Consolidated
Lead case: 3:21-md-02981

California Northern District Court
Judge:James Donato
Case #: 3:22-cv-02746
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:May 09, 2022
Terminated:Oct 31, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Nov 05, 2022 2:34 AM PDT
Counter-claimant
Google Payment Corp.
Represented By
Dane P. Shikman
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Benjamin Gardner Bradshaw
O'Melveny & Meyers LLP
contact info
Brian C. Rocca
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Minna L. Naranjo
Morgan, Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Kyle W. Mach
Munger Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Nicholas Sidney
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Justin Paul Raphael
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Ian T. Simmons
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Richard S. Taffet
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Glenn Douglas Pomerantz
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Rishi Pankaj Satia
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Michelle Park Chiu
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Stephen Joel McIntyre
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Kuruvilla Joseph Olasa
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Geoffrey T. Holtz
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Emily Claire Curran-Huberty
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Sujal Shah
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Jonathan I. Kravis
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Counter-claimant
Google LLC
Represented By
Dane P. Shikman
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Benjamin Gardner Bradshaw
O'Melveny & Meyers LLP
contact info
Brian C. Rocca
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Minna L. Naranjo
Morgan, Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Kyle W. Mach
Munger Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Nicholas Sidney
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Justin Paul Raphael
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Ian T. Simmons
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Richard S. Taffet
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Glenn Douglas Pomerantz
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Rishi Pankaj Satia
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Michelle Park Chiu
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Stephen Joel McIntyre
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Kuruvilla Joseph Olasa
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Geoffrey T. Holtz
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Emily Claire Curran-Huberty
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Sujal Shah
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Jonathan I. Kravis
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Counter-claimant
Google Ireland Limited
Represented By
Dane P. Shikman
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Benjamin Gardner Bradshaw
O'Melveny & Meyers LLP
contact info
Brian C. Rocca
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Minna L. Naranjo
Morgan, Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Kyle W. Mach
Munger Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Nicholas Sidney
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Justin Paul Raphael
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Ian T. Simmons
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Richard S. Taffet
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Glenn Douglas Pomerantz
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Rishi Pankaj Satia
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Michelle Park Chiu
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Stephen Joel McIntyre
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Kuruvilla Joseph Olasa
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Geoffrey T. Holtz
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Emily Claire Curran-Huberty
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Sujal Shah
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Jonathan I. Kravis
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Counter-claimant
Google Commerce Limited
Represented By
Dane P. Shikman
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Benjamin Gardner Bradshaw
O'Melveny & Meyers LLP
contact info
Brian C. Rocca
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Minna L. Naranjo
Morgan, Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Kyle W. Mach
Munger Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Nicholas Sidney
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Justin Paul Raphael
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Ian T. Simmons
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Richard S. Taffet
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Glenn Douglas Pomerantz
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Rishi Pankaj Satia
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Michelle Park Chiu
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Stephen Joel McIntyre
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Kuruvilla Joseph Olasa
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Geoffrey T. Holtz
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Emily Claire Curran-Huberty
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Sujal Shah
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Jonathan I. Kravis
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Counter-claimant
Google Asia Pacific PTE. Limited
Represented By
Dane P. Shikman
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Benjamin Gardner Bradshaw
O'Melveny & Meyers LLP
contact info
Brian C. Rocca
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Minna L. Naranjo
Morgan, Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Kyle W. Mach
Munger Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Nicholas Sidney
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Justin Paul Raphael
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Ian T. Simmons
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Richard S. Taffet
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Glenn Douglas Pomerantz
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Rishi Pankaj Satia
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Michelle Park Chiu
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Stephen Joel McIntyre
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Kuruvilla Joseph Olasa
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Geoffrey T. Holtz
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Emily Claire Curran-Huberty
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Sujal Shah
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Jonathan I. Kravis
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Counter-defendant
Plenty of Fish Media ULC
Represented By
Douglas James Dixon
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Joseph Alan Reiter
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Julia Leslie Haines
Hueston Hennigan
contact info
John Charles Hueston
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Counter-defendant
People Media, Inc.
Represented By
Douglas James Dixon
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Joseph Alan Reiter
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Julia Leslie Haines
Hueston Hennigan
contact info
John Charles Hueston
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Counter-defendant
Match Group, LLC
Represented By
Douglas James Dixon
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Joseph Alan Reiter
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Julia Leslie Haines
Hueston Hennigan
contact info
John Charles Hueston
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Counter-defendant
Humor Rainbow, Inc.
Represented By
Douglas James Dixon
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Joseph Alan Reiter
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Julia Leslie Haines
Hueston Hennigan
contact info
John Charles Hueston
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Defendant
Google Commerce Limited
Represented By
Dane P. Shikman
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Benjamin Gardner Bradshaw
O'Melveny & Meyers LLP
contact info
Brian C. Rocca
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Minna L. Naranjo
Morgan, Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Kyle W. Mach
Munger Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Nicholas Sidney
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Justin Paul Raphael
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Ian T. Simmons
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Richard S. Taffet
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Glenn Douglas Pomerantz
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Rishi Pankaj Satia
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Michelle Park Chiu
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Stephen Joel McIntyre
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Kuruvilla Joseph Olasa
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Geoffrey T. Holtz
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Emily Claire Curran-Huberty
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Sujal Shah
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Jonathan I. Kravis
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Google Payment Corp.
Represented By
Dane P. Shikman
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Benjamin Gardner Bradshaw
O'Melveny & Meyers LLP
contact info
Brian C. Rocca
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Minna L. Naranjo
Morgan, Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Kyle W. Mach
Munger Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Nicholas Sidney
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Justin Paul Raphael
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Ian T. Simmons
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Richard S. Taffet
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Glenn Douglas Pomerantz
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Rishi Pankaj Satia
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Michelle Park Chiu
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Stephen Joel McIntyre
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Kuruvilla Joseph Olasa
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Geoffrey T. Holtz
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Emily Claire Curran-Huberty
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Sujal Shah
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Jonathan I. Kravis
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Google LLC
Represented By
Dane P. Shikman
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Benjamin Gardner Bradshaw
O'Melveny & Meyers LLP
contact info
Brian C. Rocca
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Minna L. Naranjo
Morgan, Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Kyle W. Mach
Munger Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Nicholas Sidney
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Justin Paul Raphael
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Ian T. Simmons
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Richard S. Taffet
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Glenn Douglas Pomerantz
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Rishi Pankaj Satia
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Michelle Park Chiu
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Stephen Joel McIntyre
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Kuruvilla Joseph Olasa
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Geoffrey T. Holtz
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Emily Claire Curran-Huberty
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Sujal Shah
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Jonathan I. Kravis
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Google Ireland Limited
Represented By
Dane P. Shikman
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Benjamin Gardner Bradshaw
O'Melveny & Meyers LLP
contact info
Brian C. Rocca
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Minna L. Naranjo
Morgan, Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Kyle W. Mach
Munger Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Nicholas Sidney
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Justin Paul Raphael
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Ian T. Simmons
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Richard S. Taffet
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Glenn Douglas Pomerantz
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Rishi Pankaj Satia
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Michelle Park Chiu
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Stephen Joel McIntyre
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Kuruvilla Joseph Olasa
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Geoffrey T. Holtz
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Emily Claire Curran-Huberty
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Sujal Shah
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Jonathan I. Kravis
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Google Asia Pacific PTE. Limited
Represented By
Dane P. Shikman
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Benjamin Gardner Bradshaw
O'Melveny & Meyers LLP
contact info
Brian C. Rocca
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Minna L. Naranjo
Morgan, Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Kyle W. Mach
Munger Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Nicholas Sidney
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Justin Paul Raphael
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Ian T. Simmons
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Richard S. Taffet
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Glenn Douglas Pomerantz
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Rishi Pankaj Satia
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Michelle Park Chiu
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Stephen Joel McIntyre
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Kuruvilla Joseph Olasa
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Geoffrey T. Holtz
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Emily Claire Curran-Huberty
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Sujal Shah
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Jonathan I. Kravis
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Miscellaneous
Activision Blizzard, Inc.
Represented By
Jeanifer Ellen Parsigian
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Plenty of Fish Media ULC
Represented By
Douglas James Dixon
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Joseph Alan Reiter
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Julia Leslie Haines
Hueston Hennigan
contact info
Karen Ding
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
John Charles Hueston
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Tate Harshbarger
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
People Media, Inc.
Represented By
Douglas James Dixon
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Joseph Alan Reiter
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Julia Leslie Haines
Hueston Hennigan
contact info
Karen Ding
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
John Charles Hueston
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Tate Harshbarger
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Match Group, LLC
Represented By
Brandon Kressin
Kressin Law Group LLC
contact info
Douglas James Dixon
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Joseph Alan Reiter
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Julia Leslie Haines
Hueston Hennigan
contact info
Karen Ding
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
John Charles Hueston
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Tate Harshbarger
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Humor Rainbow, Inc.
Represented By
Douglas James Dixon
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Joseph Alan Reiter
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Julia Leslie Haines
Hueston Hennigan
contact info
Karen Ding
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
John Charles Hueston
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info
Tate Harshbarger
Hueston Hennigan LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 28 2023
FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW RE CHAT PRESERVATION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/28/2023. (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2023)
GPO Oct 20 2023
PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/20/2023. (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2023)

Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, February 09, 2024
256 256 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/09 2:30 PM
NOTICE by Google Asia Pacific PTE. Limited, Google Commerce Limited, Google Ireland Limited, Google LLC, Google Payment Corp. / Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance (Simmons, Ian)
Related: [-]