Wyoming District Court
Judge:Alan B Johnson
Referred: Kelly H Rankin
Case #: 2:21-cv-00181
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Sep 23, 2021
Terminated:Jun 14, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday May 10, 2022 8:37 PM MDT
Defendant
CSI Inspection LLC
Defendant
Express Services Inc
Defendant
National Oilwell Varco LP
Defendant
Stabil Drill Specialties LLC
Defendant
Robert Wilson
Plaintiff
Brandon Gilstrap
737 North Beach
Casper, WY 82604


Docket last updated: 52 minutes ago
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
6 6 order Dismissing Case Tue 06/14 2:19 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson. This matter is dismissed for lack of prosecution. Case closed. (Order mailed to plaintiff on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2022
5 5 misc Mail Returned Mon 05/09 12:36 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re4 Notice. Mail sent to Brandon Gilstrap. (Court Staff, sbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 21, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Impending Dismissal Tue 04/26 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Impending Dismissal. Dismissal deadline 5/23/2022. (Notice mailed to plaintiff on 4/21/22) (Court Staff, sbh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive Wed 01/12 3:30 PM
ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting2 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have an additional thirty (30) days from the date of this Order in which to serve Defendants. Plaintiff was sent a copy of this Order via USPS. (Court Staff, sag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
2 2 motion Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) Tue 01/11 2:28 PM
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Time In Which to Effect Service filed by Plaintiff Brandon Gilstrap. (Court Staff, stmo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, September 23, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/23 4:41 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Brandon Gilstrap (Filing fee $402, receipt #CHY035312) (Court Staff, szf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Stipulation & Consent to Proceed Before USMJ