Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Brantley Starr
Referred: Rebecca Rutherford
Case #: 3:22-mc-00031
Case Filed:May 09, 2022
Terminated:Jul 22, 2022

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago
Friday, July 22, 2022
29 29 3 pgs order Order Transferring to Another District Fri 07/22 10:52 AM
Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to the Northern District of Alabama, Case No. 5:21-cv-01310-MHH. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 7/22/2022) (ygl)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 07/22 10:58 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:29. Fri Jul 22 10:58:20 CDT 2022 (crt)
Related: [-]
utility Case Transferred Out - District Transfer (Public Entry) Fri 07/22 11:06 AM
Interdistrict Transfer to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama; notice sent via email. All documents available electronically. If receiving court cannot upload, documents are available from PACER Related [+]. Counsel advised to file future documents in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama. (ygl)
Related: [-] cord does not contain restricted documents
misc Acknowledgment of Case Transfer Fri 07/22 1:43 PM
Case transferred from NDTX has been opened in the Northern District of Alabama as case number 5:22-mc-00915. (mla)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
28 28 respm Appendix in Support Thu 07/07 2:07 PM
Supplemental Appendix in Support filed by Copperweld Bimetallics LLC re8 Response/Objection. (ygl)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Appendix in Support Thu 07/07 2:02 PM
Supplemental Appendix in Support filed by Encore Wire Corporation re17 Reply. (ygl)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 07/07 1:55 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting19 Motion for Leave to File. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 7/7/2022) (Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 07/07 1:53 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting18 Motion for Leave to File. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 7/7/2022) (Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Thu 07/07 3:12 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:25,26. Thu Jul 7 15:12:37 CDT 2022 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
misc Order Receipt Tue 06/28 8:42 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:24. Tue Jun 28 08:42:15 CDT 2022 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
24 24 3 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Tue 06/28 8:41 AM
ORDER REQUIRING JOINT REPORT AND SETTING HEARING: Motion Hearing set via Zoom for 7/26/2022 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford. Status Report due by 7/21/2022. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 6/27/2022) (oyh)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Court Request For Recusal Mon 06/27 10:52 AM
Court Request for Recusal: Senior Judge A. Joe Fish recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Brantley Starr for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:22-mc-0031-X-BT. (cea)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Fri 06/24 4:16 PM
NOTICE of Letter to the Court Requesting Oral Argument filed by Copperweld Bimetallics LLC (Somaya, Devanshi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
misc Order Receipt Wed 06/22 12:39 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:21. Wed Jun 22 12:39:33 CDT 2022 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
21 21 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 06/21 4:21 PM
PRETRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER: The court refers this case to United States Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford for pretrial management. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 6/21/2022) (jmg)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Court Request For Recusal Tue 06/21 11:41 AM
Court Request for Recusal: Judge Ada Brown recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Senior Judge A. Joe Fish for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3-22-MC-00031-G. (frw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
19 19 motion Leave to File Wed 06/15 5:28 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Appendix in Support of Its Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Encore Wire Corporation's Motion to Quash Subpoena to Produce Documents filed by Copperweld Bimetallics LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Somaya, Devanshi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplemental Appendix
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
18 18 motion Leave to File Tue 06/14 9:17 AM
MOTION for Leave to File to Supplement the Record filed by Encore Wire Corporation (Fernandes, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Encore Wire's Supplemental Appendix in Support of Reply in Support of Motion to Quash,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
17 17 respm Reply Tue 06/14 9:07 AM
REPLY filed by Encore Wire Corporation re:1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Produce Documents and Brief in Support Thereof (Fernandes, Edward)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
16 16 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/03 3:15 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jesse Klinger. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 6/3/2022) (chmb)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/03 3:14 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nicole Bergstrom. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 6/3/2022) (chmb)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/03 2:48 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Craig B. Whitney. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 6/3/2022) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
13 13 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/02 12:32 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Jesse Klinger (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12865596) filed by Copperweld Bimetallics LLC (Allen, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
12 12 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/02 12:30 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Nicole Bergstrom (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12865586) filed by Copperweld Bimetallics LLC (Allen, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
11 11 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/02 12:27 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Craig B. Whitney (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12865560) filed by Copperweld Bimetallics LLC (Allen, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
10 10 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Tue 05/31 10:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Copperweld Bimetallics LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Somaya, Devanshi)
Related: [-]
9 9 respm Appendix in Support Tue 05/31 10:39 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Copperweld Bimetallics LLC re8 Response/Objection to Motion to Quash Subpoena to Produce Documents and Brief in Support Thereof (Somaya, Devanshi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1 - 10
8 8 respm Response/Objection Tue 05/31 10:36 PM
RESPONSE filed by Copperweld Bimetallics LLC re:1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Produce Documents and Brief in Support Thereof (Somaya, Devanshi)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2022
7 7 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/13 8:18 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stephen E. Baskin. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 5/13/2022) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
4 4 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/10 9:20 AM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12811242) filed by Encore Wire Corporation (Baskin, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
3 3 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Tue 05/10 8:54 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Encore Wire Corporation. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Fernandes, Edward)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned (Public Entry) Tue 05/10 10:55 AM
Case assigned to Judge Ada Brown by random assignment. Related [+]
Related: [-] kc
Monday, May 09, 2022
6 6 cmp Miscellaneous Case Initiating Documents Tue 05/10 3:32 PM
Motion to Quash Subpoena, see 1 for image , filed by Encore Wire Corporation. (Filing fee $49; Receipt number 0539-12811791) (mla)
Related: [-]
2 2 respm Appendix in Support Mon 05/09 9:33 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Encore Wire Corporation re1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Produce Documents and Brief in Support Thereof (Fernandes, Edward)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Quash Mon 05/09 9:31 PM
MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Produce Documents and Brief in Support Thereof filed by Encore Wire Corporation with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Fernandes, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Cover Sheet
qcref Brown Tue 05/10 3:37 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Case preliminarily assigned to Judge Rutherford for items that may be referred. (mla)
Related: [-]