Texas Western District Court
Judge:Robert Pitman
Case #: 1:22-cv-00446
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Case Filed:May 10, 2022
Terminated:Oct 30, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Nov 06, 2022 3:17 AM CST
Defendant
Evan Baehr
Individually, and As Next Friends to C.B., M.B., E.B., and S.B. 611 Hearn Street
Austin, TX 78703
Represented By
Kristina Baehr
Just Well Law PLLC
contact info
Christopher Blair Dancy
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Kristina Baehr
Individually and As Next Friends to C.B., M.B., E.B., and S.B. 611 Hearn St
Austin, TX 78703
Represented By
Kristina Baehr
Just Well Law PLLC
contact info
Christopher Blair Dancy
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Jason Williams
5801 Sandalwood Hollow
Austin, TX 78731
Represented By
Blake Holt Crawford
Shidlofsky Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Douglas P. Skelley
Shidlofsky Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Rebecca S.C. DiMasi
Shidlofsky Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Sarah Williams
5801 Sandalwood Hollow
Austin, TX 78731
Represented By
Blake Holt Crawford
Shidlofsky Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Douglas P. Skelley
Shidlofsky Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Rebecca S.C. DiMasi
Shidlofsky Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Williams-Austin Builders, Inc.
815A Brazos Street, No. 288
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Blake Holt Crawford
Shidlofsky Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Douglas P. Skelley
Shidlofsky Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Rebecca S.C. DiMasi
Shidlofsky Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Mid-Continent Casualty Company
Represented By
R. Brent Cooper
Cooper & Scully, P.C.
contact info
Vasilia Maria Wilkes
Coopoer & Scully PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, October 30, 2023
26 26 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 10/30 1:48 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 10/30 1:46 PM
Case reassigned to Judge Robert Pitman. Judge Docket II - Austin no longer assigned to the case. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dm)
Related: [-]
utility Case No Longer Stayed Mon 10/30 1:46 PM
Case No Longer Stayed (dm)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
25 25 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 10/27 4:23 PM
Joint MOTION TO REINSTATE CASE AND DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE by Mid-Continent Casualty Company. (Cooper, R.)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
24 24 misc Status Report Mon 08/28 10:29 AM
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Mid-Continent Casualty Company. (Cooper, R.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
23 23 misc Status Report Thu 06/29 10:44 AM
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Mid-Continent Casualty Company.(Cooper, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Order On Jury Trial Setting
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 05/24 9:04 AM
Text Order GRANTING22 Motion to Stay entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that the case is STAYED pending resolution of the underlying state-court lawsuit. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a status report on or before June 30, 2023, and every sixty days thereafter. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kjef)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed Wed 05/24 10:11 AM
Case Stayed (jv2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
22 22 motion Stay Tue 05/23 11:35 AM
Agreed MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Mid-Continent Casualty Company.(Cooper, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
20 20 1 pgs order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Tue 05/09 4:57 PM
IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that, on or before May, 23, 2023, the parties shall file either (1) a status report on the progress of this action or (2) an agreed proposed scheduling order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
21 21 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 05/12 1:05 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Docket II - Austin for all proceedings. Judge Lee Yeakel no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (bot1)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
19 19 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 11/21 4:55 PM
ORDER GRANTING18 AGREED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AMENDED BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Mid-Continent Casualty Company.. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
18 18 motion Summary Judgment Thu 11/17 2:52 PM
Agreed MOTION for Summary Judgment AGREED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AMENDED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Mid-Continent Casualty Company.(Cooper, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Wed 10/19 4:40 PM
ORDER GRANTING14 Motion for Entry of Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Wed 10/19 4:33 PM
ORDER GRANTING15 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Rebecca S.C. DiMasi for Jason Williams,Rebecca S.C. DiMasi for Sarah Williams,Rebecca S.C. DiMasi for Williams-Austin Builders, Inc.. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
15 15 motion Substitute Attorney Mon 10/17 3:17 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Rebecca DiMasi by Jason Williams, Sarah Williams, Williams-Austin Builders, Inc..(DiMasi, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, October 14, 2022
14 14 motion Summary Judgment Fri 10/14 2:40 PM
Agreed MOTION for Summary Judgment AGREED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Mid-Continent Casualty Company. (Cooper, R.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
13 13 misc Pro Hac Vice Letter Thu 07/14 10:24 AM
Pro Hac Vice Letter addressed to Rebecca DiMassi. (dm)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/01 10:42 AM
Original ANSWER to2 Complaint . Attorney Christopher Blair Dancy added to party Evan Baehr(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Blair Dancy added to party Kristina Baehr(pty:dft) by Evan Baehr, Kristina Baehr.(Dancy, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
11 11 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Thu 06/30 11:12 AM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Jason Williams, Sarah Williams, Williams-Austin Builders, Inc.. (Skelley, Douglas)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/30 11:11 AM
ANSWER to2 Complaint by Jason Williams, Sarah Williams, Williams-Austin Builders, Inc..(Skelley, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 06/07 4:39 PM
ORDER GRANTING8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; Kristina Baehr answer due 7/1/2022. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 06/03 8:47 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 Complaint by Evan Baehr, Kristina Baehr.(Baehr, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 06/01 4:23 PM
ORDER GRANTING6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; Jason Williams answer due 7/1/2022; Sarah Williams answer due 7/1/2022; Williams-Austin Builders, Inc. answer due 7/1/2022. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 30, 2022
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 05/30 12:05 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 Complaint by Jason Williams, Sarah Williams, Williams-Austin Builders, Inc..(Skelley, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, May 16, 2022
5 5 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Mon 05/16 2:02 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Mid-Continent Casualty Company. (Cooper, R.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 05/11 1:08 PM
Summons Issued as to Evan Baehr, Kristina Baehr, Jason Williams, Sarah Williams, Williams-Austin Builders, Inc.. (dl)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) Submitted Wed 05/11 12:57 PM
JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Mid-Continent Casualty Company. (Cooper, R.)
Related: [-]
2 2 19 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 05/11 12:47 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16019846). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Mid-Continent Casualty Company.(Cooper, R.)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/11 12:59 PM
Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Wed 05/11 12:59 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (dl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
1 1 10 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 05/10 2:59 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Mid-Continent Casualty Company. (Cooper, R.)
Related: [-]