Renfro v. Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William L Campbell, Jr |
Referred: | Jeffery S Frensley |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-00328 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | May 09, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 14, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 05, 2022 4:34 AM CDT |
Defendant
Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Collyn Renfro
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, November 14, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
![]() ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re:23 Order Dismissing Case. (ad) |
|
23 | 23
![]() ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The Court is in receipt of the parties Supplemental Joint Notice (Doc. No.22 ) concerning their previously filed stipulation of dismissal (Doc. No.15 ). According to the notice, the parties have amended their settlement agreement to remove the confidentiality provision. (See Doc. No. 22 3; see also Amendment to Settlement Agreement, Doc. No. 22-1). Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/14/22. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad) |
|
Wednesday, November 09, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
![]() NOTICE by Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. re21 Order,,, Supplemental Joint Notice Regarding Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice(Price, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, October 31, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
![]() ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' second joint notice (Doc. No.20 ) concerning their previously filed stipulation of dismissal (Doc. No.15 ). While the parties submit that judicial review and approval of their settlement agreement is unnecessary, (see Doc. No.20 2), "district courts in our Circuit regularly find that the FLSA context counsels in favor of courts approving settlements." The Court will allow the parties until November 9, 2022, to file an updated settlement agreement omitting the confidentiality provision, or to file additional briefing not to exceed five pages that explains why their agreement to preserve as confidential the terms of the settlement is enforceable. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/31/22. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad) |
|
Thursday, October 27, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE by Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. re19 Order,,, Terminate Motions,,16 Order,,, Joint Notice Regarding Grounds for Dismissal(Price, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Monday, October 24, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER: Pending before the Court is the parties' Joint Motion to Seal (Doc. No.18 ). Here, the parties do not provide any compelling reasons to seal their settlement agreement or related documents. As such, they have failed to meet the high burden established by in Shane Grp. Therefore, their motion to seal (Doc. No. 18) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/24/22. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad) |
|
Friday, October 21, 2022 | ||
misc
Annotation - Deficiency Notice
Fri 10/21 10:45 AM
NOTICE TO FILER: This document has been scanned. Documents generated from a word processor (Word or WordPerfect) should NOT be scanned, but rather printed directly to PDF via a PDF writer. Document must be text searchable. You do not have to refile this document, however, future scanned pleadings of this nature may require refiling. (ad) Modified on 10/21/2022 (ad) |
||
misc
Annotation - Deficiency Notice
Fri 10/21 10:48 AM
NOTICE TO FILER: This document has been scanned. Documents generated from a word processor (Word or WordPerfect) should NOT be scanned, but rather printed directly to PDF via a PDF writer. Document must be text searchable. You do not have to refile this document, however, future scanned pleadings of this nature may require refiling (ad) Modified on 10/21/2022 (ad) |
||
Thursday, October 20, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Joint MOTION to Seal Document16 Order,,,17 Sealed Document, Joint Motion to Seal Confidential Settlement Agreement and Communications and Related References Thereto In Docket Entry No. 17 by Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.. (Price, Stephen) |
|
17 | 17
![]() Sealed Document Joint Notice Regarding Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc..(Price, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Friday, October 07, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
![]() ORDER: Pending before the Court is the parties' jointly filed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (Doc. No.15 ), indicating that they have resolved this FLSA action and seek to dismiss the case with prejudice. The Stipulation does not reference an agreement and the parties have not filed one for review by the Court. On or before October 20, 2022, the parties shall file a joint notice with the Court stating the grounds for dismissal. If the dismissal is pursuant to a settlement agreement, the parties shall contemporaneously file the settlement agreement for review by the Court. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/07/22. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad) |
|
Wednesday, October 05, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Collyn Renfro. (Jackson, R.) |
|
Wednesday, July 06, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Bench Trial set for 11/7/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6D before District Judge William L. Campbell Jr. Exhibit List due by 10/23/2023. Witness List due by 10/23/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6D before District Judge William L. Campbell Jr. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/23/2023. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/6/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (jm) |
|
Tuesday, July 05, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
![]() INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/7/2022. Discovery due by 3/10/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 4/28/2023. A subsequent Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 2/13/2023 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 7/5/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ln) |
|
minutes
Case Management Conference by Telephone
Tue 07/05 11:15 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 7/5/2022. (Hearing lasted :9)(ms) |
||
Wednesday, June 29, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Initial) filed by Collyn Renfro. (Jackson, R.) |
|
Monday, June 20, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint by Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc..(Price, Stephen) |
|
Monday, June 06, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
![]() BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.. (Price, Stephen) |
|
Thursday, June 02, 2022 | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Thu 06/02 4:18 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Stephen H. Price and Stephen C. Stovall admitted to this court . (jm) |
||
Tuesday, May 31, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ORDER granting8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. answer due 6/20/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 5/31/2022. (vh) |
|
Friday, May 27, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.. (Price, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, May 11, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 5/11/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc) |
|
Monday, May 09, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Summons issued as to Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. (Service copies sent to counsel by regular mail.) (jm) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 7/5/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (jm) |
|
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm) |
|
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm) |
|
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (jm) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3589250), filed by Collyn Renfro. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jm) |
|
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Mon 05/09 2:05 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for R. Scott Jackson, Jr. and Aubrey T. Givens admitted to this court . (jm) |