctive relief is GRANTED. The opposition24 , which has already been filed, is deemed timely. To provide Plaintiff a reasonable time to file a reply and afford the Court an opportunity to review the record, the hearing on the pending motion for a preliminary injunction is VACATED and will be re-set for a date no earlier than September 2, 2022 that is convenient for the Court and the parties. The parties are directed to confer before communicating available dates to the Court via email to imunoz@caed.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff's reply shall be filed at least one week prior to the continued hearing date. The parties have indicated to the Court off the record that all are amenable to continuing the current stipulated injunction up to and through any continued hearing date. Accordingly, the injunction previously issued by this Court on May 13, 20228 , shall remain in effect until the new preliminary injunction hearing date signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on August 12, 2022. (Munoz, I)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2022
24 24 5 pgs respm Opposition to Motion Thu 08/11 2:28 PM
OPPOSITION by Todd Mumma to23 Ex Parte Application.(Gates, Glen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Objection Letter Evidentiary Objections to the Request for Preliminary Injunction
23 23 motion Ex Parte Application Thu 08/11 2:14 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION by Todd Mumma for Ex Parte to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for Preliminary Injunction. (Gates, Glen)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2022
order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 08/05 6:11 PM
MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/5/2022: (Text Only Entry) Due to the press of business, the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 8/18/2022, is CONTINUED to 9/13/2022, at 9:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto, The parties SHALL file their joint scheduling report 7 days prior to the conference. (Kusamura, W)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/29 1:09 PM
ANSWER by Todd Mumma. Attorney Gates, Glen Earl added.(Gates, Glen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
20 20 service Certificate / Proof of Service Tue 07/26 3:32 PM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by A. M. re16 Amended Complaint. (Little, Kevin)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order Tue 07/26 10:08 AM
ORDER Finding that a Guardian Ad Litem is Unnecessary, signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 07/26/2022. (Maldonado, C)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 25, 2022
18 18 misc Response Mon 07/25 2:12 PM
RESPONSE by A. M. to17 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings. (Little, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
17 17 2 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 07/06 8:02 AM
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File a Motion for Appointment of a Guardian Ad Litem, signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 07/06/2022. Filing Deadline: 8/1/2022. (Maldonado, C)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 06/08 9:49 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by A. M..(Little, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
15 15 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing Thu 05/26 11:01 AM
ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION TO RESCHEDULE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING AND RETAIN INJUNCTION IN PLACE signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on May 26, 2022. Motion Hearing currently set for 5/27/2022 has been CONTINUED to 8/19/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Munoz, I)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
14 14 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 05/25 3:27 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Extension of Temporary Restraining Order by A. M.. (Little, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2022
13 13 service Certificate of Service Fri 05/20 5:10 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by A. M.. (Little, Kevin)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Certificate of Service Fri 05/20 5:09 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by A. M.. (Little, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
11 11 misc Brief Wed 05/18 11:13 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF filed by A. M.. (Little, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
10 10 service Certificate of Service Mon 05/16 12:38 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by A. M.. (Little, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 14, 2022
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 05/14 1:40 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Todd Mumma served on 5/14/2022, answer due 6/6/2022. (Little, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2022
8 8 9 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Fri 05/13 8:40 AM
ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED REQUEST FOR EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ORDER SETTING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on May 13, 2022. (Munoz, I)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2022
7 7 misc Proposed Order Thu 05/12 3:12 AM
PROPOSED ORDER re Proposed Preliminary Injunction by A. M.. (Little, Kevin)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Proposed Order Thu 05/12 3:11 AM
PROPOSED ORDER re Proposed TRO by A. M.. (Little, Kevin)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Temporary Restraining Order Thu 05/12 3:10 AM
MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by A. M.. (Little, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2022
4 4 misc Civil New Case Documents for JLT Mon 05/09 9:47 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/18/2022 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Jessen, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
3 3 service Summons Mon 05/09 9:43 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Todd Mumma* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kevin G. Little* *Law Office of Kevin G. Little* *Post Office Box 8656* *Fresno, CA 93747*. (Jessen, A)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 07, 2022
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by A. M. (Little, Kevin)
Related: [-]
1 1 41 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants by A. M.. Attorney Little, Kevin G added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10219235) (Little, Kevin)
Related: [-]