Estevez v. Change Healthcare, Inc.
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Aleta A Trauger |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-00327 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages |
Case Filed: | May 06, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jan 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 02, 2022 3:39 AM CDT |
Defendant
Change Healthcare, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bolivar Estevez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, January 18, 2024 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 01/18 3:05 PM
***Civil Case Terminated per Order35 . (kc) |
||
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 06/13 3:14 PM
ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/13/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc) |
|
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Settlement
Tue 06/13 3:13 PM
ORDER granting33 Unopposed Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/13/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
3
pgs
motion
Settlement
Mon 06/12 8:55 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Settlement Approval by Bolivar Estevez.(Parmet, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 19 pgs Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 14 pgs Exhibit B - Decl of MSP, | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs Attachment Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 05/22 2:33 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Move for Settlement Approval (Second Joint Status Report and Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Move for Settlement Approval) by Change Healthcare, Inc..(Lemly, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment - Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 03/31 11:57 AM
ORDER: The Joint Motion30 for Extension of Time to Move for Settlement Approval is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline to file the Motion for Settlement Approval and any related documents shall be extended from ten days to sixty days, up to and including May 22, 2023. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/31/2023. (ln) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 03/30 4:08 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Move for Settlement Approval re29 Order,, Terminate Hearings, (Joint Status Report and Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Move for Settlement Approval) by Change Healthcare, Inc..(Lemly, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment - Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order 1 - Terminate Hearings
Wed 03/22 1:44 PM
ORDER: The court has been notified that this case has settled. It is hereby ORDERED that a stipulation of dismissal or other settlement document shall be filed within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. The initial case management conference scheduled for March 27, 2023 is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/22/2023. (ln) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 03/10 10:06 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Matthew S. Parmet (Parmet, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 01/12 12:47 PM
ORDER: The Third Joint Motion26 for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Respond to Complaint is GRANTED. If mediation is unsuccessful Defendant shall respond to the Complaint by March 23, 2023, and the Court will hold the initial case management conference on March 27, 2023 at 1:00 p.m. If mediation is successful the parties shall file a joint status report outlining a proposed process for settlement approval by March 23, 2023. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/12/23. (ln) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 01/12 12:48 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 3/27/2023 at 1:00 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (ln) |
||
Wednesday, January 11, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 01/11 3:48 PM
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint (Third Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Respond to Complaint) by Change Healthcare, Inc..(Lemly, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment - Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 10, 2023 | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Tue 01/10 8:54 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Benjamin P. Lemly admitted to this court . (ln) |
||
Friday, January 06, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/06 2:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin P. Lemly on behalf of Change Healthcare, Inc. (Lemly, Benjamin) |
|
Thursday, November 17, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Business Entity Disclosure Statement
Thu 11/17 11:03 AM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Change Healthcare, Inc.. (Harris, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, September 21, 2022 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 09/21 9:05 AM
Reset Hearing: The Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 2/27/2023 at 1:00 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (ln) |
||
Tuesday, September 20, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 09/21 9:04 AM
ORDER: The Second Joint Motion22 for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Respond to Complaint (Doc. No.1 ) is GRANTED. The Defendant shall respond to the Complaint by February 1, 2023. It is further ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for December 5, 2022 is RESET for February 27, 2023 at 1:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/20/2022. (ln) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 09/20 3:01 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Respond to Complaint by Change Healthcare, Inc..(Harris, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 20, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 07/20 3:06 PM
ORDER: The Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Respond to Complaint (Doc. No.20 ) is GRANTED. The defendant shall respond to the Complaint by November 22, 2022. It is further ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for August 8, 2022 is RESET for Monday, December 5, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/20/2022. (ln) |
|
Tuesday, July 19, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 07/19 4:57 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Change Healthcare, Inc.. (Harris, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, July 06, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 07/06 10:02 AM
ORDER: Given that the defendant's response date is after the presently scheduled initial case management conference on July 11, 2022 (Docket No13 ), it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference is RESET for Monday, August 8, 2022 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/6/2022. (ln) |
|
Thursday, June 30, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Filing
Thu 06/30 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Filing by Bolivar Estevez Notice of Filing Consent to Join(De Arcangelis, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Consent to Join - Michael Stone | ||
Wednesday, June 15, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 06/15 9:08 PM
NOTICE by Bolivar Estevez of Filing Consent(Parmet, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Consent | ||
Tuesday, June 07, 2022 | ||
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 06/07 11:26 AM
ORDER granting15 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Anthony Craig Cleland to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 06/07/2022. (lh) |
||
Thursday, June 02, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/02 4:17 PM
MOTION for attorney Anthony Craig Cleland to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3605644) by Change Healthcare, Inc..(Harris, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Thu 06/02 9:17 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Jonathan O. Harris admitted to this court . (ln) |
||
Wednesday, June 01, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/01 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan O. Harris on behalf of Change Healthcare, Inc. (Harris, Jonathan) |
|
Tuesday, May 31, 2022 | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Tue 05/31 9:42 AM
GA State Bar status verified as active for A. Craig Cleland not admitted to this court - Local counsel required . (ln) |
||
misc
Annotation - PHV
Tue 05/31 9:42 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL A. Craig Cleland: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 6/21/2022. (ln) |
||
misc
Annotation - Local Counsel
Tue 05/31 9:43 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL A. Craig Cleland: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 6/21/2022. (ln) |
||
Friday, May 27, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 05/27 12:51 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bolivar Estevez. Change Healthcare, Inc. waiver sent on 5/24/2022. (Parmet, Matthew) |
|
Monday, May 23, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 05/23 9:12 PM
NOTICE by Bolivar Estevez of Filing Consent(Parmet, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Consent | ||
Friday, May 20, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 05/20 5:45 PM
NOTICE by Bolivar Estevez of Filing Consent(Parmet, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Consent | ||
Thursday, May 19, 2022 | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Thu 05/19 9:22 AM
FL State Bar status verified as active for Kimberly De Arcangelis admitted to this court . (ln) |
||
Wednesday, May 18, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/18 10:30 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly De Arcangelis on behalf of Bolivar Estevez (De Arcangelis, Kimberly) |
|
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Wed 05/18 2:20 PM
TX State Bar status verified as active for Matthew S. Parmet admitted to this court . (ln) |
||
Tuesday, May 17, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/17 9:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Parmet on behalf of Bolivar Estevez (Parmet, Matthew) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/17 12:51 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Bolivar Estevez. Change Healthcare, Inc. served on 5/12/2022. (De Arcangelis, Kimberly) |
|
Wednesday, May 11, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 05/11 11:29 AM
NOTICE of Filing by Bolivar Estevez Notice of Filing Consent to Join(De Arcangelis, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Consent to Join - Bolivar Estevez | ||
Monday, May 09, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Mon 05/09 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2022 at 1:00 PM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (ln) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 05/09 3:04 PM
Summons issued as to Change Healthcare, Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel (Kimberly De Arcangelis) by regular mail. (ln) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Admin Order 217
Mon 05/09 2:57 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ln) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement
Mon 05/09 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Mon 05/09 2:56 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln) |
|
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Mon 05/09 2:58 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert B. Keaty, II admitted to this court . (ln) |
||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Mon 05/09 3:00 PM
State Bar status verified as active for Kimberly De Arcangelis (FL) and Matthew S. Parmet (TX) not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (ln) |
||
misc
Annotation - PHV
Mon 05/09 3:01 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Kimberly De Arcangelis and Matthew S. Parmet: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 5/31/2022. (ln) |
||
Friday, May 06, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 05/09 2:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Change Healthcare, Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3589227) filed by Bolivar Estevez.(ln) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet |